New York Southern District Court
Judge:John G Koeltl
Case #: 1:20-cv-06273
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Case Filed:Aug 10, 2020
Terminated:May 10, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Feb 06, 2021 4:25 AM EST
Defendant
Dermot Shea
individually New York City Police Department 1 Police Plaza Path
New York, NY 10038
Represented By
Ivan A. Mendez, Jr.
New York City Law Department
contact info
Kimberly Kirsten Brown
The City Of New York Law Department
contact info
Defendant
City Of New York
a municipal entity 100 Church Street
New York, NY 10007
Represented By
Ivan A. Mendez, Jr.
New York City Law Department
contact info
Kimberly Kirsten Brown
The City Of New York Law Department
contact info
Plaintiff
Lori Pollock
299 Broadway Suite 1310
New York, NY 10007
Represented By
Shelley Ann Quilty-Lake
Meenan & Associates, LLC
contact info
Colleen Margaret Meenan
Mennan And Associates LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Tuesday, May 10, 2022
50 50 2 pgs order Order of Discontinuance Tue 05/10 4:13 PM
ORDER: It having been reported to this Court that the parties have settled this action, it is, on this 10th day of May, 2022, hereby ordered that this matter be discontinued with prejudice but without costs; provided, however, that within 30 days of the date of this order, counsel for the plaintiff may apply by letter for restoration of the action to the calendar of the undersigned, in which event the action will be restored. Any application to reopen must be filed within thirty (30) days of this order; any application to reopen filed thereafter may be denied solely on that basis. Further, if the parties wish for the Court to retain jurisdiction for the purpose of enforcing any settlement agreement, they must submit the settlement agreement to the Court within the same thirty-day period to be so-ordered by the Court. Unless the Court orders otherwise, the Court will not retain jurisdiction to enforce a settlement agreement unless it is made part of the public record. All pending motions are dismissed as moot. All conferences are canceled. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 5/10/2022) (ks)
Related: [-]
utility Case Stay Lifted Tue 05/10 4:14 PM
Case Stay Lifted. (ks)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 06, 2022
49 49 misc Status Report Fri 05/06 1:48 PM
STATUS REPORT. concerning the status of settlement Document filed by City Of New York, Dermot Shea, Dermot Shea..(Mendez, Ivan)
Related: [-]