Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-02581

Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:James M Carr
Case #: 1:20-ap-50114
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Aug 07, 2020
Terminated:Apr 12, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Fredericus Jan Knipscheer, Jr.
2338 Academy East Drive
Carmel, IN 46032
Represented By
Fredericus Jan Knipscheer, Jr.
contact info
Plaintiff
Pier 48 Indy LLC
Represented By
David J. Jurkiewicz
Bose Mckinney & Evans LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204

GPO Mar 28 2023
Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Motion for Summary Judgment (re: Doc # 33). The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (aeh)

Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 12, 2023
48 48 court Close Adversary Proceeding Wed 04/12 11:08 AM
Adversary Proceeding Closed. (aeh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 11, 2023
47 47 court Returned Mail Received by Court Tue 04/11 11:42 AM
Returned Mail received from the BNC for Defendant Fredericus Jan Knipscheer Jr Related [+]. (aeh)
Related: [-] 45
46 46 court Returned Mail Received by Court Tue 04/11 11:40 AM
Returned Mail received from the BNC for Defendant Fredericus Jan Knipscheer Jr Related [+]. (aeh)
Related: [-] 44
Thursday, March 30, 2023
45 45 court BNC Certificate of Service - Order Fri 03/31 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Service - ORDER Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1 Notice Date 03/30/2023. (Admin)
Related: [-] 43
44 44 court BNC Certificate of Service - Order Fri 03/31 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Service - ORDER Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1 Notice Date 03/30/2023. (Admin)
Related: [-] 42
Tuesday, March 28, 2023
43 43 order Judgment Tue 03/28 3:07 PM
Judgment Related [+]. Notice of entry of this order/judgment is hereby provided to parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 9022(a). The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (aeh)
Related: [-] 33
42 42 order Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Tue 03/28 2:53 PM
Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Motion for Summary Judgment Related [+]. The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (aeh)
Related: [-] 33
Monday, March 28, 2022
41 41 motion Authority, Motion for Mon 03/28 4:39 PM
Motion for Authority for Immediate Entry of Summary Judgment filed by David J. Jurkiewicz on behalf of Plaintiff Pier 48 Indy LLC. (Jurkiewicz, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 08, 2022
40 40 court Returned Mail Received by Court Tue 03/08 3:20 PM
Returned Mail received from the BNC for Defendant Fredericus Jan Knipscheer Jr Related [+]. (tkb)
Related: [-] 38
Friday, February 25, 2022
39 39 court BNC Certificate of Service - Order Sat 02/26 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Service - ORDER Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1 Notice Date 02/25/2022. (Admin)
Related: [-] 38
Wednesday, February 23, 2022
38 38 3 pgs order Order (Generic) Wed 02/23 12:20 PM
Order Vacating February 24, 2022 Status Conference and March 9, 2022 Trial, and Notice to Defendant Regarding Obtaining Successor Counsel Related [+]. The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (tkb)
Related: [-] Doc23 ,29
37 37 court Minute Entry/Order Vacated Wed 02/23 8:53 AM
Minute Entry/Order: re: Trial Related [+]. Motion for summary judgment filed therefore the trial is vacated. (hmb)
Related: [-] 23
Tuesday, February 22, 2022
36 36 court Minute Entry/Order Vacated Tue 02/22 2:15 PM
Minute Entry/Order: re: Telephonic Pretrial Conference23 . Pretrial conference not needed. Hearing vacated. (hmb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 16, 2022
35 35 notice Summary Judgment Notice to Pro Se Party (S.D.Ind. B-7056-1) Wed 02/16 2:06 PM
Notice to Pro Se Party re: Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by David J. Jurkiewicz on behalf of Plaintiff Pier 48 Indy LLC Related [+]. (Jurkiewicz, David)
Related: [-] 33
34 34 misc Brief (including Response Brief, Reply Brief, Surreply Brief, etc.) Wed 02/16 10:55 AM
Brief in Support re: Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by David J. Jurkiewicz on behalf of Plaintiff Pier 48 Indy LLC Related [+]. (Jurkiewicz, David)
Related: [-] 33
33 33 motion Summary Judgment, Motion for Wed 02/16 10:53 AM
Motion for Summary Judgment filed by David J. Jurkiewicz on behalf of Plaintiff Pier 48 Indy LLC. Opposing Party's Response Brief due by 03/16/2022. (Jurkiewicz, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 10, 2022
32 32 order Authority, Order on Motion for Thu 02/10 5:08 PM
Order Granting Plaintiff's Verified Motion to Deem Requests Admitted Related [+]. Attorney for Plaintiff Pier 48 Indy LLC must distribute this order. (tkb)
Related: [-] 31
Monday, February 07, 2022
31 31 motion Authority, Motion for Mon 02/07 3:24 PM
Motion for Authority Plaintiff's Verified Motion to Deem Requests Admitted filed by David J. Jurkiewicz on behalf of Plaintiff Pier 48 Indy LLC. (Jurkiewicz, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 11, 2021
30 30 misc Certificate of Service Thu 11/11 11:13 AM
Certificate of Service re: Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, filed by Curt Derek Hochbein on behalf of Defendant Fredericus Jan Knipscheer Jr Related [+]. (Hochbein, Curt)
Related: [-] 29
Wednesday, November 10, 2021
29 29 order Withdraw as Attorney, Order on Motion to Wed 11/10 4:22 PM
Order Granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Related [+]. Attorney for Defendant Fredericus Jan Knipscheer Jr. must distribute this order. (hmb)
Related: [-] 28
Tuesday, November 09, 2021
28 28 motion Withdraw As Attorney, Motion to Tue 11/09 5:00 PM
Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Curt Derek Hochbein on behalf of Defendant Fredericus Jan Knipscheer Jr. (Hochbein, Curt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 19, 2021
27 27 court Minute Entry/Order Reschedule Due to Court Conflict Tue 10/19 11:24 AM
Pretrial conference set for 2/24/22 at 10:00 a.m. has been RESCHEDULED. No further notice will be issued. Minute Entry/Order: re: Pretrial conference Related [+]. Disposition: Rescheduled pretrial conference to be held on 02/24/2022 at 11:00 AM EST in Teleconference at 888-273-3658; access code 6349352. (hmb)
Related: [-] 23
Friday, August 27, 2021
26 26 misc Certificate of Service Fri 08/27 12:29 PM
Certificate of Service re: Order on Motion to Continue Hearing, Trial, Pretrial Conference or Status Conference, filed by Curt Derek Hochbein on behalf of Defendant Fredericus Jan Knipscheer Jr Related [+]. (Hochbein, Curt)
Related: [-] 23
Thursday, August 26, 2021
25 25 court Minute Entry/Order Vacated Thu 08/26 2:29 PM
Minute Entry/Order: re: Pre trial conference Related [+]. Motion to continue granted. Pre trial conference continued to 2/24/22 at 10:00 a.m. Order entered. Pre Trial conference vacated. (hmb)
Related: [-] 18
24 24 court Minute Entry/Order Vacated Thu 08/26 2:27 PM
Minute Entry/Order: re: Trial Related [+]. Motion to continue granted. Trial continued to 3/9/22 at 10:00 a.m. Order entered. Hearing vacated. (hmb)
Related: [-] 18
23 23 order Continue Hearing/Trial/Pretrial Conference/Status Conference, Order on Motion to Thu 08/26 1:33 PM
Order Granting Motion to Continue Trial and Pretrial Conference Related [+]. Trial date set on 3/9/2022 at 10:00 AM EST in Rm 325 U.S. Courthouse, Indianapolis. Pretrial Conference set on 2/24/2022 at 10:00 AM EST via a teleconference at 888-273-3658; access code 6349352. Trial time allotted is one (1) day. Exhibit List due by 2/23/2022. Witness List due by 2/23/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 2/16/2022. Stipulation of Facts due by 3/2/2022. Attorney for Defendant Fredericus Jan Knipscheer Jr. must distribute this order. (aeh)
Related: [-] 22
Friday, August 20, 2021
22 22 motion Continue Hearing/Trial/Pretrial Conference/Status Conference, Motion to Fri 08/20 1:33 PM
Joint Motion to Continue Trial filed by Curt Derek Hochbein on behalf of Defendant Fredericus Jan Knipscheer Jr Related [+]. (Hochbein, Curt)
Related: [-] 18
Friday, April 30, 2021
21 21 court Minute Entry/Order Vacated Fri 04/30 3:56 PM
Minute Entry/Order: re: Trial Related [+]. Trial continued to 10/27/21 at 10:00 a.m. Order entered 4/29/21. Hearing vacated. (hmb)
Related: [-] 13
20 20 court Minute Entry/Order Vacated Fri 04/30 3:27 PM
Minute Entry/Order: re: Pre trial conference Related [+]. Pretrial conference reset for 10/4/21 at 10:00 a.m. Order entered 4/29/21. Hearing vacated. (hmb)
Related: [-] 13
Thursday, April 29, 2021
19 19 misc Certificate of Service Thu 04/29 3:31 PM
Certificate of Service re: Order on Motion to Continue Hearing, Trial, Pretrial Conference or Status Conference, filed by Curt Derek Hochbein on behalf of Defendant Fredericus Jan Knipscheer Jr Related [+]. (Hochbein, Curt)
Related: [-] 18
18 18 order Continue Hearing/Trial/Pretrial Conference/Status Conference, Order on Motion to Thu 04/29 3:05 PM
Order Granting Motion to Continue Trial and Pretrial Conference Related [+]. Trial date set on 10/27/2021 at 10:00 AM EDT in Rm 325 U.S. Courthouse, Indianapolis. Pretrial Conference set on 10/4/2021 at 10:00 AM EDT via a teleconference at 888-273-3658; access code 6349352. Trial time allotted is one (1) day. Exhibit List due by 10/13/2021. Witness List due by 10/13/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 10/6/2021. Stipulation of Facts due by 10/20/2021. Attorney for Defendant Fredericus Jan Knipscheer Jr. must distribute this order. (aeh)
Related: [-] 17
Tuesday, April 27, 2021
17 17 motion Continue Hearing/Trial/Pretrial Conference/Status Conference, Motion to Tue 04/27 2:25 PM
Agreed Motion to Continue Trial filed by Curt Derek Hochbein on behalf of Defendant Fredericus Jan Knipscheer Jr Related [+]. (Hochbein, Curt)
Related: [-] 15
Monday, February 08, 2021
16 16 court Minute Entry/Order Continued Tue 02/09 8:34 AM
Minute Entry/Order: re: Status conference Related [+]. Disposition: Status conference held. Pretrial Conference set on 06/10/2021 at 10:00 AM EDT in Teleconference at 888-273-3658; access code 6349352. Trial date set on 06/24/2021 at 10:00 AM EDT in Rm 325 U.S. Courthouse, Indianapolis. Court to issue scheduling order. (hmb)
Related: [-] 13
15 15 order Scheduling Order Mon 02/08 2:10 PM
Order Scheduling Trial and Pretrial Conference and Establishing Deadlines Related [+]. Trial date set on 6/24/2021 at 10:00 AM EDT in Rm 325 U.S. Courthouse, Indianapolis. Pretrial Conference set on 6/10/2021 at 10:00 AM EDT via a teleconference at 888-273-3658; access code 6349352. Trial time allotted is one (1) day. Exhibit List due by 6/8/2021. Witness List due by 6/8/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 6/3/2021. Stipulation of Facts due by 6/17/2021. The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (aeh)
Related: [-] 1
Monday, November 09, 2020
14 14 court Minute Entry/Order Continued Mon 11/09 10:27 AM
Minute Entry/Order: re: Status conference Related [+]. Disposition: Status conference held and continued to 02/08/2021 at 10:00 AM EST in Teleconference at 888-273-3658; access code 6349352. (hmb)
Related: [-] 13
Friday, October 16, 2020
13 13 court Notice w/options for Hearings/Conferences/Etc. Fri 10/16 7:57 AM
Notice of Status Teleconference. Status teleconference to be held on 11/9/2020 at 10:00 AM EST via a teleconference at 888-273-3658; access code 6349352. (hmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 15, 2020
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 10/15 2:37 PM
Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Curt Derek Hochbein on behalf of Defendant Fredericus Jan Knipscheer Jr Related [+]. (Hochbein, Curt)
Related: [-] 6
Monday, September 14, 2020
11 11 notice Extension of Time to File, Notice of Mon 09/14 2:24 PM
Notice of Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Curt Derek Hochbein on behalf of Defendant Fredericus Jan Knipscheer Jr Related [+]. Adversary Answer due by 10/16/2020. (Hochbein, Curt)
Related: [-] 1
10 10 notice Appearance Mon 09/14 2:17 PM
Appearance filed by Curt Derek Hochbein on behalf of Defendant Fredericus Jan Knipscheer Jr. (Hochbein, Curt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 26, 2020
9 9 cmp Summons Certificate of Service Wed 08/26 6:35 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: Fredericus Jan Knipscheer, Jr Related [+]. (Jurkiewicz, David)
Related: [-] 8
Wednesday, August 19, 2020
8 8 court Summons Issued - Original/Alias Wed 08/19 5:21 PM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004. Service to be completed by 08/26/2020 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 09/02/2020 . Adversary Answer due by 9/18/2020. (tkb)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Wed 08/19 1:26 PM
Certificate of Service re: Appearance, filed by David J. Jurkiewicz on behalf of Plaintiff Pier 48 Indy LLC Related [+]. (Jurkiewicz, David)
Related: [-] 3
Tuesday, August 11, 2020
6 6 misc Amended Complaint Tue 08/11 11:36 AM
Amended Complaint (no parties added), filed by David J. Jurkiewicz on behalf of Plaintiff Pier 48 Indy LLC Related [+]. (Jurkiewicz, David)
Related: [-] 1
Monday, August 10, 2020
5 5 court Consent Language Notice Mon 08/10 1:09 PM
Notice re: Consent Language Related [+]. An amended document must be filed by 08/24/2020. (tkb)
Related: [-] 1
4 4 court Deficiency Notice - Miscellaneous Mon 08/10 1:07 PM
Deficiency Notice Issued re: Appearance Related [+]. Deficiency to be cured by 8/24/2020. (tkb)
Related: [-] 3
Friday, August 07, 2020
3 3 notice Appearance Fri 08/07 5:53 PM
Appearance filed by David J. Jurkiewicz on behalf of Plaintiff Pier 48 Indy LLC. (Jurkiewicz, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Fri 08/07 5:51 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FRBP 7007.1 filed by David J. Jurkiewicz on behalf of Plaintiff Pier 48 Indy LLC. (Jurkiewicz, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/07 5:47 PM
Adversary case 20-50114 Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Pier 48 Indy LLC against Defendant(s) Fredericus Jan Knipscheer Jr. [62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)], [67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)], [68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)]. (Jurkiewicz, David)
Related: [-]