Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:20-cv-05713
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Aug 07, 2020
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 03, 2021 4:17 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDINGS LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
DEMETRIUS A BIBBS
Represented By
MICHAEL WALTER GAINES
Law Office Of Tim L Bowden - Goodlettsville Tn
contact info
TIM L BOWDEN
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Friday, August 28, 2020
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 08/28 12:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by TIM L BOWDEN on behalf of DEMETRIUS A BIBBS (BOWDEN, TIM)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 08/28 11:53 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL WALTER GAINES on behalf of DEMETRIUS A BIBBS (GAINES, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 25, 2020
8 8 service Affidavit of Service Tue 08/25 3:47 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Aearo Technologies, LLC on 08/17/2020, filed by DEMETRIUS A BIBBS. (BOWDEN, TIM)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Affidavit of Service Tue 08/25 3:47 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Aearo, LLC on 08/18/2020, filed by DEMETRIUS A BIBBS. (BOWDEN, TIM)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Tue 08/25 3:46 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Aearo Intermediate, LLC on 08/18/2020, filed by DEMETRIUS A BIBBS. (BOWDEN, TIM)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Affidavit of Service Tue 08/25 3:45 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Aearo Holdings, LLC on 08/17/2020, filed by DEMETRIUS A BIBBS. (BOWDEN, TIM)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Affidavit of Service Tue 08/25 3:43 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on 3M Occupational Safety, LLC on 08/17/2020, filed by DEMETRIUS A BIBBS. (BOWDEN, TIM)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Affidavit of Service Tue 08/25 3:40 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on 3M Company on 08/17/2020, filed by DEMETRIUS A BIBBS. (BOWDEN, TIM)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 10, 2020
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 08/10 8:54 AM
Summons Issued as to 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDINGS LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (djb)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 07, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/07 3:00 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-5569418.), filed by DEMETRIUS A BIBBS. (GAINES, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Coversheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Summons to 3M Company,
Att: 3 Exhibit Summons to 3M Occupational Safety,
Att: 4 Exhibit Summons to Aearo Holdings LLC,
Att: 5 Exhibit Summons to Aearo IntermediateLLC,
Att: 6 Exhibit Summons to Aearo LLC,
Att: 7 Exhibit Summons to Aearo Technologies LLC