New York Eastern District Court
Case #: 1:20-cr-00247
Case Filed:Jul 09, 2020
Last checked: Saturday Aug 08, 2020 3:15 AM EDT
Defendant
Caliph Glean (1)
Represented By
Kannan Sundaram
Federal Defenders
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Kayla C Bensing
U.S. Attorney'S Office, Edny
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/08/2020 4:21 AM EDT
Saturday, June 06, 2020
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT as to Caliph Glean (1). (Chin, Felix) [1:20-mj-00419-SMG]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Sealing Cover Sheet
Thursday, June 11, 2020
Arrest of Caliph Glean in Eastern District of Pennsylvania (Philadelphia). (Marziliano, August) [1:20-mj-00419-SMG]
Related: [-]
3 3 Order to Unseal Case as to Caliph Glean. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 6/11/2020. (Chin, Felix) [1:20-mj-00419-SMG]
Related: [-]
Friday, June 19, 2020
4 4 Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Caliph Glean (Marziliano, August) [1:20-mj-00419-SMG]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 WAIVER of Rule 5(c)(3) Hearing filed by CALIPH GLEAN,
Att: 2 COMMITMENT TO ANOTHER DISTRICT AS TO CALIPH GLEAN
Tuesday, June 30, 2020
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James Orenstein: VIA video/audio conference.Arraignment as to Caliph Glean (at MDC) on the Complaint held on 6/30/2020, Initial Appearance as to Caliph Glean held on 6/30/2020, Attorney Appointment of federal defender Kannan Sundaram for the defendant present. AUSA Kayla Bensing.(Court Reporter Michele Nardone.) (2:45pm-2:52pm). No bail package presented. Order of detention entered w/o prejudice. Preliminary hearing set 7/14 at 11am. (Yuen, Sui-May) [1:20-mj-00419-SMG]
Related: [-]
Attorney update in case as to Caliph Glean. Attorney Kannan Sundaram for Caliph Glean added. (Yuen, Sui-May) [1:20-mj-00419-SMG]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Caliph Glean. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 6/30/2020. (Yuen, Sui-May) [1:20-mj-00419-SMG]
Related: [-]
6 6 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Caliph Glean (Yuen, Sui-May) [1:20-mj-00419-SMG]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 09, 2020
7 7 INDICTMENT as to Caliph Glean (1) count(s) 1. (Lee, Tiffeny)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Information Sheet