California Southern District Court
Judge:Todd W Robinson
Referred: Karen S Crawford
Case #: 3:20-cv-01519
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Aug 06, 2020
Terminated:Jan 22, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 02, 2021 1:10 AM PST
Defendant
American Roto Drains & Plumbing LLC
Plaintiff
Roto-Rooter Corporation
Represented By
Sean Michael Sullivan
Procopio, Cory, Hargreaves & Savitch LLP
contact info
Paul A Tyrell
Procopio Cory Hargreaves & Savitch
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Friday, January 22, 2021
8 8 order Judgment Fri 01/22 11:21 AM
CONSENT JUDGMENT and Permanent Injunction. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 1/22/21.(sxa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 20, 2021
7 7 motion Approve Consent Judgment Wed 01/20 4:56 PM
Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment and Permanent Injunction by Roto-Rooter Corporation. (Sullivan, Sean)Attorney Sean Michael Sullivan added to party Roto-Rooter Corporation(pty:pla) (sxa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 04, 2020
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 11/04 6:45 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Roto-Rooter Corporation, as to American Roto Drains & Plumbing LLC. (Sullivan, Sean)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 02, 2020
5 5 2 pgs order Order of Judge Transfer Tue 11/03 9:23 AM
ORDER OF TRANSFER. Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Todd W. Robinson for all further proceedings. The new case number is 20cv1519 TWR-KSC. Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 11/2/2020.(jdt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 06, 2020
4 4 utility Report Regarding Patent & Trademark FORM Thu 08/06 3:33 PM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *597,721*, *745,984*, *1,199,063*, *1,221,194*, *1,270,267*, *2,711,057*, *2,798,769* cc:USPTO (vxc)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 08/06 2:54 PM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (vxc)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 08/06 2:45 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Roto-Rooter Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Roto-Rooter Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Chemed Corporation, Other Affiliate New York Stock Exchange (CHE) for Roto-Rooter Corporation.. (vxc)
Related: [-]
1 1 16 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 08/06 2:36 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against American Roto Drains & Plumbing LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14285349.), filed by Roto-Rooter Corporation. The new case number is 3:20-cv-1519-LAB-KSC. Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case. (Tyrell, Paul)(vxc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A-M