Miller v. Pietrantoni Mendez & Alvarez LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | John T Dorsey |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50785 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Aug 05, 2020 |
Terminated: | Nov 06, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Pietrantoni Mendez & Alvarez LLC
Popular Popular Center 19th Fl19th Floor 208 Ponce de Leon Avenue
San Juan, PR 00918 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J & M Sales, Inc., et al.,
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:05 PM EDT |
Friday, November 06, 2020 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 11/06 12:34 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50785 Closed (SH) |
||
Thursday, November 05, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Dismissal - Notice
Thu 11/05 6:21 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding, Case # 20-50785 Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, September 25, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 09/25 2:15 PM
Certificate of Service of Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, September 15, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
10
pgs
order
Order
Tue 09/22 9:57 AM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Less Than or Equal to $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Signed on 9/15/2020 (JS) |
|
Friday, August 28, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings - Motion (Adversary)
Fri 08/28 2:18 PM
Motion for an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Monday, August 10, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Mon 08/10 3:20 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Pietrantoni Mendez & Alvarez LLC. Pretrial Conference set for 11/23/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, August 05, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Wed 08/05 6:11 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50785 JTD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9903980, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Wed 08/05 6:07 PM
Adversary case 20-50785 Complaint by George L. Miller against Pietrantoni Mendez & Alvarez LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives |