Miller v. Pier Enterprises, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11801
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | John T Dorsey |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50806 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Aug 05, 2020 |
Terminated: | Nov 14, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Pier Enterprises, Inc.
10100 Santa Monica Blvd. Ste. 110
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, not individually, but as Chapter 7 Trustee of J & M Sales, Inc., et al.,
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:05 PM EDT |
Monday, November 14, 2022 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Dismissal - Notice
Mon 11/14 1:30 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by George L. Miller (Gentile, John) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 11/15 12:51 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50806 Closed (JC) |
||
Wednesday, June 15, 2022 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice
Wed 06/15 10:39 AM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 6/21/2022 at 01:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Capuzzi, Kevin) |
|
Friday, June 10, 2022 | ||
26 | 26
order
Extend Time
Fri 06/10 1:32 PM
Order Granting Plaintiff's Second Motion to Extend Time for Service of Second Amended Complaint and Summons Order Signed on 6/10/2022. (RC) |
|
Thursday, June 09, 2022 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Certificate of No Objection(Adv)
Thu 06/09 3:06 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Plaintiffs Second Motion to Extend Time for Service of Second Amended Complaint and Summons Filed by George L. Miller. (Gentile, John) |
|
Monday, May 16, 2022 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Extend - Motion
Mon 05/16 1:24 PM
Second Motion to Extend Time for Service of Second Amended Complaint and Summons Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 6/21/2022 at 01:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/31/2022. (Gentile, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, February 03, 2022 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Status Report
Thu 02/03 11:44 AM
Status Report on Adversary Actions Led Solely by Benesch, Friedlander, Coplan & Aronoff LLP Filed by George L. Miller. (Capuzzi, Kevin) |
|
Friday, November 05, 2021 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi)
Fri 11/05 10:59 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 11/9/2021 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Capuzzi, Kevin) |
|
Thursday, November 04, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
order
Extend Time
Thu 11/04 12:11 PM
Order Granting Plaintiff's Amended Motion to Extend Time for Service of Second Amended Complaint and Summons Order Signed on 11/4/2021. (RC) |
|
Wednesday, November 03, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Certificate of No Objection(Multi)
Wed 11/03 5:03 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Plaintiffs Amended Motion to Extend Time for Service of Second Amended Complaint and Summons Filed by George L. Miller. (Capuzzi, Kevin) |
|
Thursday, October 28, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Extend - Motion
Thu 10/28 12:57 PM
Amended Motion to Extend Time for Service of Second Amended Complaint and Summons Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 11/9/2021 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 11/2/2021. (Gentile, John) |
|
Tuesday, October 26, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Extend - Motion
Tue 10/26 2:37 PM
Motion to Extend Time for Service of Second Amended Complaint and Summons Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 11/9/2021 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 11/2/2021. (Gentile, John) |
|
Friday, January 29, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
cmp
Alias Summons
Fri 01/29 11:46 AM
Alias Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Pier Enterprises, LTD. Tickle due by: 3/30/2021. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
16 | 16
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 01/29 11:40 AM
Amended Complaint to Modify Party Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives | ||
Friday, January 22, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Service of Discovery - Notice
Fri 01/22 10:24 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production, and Requests for Admission Propounded by Plaintiff Filed by George L. Miller (Gentile, John) |
|
Tuesday, January 19, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
order
Amend
Tue 01/19 12:06 PM
Order Granting Motion of the Chapter 7 Trustee for Leave to Amend Certain Foreign Defendant Complaints to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 548, 549, and 550 to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 Order Signed on 1/19/2021. (LJH) |
|
Wednesday, January 13, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Amend - Motion
Wed 01/13 4:20 PM
Motion to Amend Motion of the Chapter 7 Trustee for Leave to Amend Certain Foreign Defendant Complaints to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 548, 549, and 550 to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 Filed by George L. Miller. (Capuzzi, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Thursday, November 19, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice
Thu 11/19 4:54 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by George L. Miller, George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 11/23/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Capuzzi, Kevin) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Telephonic Hearing - Notice
Thu 11/19 12:14 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Telephonic Hearing. Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 11/23/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Capuzzi, Kevin) |
|
Friday, September 25, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 09/25 2:15 PM
Certificate of Service of Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, September 15, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
10
pgs
order
Order
Tue 09/22 10:04 AM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Greater Than $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code. Signed on 9/15/2020 (JS) |
|
Friday, August 28, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings - Motion (Adversary)
Fri 08/28 2:18 PM
Motion for an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Monday, August 24, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Affidavit/Declaration of Service
Mon 08/24 3:28 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, August 20, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Alias Summons
Thu 08/20 2:39 PM
Alias Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Pier Enterprises, LTD. Pretrial Conference set for 11/23/2020 at 10:00 AM (check with court for location). (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
5 | 5
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 08/20 12:55 PM
Amended Complaint to Modify Party Filed by George L. Miller (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives | ||
Wednesday, August 12, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Affidavit/Declaration of Service
Wed 08/12 12:46 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service Filed by George L. Miller. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, August 07, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Fri 08/07 4:46 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Pier Enterprises, Inc.. Pretrial Conference set for 11/23/2020 at 10:00 AM (check with court for location). Tickle due by: 10/6/2020. (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, August 06, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Thu 08/06 10:41 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50806 JTD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9904763, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Wednesday, August 05, 2020 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Wed 08/05 10:15 PM
Adversary case 20-50806 Complaint by George L. Miller against Pier Enterprises, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Hoover, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B |