Blulife Inc. v. SPO Global Inc.
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Virginia M Hernandez Cov |
Referred: | Julie S Sneed |
Case #: | 8:20-cv-01833 |
Nature of Suit | 150 Contract - Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment |
Cause | 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment |
Case Filed: | Aug 06, 2020 |
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 02, 2021 3:43 AM EST |
Defendant
SPO Global Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Blulife Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Wednesday, February 17, 2021 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Wed 02/17 12:59 PM
ENDORSED ORDER denying the motion to hold case in abeyance. (Doc. # 23 ). However, based on the representation that the parties have reached a settlement, this cause is hereby dismissed, without prejudice and subject to the right of the parties, within 60 days of the date hereof, to submit a stipulated form of final order or judgment, or request an extension of time, should they so choose or for any party to move to reopen the action, upon good cause being shown. After that 60 day period, however, without further order, this dismissal shall be deemed with prejudice. Furthermore, the Court advises the parties that "good cause" exists to reopen an action when a settlement agreement has yet to be finalized because of various delays. But incomplete performance of an executed settlement agreement, such as the failure to disburse settlement funds, does not constitute good cause to reopen an action. This Court does not retain jurisdiction to ensure performance of an executed settlement agreement because such failure to perform should be addressed in a separate breach of contract action. The Clerk is directed to terminate any previously scheduled deadlines and thereafter close this case. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 2/17/2021. (DMD) |
|
23 | 23
![]() MOTION to Stay re12 MOTION for Default Judgment against SPO Global Inc. for Specific Performance and Declaration ,22 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Status Conference by Blulife Inc.. (Katz, Joshua) |
|
Wednesday, February 10, 2021 | ||
22 | 22
![]() MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Status Conference by Blulife Inc.. (Katz, Joshua) |
|
Wednesday, December 30, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order on Motion to Amend / Correct / Modify / Supplement
Wed 12/30 4:07 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 20 Motion for Leave to File Supplement. The supplement is accepted in support of Plaintiff's 12 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on December 30, 2020. (BRC) |
|
Friday, December 18, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
![]() MOTION to Supplement12 MOTION for Default Judgment against SPO Global Inc. for Specific Performance and Declaration by Blulife Inc..(Katz, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Thursday, November 19, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
![]() Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 11/19/2020. Court Reporter: Suzanne L. Trimble (CDT) |
|
Thursday, November 12, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of rescheduling hearing (time only)
Thu 11/12 3:30 PM
NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING (AS TO TIME ONLY): The status conference previously scheduled for 11/19/2020 is rescheduled. New hearing time: Status Conference set for 11/19/2020 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed via Zoom. (BRC) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice of hearing
Thu 11/12 3:27 PM
NOTICE of hearing re:12 Motion for Default Judgment against SPO Global Inc. Status Conference set for November 19, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed via Zoom Video Conference. The Clerk will be sending everyone an invitation to the meeting via email. If you have any questions, please contact chambers at CHAMBERS_FLMD_SNEED@flmd.uscourts.gov. Although the hearing is taking place by video, all parties should dress appropriately for this Court proceeding. Furthermore, the parties are hereby reminded that under Local Rule 4.11(b) the taking of photographs, the operation of recording or transmission devices, and the broadcasting or televising of proceedings in any courtroom or hearing room of this Court, or the environs thereof, either while the Court is in session or at recesses between sessions when Court officials, lawyers, jurors, witnesses or other persons connected with judicial proceedings of any kind are present, are prohibited. (BRC) |
|
Monday, November 09, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 11/09 5:05 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 14 Motion for Status Conference Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Default Final Judgment. A status conference will be set by separate notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on November 9, 2020. (BRC) |
|
Tuesday, November 03, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
![]() MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Status Conference regarding Motion for Default Final Judgment (DE 12) by Blulife Inc.. (Katz, Joshua) |
|
Wednesday, September 16, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order Referring Motion
Wed 09/16 10:28 AM
ENDORSED ORDER referring the motion for default judgment (Doc. # 12 ) to the Honorable Julie S. Sneed, United States Magistrate Judge, for the issuance of a report and recommendation. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 9/16/2020. (DMD) |
|
Tuesday, September 15, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
![]() MOTION for Default Judgment against SPO Global Inc. for Specific Performance and Declaration by Blulife Inc..(Katz, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
11 | 11
order
*Order no pdf
Tue 09/15 9:54 AM
ENDORSED ORDER: On September 4, 2020, the Clerk of the Court entered default against Defendant SPO Global Inc. (Doc. # 9 ). Local Rule 1.07(b), M.D. Fla., provides that, after Clerk's default is entered, the plaintiff should "proceed without delay to apply for a judgment pursuant to Rule 55(b), Fed. R. Civ. P., failing which the case shall be subject to dismissal sixty (60) days after such service without notice and without prejudice." The Court advises Plaintiff Blulife Inc. that it should proceed without delay in seeking a default judgment in an effort to bring this matter toward its final resolution. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 9/15/2020. (DMD) |
|
Tuesday, September 08, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
![]() RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 9/8/2020. (TWL) |
|
Friday, September 04, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to SPO Global Inc. (LNR) |
|
Thursday, September 03, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
![]() MOTION for Clerk's Default against SPO Global Inc. by Blulife Inc.(Katz, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, August 18, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order
Tue 08/18 10:23 AM
ENDORSED ORDER: Counsel are directed to meet and confer, in person or by telephone, and by September 15, 2020, file a completed Case Management Report. This document can be found on Judge Covington's page of the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Please be advised that the Court's Case Management Report form is different from those used by other judges. Local Rule 3.05(c)(2)(E), M.D. Fla., explains that most track two cases, like the present case, "will be tried within one year after the filing of the complaint." To accomplish this goal, the Court believes that six to eight months is a sufficient period of time to conduct discovery. If the parties believe that more time than eight months will be needed to complete discovery, the parties should provide the Court with a detailed explanation as to why additional time is needed and a timeline for the discovery that is planned. The Court will then determine whether a Case Management Hearing is necessary before entry of a Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/18/2020. (DMD) |
|
Monday, August 17, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
![]() RETURN of service executed on 08/13/2020 by Blulife Inc. as to SPO Global Inc.. (Katz, Joshua) |
|
Monday, August 10, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
![]() SUMMONS issued as to SPO Global Inc. (CRH) |
|
Friday, August 07, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
![]() TRANSFER IN from Fort Myers Division on 08/06/2020 Case Number 2:20-cv-571-FtM-66NPM. Case assigned to District Judge Virginia M. Covington and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New Case Number: 8:20-cv-01833-T-33JSS. (CRH) |
|
Thursday, August 06, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
2 | 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:20-cv-571-FtM-66NPM. (SJB) | |
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |