|
|
Arrest of JUAN CACERES (ahf) [2:20-mj-00990]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Arrest of JOSE M. SUAREZ-MENDOSA (ahf, ) [2:20-mj-00990]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Arrest of EZEQUIEL REGALADO-ROSARIO (ahf, ) [2:20-mj-00990]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Arrest of JUAN FRANCISCO REGALADO-FERRERAS (ahf, ) [2:20-mj-00990]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Arrest of RAMCEL DUARTE-RODRIGUEZ (ahf, ) [2:20-mj-00990]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Arrest of JERSON DAVID DIAZ (ahf, ) [2:20-mj-00990]
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
COMPLAINT as to JOSE M. SUAREZ-MENDOSA (1), JERSON DAVID DIAZ (2), EZEQUIEL REGALADO-ROSARIO (3), JUAN CACERES (4), RAMCEL DUARTE-RODRIGUEZ (5), JUAN FRANCISCO REGALADO-FERRERAS (6). (mac, ) [2:20-mj-00990]
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
MOTION AND ORDER AS TO JOSE M. SUAREZ-MENDOSA, JERSON DAVID DIAZ, EZEQUIEL REGALADO-ROSARIO, JUAN CACERES, RAMCEL DUARTE-RODRIGUEZ, JUAN FRANCISCO REGALADO-FERRERAS THAT THIS MATTER IS SEALED AND IMPOUNDED UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT OR UNTIL NOTIFIED BY THE U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, ETC. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE on 6/12/20.6/16/20 Entered (mac, ) [2:20-mj-00990]
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
Letter from AUSA Unsealing Complaint and Warrant as to JOSE M. SUAREZ-MENDOSA, JERSON DAVID DIAZ, EZEQUIEL REGALADO-ROSARIO, JUAN CACERES, RAMCEL DUARTE-RODRIGUEZ, JUAN FRANCISCO REGALADO-FERRERAS (mac, ) [2:20-mj-00990]
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET: IA/AC as to JOSE M. SUAREZ-MENDOSA held on 6/16/2020. The Defendant is temporarily detained pending further proceedings. The case is continued until Friday, June 19, 2020 at 1:30 pm before Honorable Marilyn Heffley for probable cause and pretrial detention hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lloret. Court Reporter ESR.(ahf) [2:20-mj-00990]
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by JOSE M. SUAREZ-MENDOSA (ahf, ) [2:20-mj-00990]
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET:Initial Appearance as to JERSON DAVID DIAZ held on 6/16/2020. The Defendant is temporarily detained pending further proceedings. The case is continued until Tuesday, June 23, 2020 at 1:30 pm before Honorable Richard A. Lloret for probable cause and pretrial detention hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lloret. Court Reporter ESR.Court Reporter ESR.(ahf) [2:20-mj-00990]
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET: Initial Appearance as to EZEQUIEL REGALADO-ROSARIO held on 6/16/2020. The Defendant is temporarily detained pending further proceedings. The case is continued until Tuesday, June 23, 2020 at 1:30 pm before Honorable Richard A. Lloret for probable cause and pretrial detention hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lloret. Court Reporter ESR.Court Reporter ESR.(ahf) [2:20-mj-00990]
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by EZEQUIEL REGALADO-ROSARIO (ahf) [2:20-mj-00990]
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET: Initial Appearance as to JUAN CACERES held on 6/16/2020. The Defendant is temporarily detained pending further proceedings. The case is continued until Friday, June 19, 2020 at 1:30 pm before Honorable Marilyn Heffley for probable cause and pretrial detention hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lloret. Court Reporter ESR.Court Reporter ESR.(ahf) [2:20-mj-00990]
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET:IA/AC as to RAMCEL DUARTE-RODRIGUEZ held on 6/16/2020.The Defendant is temporarily detained pending further proceedings. The case is continued until Friday, June 19, 2020 at 1:30 pm before Honorable Marilyn Heffley for probable cause and pretrial detention hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lloret. Court Reporter ESR. Court Reporter ESR.(ahf) [2:20-mj-00990]
Related: [-]
|
12
|
|
12
CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by RAMCEL DUARTE-RODRIGUEZ (ahf, ) [2:20-mj-00990]
Related: [-]
|
13
|
|
13
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET: Initial Appearance as to JUAN FRANCISCO REGALADO-FERRERAS held on 6/16/2020.The Defendant is temporarily detained pending further proceedings. The case is continued until Friday, June 19, 2020 at 1:30 pm before Honorable Marilyn Heffley for probable cause and pretrial detention hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lloret. Court Reporter ESR. Court Reporter ESR.(ahf) [2:20-mj-00990]
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
COMPLAINT as to BRAULIZABETH REYES-VILLANUEVA (1). (mac, ) [2:20-mj-01017]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Affidavit
|
2
|
|
2
MOTION AND ORDER AS TO BRAULIZABETH REYES-VILLANUEVA THAT THIS MATTER IS SEALED AND IMPOUNDED, ETC. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET on 6/17/20.6/17/20 Entered. (mac, ) [2:20-mj-01017]
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
ORDER AS TO BRAULIZABETH REYES-VILLANUEVA THAT THIS MATTER IS SEALED AND IMPOUNDED UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT, ETC. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET on 6/17/20.6/17/20 Entered. (mac, ) [2:20-mj-01017]
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE MICHAEL J. DIAMONDSTEIN appearing for JUAN CACERES (DIAMONDSTEIN, MICHAEL) [2:20-mj-00990]
Related: [-]
|
14
|
|
14
ORDER AS TO JUAN CACERES THAT THE PC/PTD HEARING IN THE MATTER PREVIOUSLY SCHEDULED FOR FRIDAY, JUNE 19, 2020 AT 1:30 P.M. HAS BEEN RESCHEDULED AND WILL NOW BE HELD ON TUESDAY, JUNE 23, 2020 AT 1:30 P.M. BEFORE THE HONORABLE RICHARD A. LLORET. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY on 6/18/20.6/18/20 Entered and Copies E-Mailed. (mac, ) [2:20-mj-00990]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Arrest of BRAULIZABETH REYES-VILLANUEVA (mac, ) [2:20-mj-01017]
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
MOTION AND ORDER AS TO BRAULIZABETH REYES-VILLANUEVA THAT THIS MATTER IS HEREBY UNSEALED. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY on 6/19/20.6/19/20 Entered and Copies E-Mailed. (mac, ) [2:20-mj-01017]
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY: Initial Appearance as to BRAULIZABETH REYES-VILLANUEVA held on 6/19/20. The Government's Motion for Temporary Detention is Granted. A PC/PTD are scheduled for June 23, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. ATTORNEY JOSE LUIS ONGAY for BRAULIZABETH REYES-VILLANUEVA. Signed by Judge Marilyn Heffley.Court Reporter ESR.(mac, ) [2:20-mj-01017]
Related: [-]
|
15
|
|
15
MOTION for PRETRIAL DETENTION by USA as to JUAN FRANCISCO REGALADO-FERRERAS. (LABRUM, JOSEPH) [2:20-mj-00990]
Related: [-]
|
16
|
|
16
MOTION for PRETRIAL DETENTION by USA as to RAMCEL DUARTE-RODRIGUEZ. (LABRUM, JOSEPH) [2:20-mj-00990]
Related: [-]
|
17
|
|
17
MOTION for PRETRIAL DETENTION by USA as to JOSE M. SUAREZ-MENDOSA. (LABRUM, JOSEPH) [2:20-mj-00990]
Related: [-]
|
18
|
|
18
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY:PC/Detention Hearing as to JOSE M. SUAREZ-MENDOSA held on 6/19/20. The Government's Motion for Temporary Detention is Granted. By agreement of counsel, the PC/PTD are rescheduled for June 23, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Marilyn Heffley.Court Reporter ESR.(mac, ) [2:20-mj-00990]
Related: [-]
|
19
|
|
19
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY:PC/PTD Hearing as to RAMCEL DUARTE-RODRIGUEZ held on 6/19/20. The Government's Motion for Temporary Detention is Granted. By agreement of counsel, a PC/PTD are rescheduled for June 23, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Marilyn Heffley.Court Reporter ESR.(mac, ) [2:20-mj-00990]
Related: [-]
|
20
|
|
20
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY: PC/PTD Hearing as to JUAN FRANCISCO REGALADO-FERRERAS held on 6/19/20. The Government's Motion for Temporary Detention is Granted. By agreement of counsel PC/PTD are rescheduled for June 23, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Marilyn Heffley.Court Reporter ESR.(mac, ) [2:20-mj-00990]
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET: PC/PTD Hearing as to BRAULIZABETH REYES-VILLANUEVA held on 6/23/20. The Government and Defense have agreed to conditions of release. See attached Conditions of Release Order. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lloret.Court Reporter ESR.(mac, ) [2:20-mj-01017]
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
O/R Bond Entered as to BRAULIZABETH REYES-VILLANUEVA in amount of $ 50,000, (mac, ) (mac, ). (Main Document 7 replaced on 6/24/2020) (mac, ). [2:20-mj-01017]
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS OF RELEASE AS TO BRAULIZABETH REYES-VILLANUEVA (1) THAT DEFENDANT IS RELEASED ON BAIL IN THE AMOUNT OF $50,000 O/R WITH THE FOLLOWING CONDITIONS AS OUTLINED HEREIN. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET on 6/23/20.6/24/20 Entered and Copies E-Mailed. (mac, ) [2:20-mj-01017]
Related: [-]
|
21
|
|
21
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET: PC/PTD Hearing as to JOSE M. SUAREZ-MENDOSA held on 6/23/20. The Government has established probable cause. The Government's motion for detention is granted. The defendant is detained pending further proceedings. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lloret.Court Reporter ESR.(mac, ) [2:20-mj-00990]
Related: [-]
|
22
|
|
22
ORDER OF DETENTION AS TO JOSE M. SUAREZ-MENDOSA THAT DEFENDANT IS DETAINED PENDING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS, ETC. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET on 6/23/20.6/24/20 Entered and Copies E-Mailed. (mac, ) [2:20-mj-00990]
Related: [-]
|
23
|
|
23
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET:PC/PTD Hearing as to JERSON DAVID DIAZ held on 6/23/20.The Government has not established probable cause. The Defendant has stipulated to pretrial detention pending further proceedings. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lloret.Court Reporter ESR.(mac, ) (Main Document 23 replaced on 6/24/2020) (mac, ). Modified on 6/24/2020 (mac, ). [2:20-mj-00990]
Related: [-]
|
24
|
|
24
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET: PC/PTD Hearing as to EZEQUIEL REGALADO-ROSARIO held on 6/23/20.The Government has established probable cause. The Defendant has stipulated to pretrial detention pending further proceedings. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lloret.Court Reporter ESR.(mac, ) [2:20-mj-00990]
Related: [-]
|
25
|
|
25
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET:PC/PTD Hearing as to JUAN CACERES held on 6/23/20.The defendant has stipulated to probable cause. The Defendant has stipulated to pretrial detention pending further proceedings. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lloret.Court Reporter ESR.(mac, ) [2:20-mj-00990]
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
REPORT AND ORDER OF PRETRIAL OFFICER AS TO BRAULIZABETH REYES-VILLANUEVA THAT THE DEFENDANT WILL PARTICIPATE IN MENTAL HEALTH TREATMENT AT THE DIRECTION OF PRETRIAL SERVICES. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET on 6/26/2020.6/26/2020 Entered and Copies E-Mailed. (ahf) [2:20-mj-01017]
Related: [-]
|
26
|
|
26
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET: PC/PTD Hearing as to RAMCEL DUARTE-RODRIGUEZ held on 6/26/20.The Defendant has stipulated to probable cause. The Government's Motion for Detention is granted. The Defendant is detained pending further proceedings. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lloret.Court Reporter ESR.(mac, ) [2:20-mj-00990]
Related: [-]
|
27
|
|
27
ORDER OF PRETRIAL DETENTION AS TO RAMCEL DUARTE-RODRIGUEZ THAT DEFENDANT IS DETAINED PENDING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET on 6/26/20.6/29/20 Entered and Copies E-Mailed. (mac, ) [2:20-mj-00990]
Related: [-]
|
28
|
|
28
Minute Entryfor proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET: PC/PTD Hearing as to JUAN FRANCISCO REGALADO-FERRERAS held on 6/26/20.The Defendant stipulated to probable cause.The Government's Motion for PTD is denied. The Defendant is released under the attached Conditions of Release Order. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lloret.Court Reporter ESR.(mac, ) [2:20-mj-00990]
Related: [-]
|
29
|
|
29
ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS OF RELEASE AS TO JUAN FRANCISCO REGALADO-FERRERAS (6) THAT DEFENDANT IS TO BE RELEASED ON BAIL IN THE AMOUNT $50,000 SECURED BY 10% WITH THE FOLLOWING CONDITIONS AS OUTLINED HEREIN. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET on 6/29/20.6/30/20 Entered and Copies E-Mailed. (mac, ) [2:20-mj-00990]
Related: [-]
|
30
|
|
30
Cash Bond Entered as to JUAN FRANCISCO REGALADO-FERRERAS in amount of $ 50,000-10%, (mac, ) (mac, ). ($5,000 Paid, Receipt No. 216215) Modified on 7/2/2020 (ahf, ). [2:20-mj-00990]
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
SEALED MOTION AND ORDER AS TO BRAULIZABETH REYES-VILLANUEVA. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET on 7/1/2020.7/2/2020 Entered and Copies Not Mailed. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(ahf) (ahf, ). [2:20-mj-01017]
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
SEALED MOTION AND ORDER AS TO BRAULIZABETH REYES-VILLANUEVA. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET on 7/2/2020.7/2/2020 Entered and Copies Not Mailed. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(ahf) (ahf, ). [2:20-mj-01017]
Related: [-]
|
31
|
|
31
ARREST Warrant Returned Executed on 6/17/20. in case as to RAMCEL DUARTE-RODRIGUEZ. (ke, ) [2:20-mj-00990]
Related: [-]
|
39
|
|
39
ARREST Warrant Returned Executed on 6/17/20. in case as to EZEQUIEL REGALADO-ROSARIO. (ke, ) [2:20-mj-00990]
Related: [-]
|
40
|
|
40
ARREST Warrant Returned Executed on 6/17/20. in case as to JOSE M. SUAREZ-MENDOSA. (ke, ) [2:20-mj-00990]
Related: [-]
|
41
|
|
41
ARREST Warrant Returned Executed on 6/17/20. in case as to JUAN CACERES. (ke, ) [2:20-mj-00990]
Related: [-]
|
42
|
|
42
ARREST Warrant Returned Executed on 6/17/20. in case as to JERSON DAVID DIAZ. (ke, ) [2:20-mj-00990]
Related: [-]
|
32
|
|
32
MOTION for Speedy Trial Extension to File Indictment by USA as to JUAN CACERES. (LABRUM, JOSEPH) [2:20-mj-00990]
Related: [-]
|
33
|
|
33
MOTION for Speedy Trial Indictment 30 day Extension by USA as to JERSON DAVID DIAZ. (LABRUM, JOSEPH) [2:20-mj-00990]
Related: [-]
|
34
|
|
34
MOTION for Speedy Trial iNDICTMENT 30 dAY eXTENSION , by USA as to JOSE M. SUAREZ-MENDOSA. (LABRUM, JOSEPH) Modified on 7/13/2020 (ap, ). [2:20-mj-00990]
Related: [-]
|
35
|
|
35
MOTION for Speedy Trial Indictment 30 Day Extension by USA as to RAMCEL DUARTE-RODRIGUEZ. (LABRUM, JOSEPH) [2:20-mj-00990]
Related: [-]
|
36
|
|
36
MOTION for Speedy Trial Indictment 30 Day Extension by USA as to JUAN FRANCISCO REGALADO-FERRERAS. (LABRUM, JOSEPH) [2:20-mj-00990]
Related: [-]
|
37
|
|
37
MOTION for Speedy Trial Indictment 30 day Extension by USA as to EZEQUIEL REGALADO-ROSARIO. (LABRUM, JOSEPH) Modified on 7/13/2020 (ap, ). [2:20-mj-00990]
Related: [-]
|
38
|
|
38
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE JEROME M. BROWN appearing for RAMCEL DUARTE-RODRIGUEZ (BROWN, JEROME) [2:20-mj-00990]
Related: [-]
|
43
|
|
43
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE GUY R. SCIOLLA appearing for JERSON DAVID DIAZ (SCIOLLA, GUY) [2:20-mj-00990]
Related: [-]
|
44
|
|
44
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE MARIA ANTOINETTE PEDRAZA appearing for JOSE M. SUAREZ-MENDOSA and Withdrawal of Katrina Young as Counsel of Record (PEDRAZA, MARIA) [2:20-mj-00990]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
DOC. #10 AND #11 MAILED TO JOSE LUIS ONGAY AND JOSEPH LABRUM AS TO BRAULIZABETH REYES-VILLANUEVA (tomg, ) [2:20-mj-01017]
Related: [-]
|
45
|
|
45
CJA 20 AS TO EZEQUIEL REGALADO-ROSARIO: APPOINTMENT OF WILLIAM J. BRENNAN, ESQUIRE for EZEQUIEL REGALADO-ROSARIO. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET on 7/20/20.7/20/20 Entered. (mac, ) [2:20-mj-00990]
Related: [-]
|
46
|
|
46
CJA 20 AS TO RAMCEL DUARTE-RODRIGUEZ: APPOINTMENT OF MARTIN I. ISENBERG, ESQUIRE for RAMCEL DUARTE-RODRIGUEZ. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET on 7/20/20.7/20/20 Entered. (mac, ) [2:20-mj-00990]
Related: [-]
|
47
|
|
47
INDICTMENT as to JUAN CACERES (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, JERSON DAVID DIAZ (2) count(s) 1, 3, JOSE M. SUAREZ-MENDOSA (3) count(s) 1, 3, JUAN F. REGALADO-FERRERAS (4) count(s) 1, 2, EZEQUIEL REGALADO-ROSARIO (5) count(s) 1, 2, RAMCEL DUARTE-RODRIGUEZ (6) count(s) 1, 2, BRAULIZABETH REYES-VILLANUEVA (7) count(s) 1, 2. (tomg, ) (tomg, ).
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Designation Form
|
| |
Att: 2
(8/6/2020) SIGNATURES
|