Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Rodney Smith
Case #: 0:20-cv-61616
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Case Filed:Aug 10, 2020
Terminated:Mar 18, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Feb 06, 2021 3:34 AM EST
Defendant
Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By
Jeannine Cline Jacobson
Maynard, Cooper & Gale, P. C.
contact info
Latanae L. Parker
Maynard, Cooper & Gale, P.C.
contact info
Mediator
Robert A. Dulberg
Salmon & Dulberg 19 W Flagler St. Suite 620
Miami, FL 33130
Plaintiff
Quiana Carter
Represented By
Gregory Michael Dell
Dell & Schaefer
contact info
Alexander Arthur Palamara
Dell & Schaefer
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, April 07, 2021
24 24 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 04/08 8:28 AM
ORDER OF FINAL DISMISSAL. This action is DISMISSED with prejudice. All pending motions not otherwise ruled upon are DENIED as moot. This case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 4/7/2021. See attached document for full details. (scn)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Stipulation of Dismissal - aty Wed 04/07 11:25 AM
Joint STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Quiana Carter(Palamara, Alexander) Modified Text on 4/7/2021 (ls)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, March 18, 2021
22 22 order Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Fri 03/19 7:36 AM
Notice of Court Practice on Notice of Settlement; Parties Stipulation of Dismissal due 4/9/2021; Case is Closed. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 3/18/2021. See attached document for full details. (ls)
Related: [-]
21 21 adr Mediation Report Thu 03/18 4:44 PM
MEDIATION REPORT by Robert A. Dulberg. Disposition: Settled in full.(Salmon, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 02, 2021
20 20 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 02/02 6:33 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING19 Joint Motion to Conduct Mediation by Videoconference. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 2/2/2021. (zgs)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 02/02 10:19 AM
Joint MOTION TO CONDUCT MEDIATION BY VIDEOCONFERENCE by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Parker, Latanae)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 29, 2021
18 18 adr Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing Fri 01/29 3:00 PM
Joint NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added ROBERT A. DULBERG as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for March 17, 2021 at 1:00 p.m..(Parker, Latanae)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
17 17 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 01/29 1:54 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Latanae L. Parker on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Parker, Latanae)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 27, 2021
16 16 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mediation Wed 01/27 8:37 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Mediation Deadline 3/26/2021. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 1/27/2021. See attached document for full details. (scn)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 22, 2021
15 15 order Scheduling Order Fri 01/22 3:13 PM
ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL DEADLINES: Jury Trial set for 8/30/2021 before Judge Rodney Smith. Calendar Call set for 8/24/2021 9:00 AM before Judge Rodney Smith. Amended Pleadings due by 1/30/2021. Expert Discovery due by 2/19/2021. Fact Discovery due by 2/19/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 1/30/2021. Mediation Deadline 3/26/2021. In Limine Motions due by 5/30/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 4/26/2021. Motions due by 4/26/2021. Pretrial Stipulation due by 7/30/2021. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 1/22/2021. See attached document for full details. (scn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 15, 2020
14 14 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 10/15 11:08 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Latanae L. Parker on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Attorney Latanae L. Parker added to party Metropolitan Life Insurance Company(pty:dft). (Parker, Latanae)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 14, 2020
13 13 misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Wed 10/14 4:16 PM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Quiana Carter(Palamara, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
12 12 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 10/14 4:14 PM
Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Metlife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Jacobson, Jeannine)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 01, 2020
11 11 7 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Thu 10/01 1:53 PM
ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT, CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS. Joint Scheduling Report due by 10/14/2020. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 10/1/2020. See attached document for full details. (scn)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 21, 2020
10 10 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 09/21 10:23 AM
Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Quiana Carter (Palamara, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 14, 2020
9 9 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 09/14 3:14 PM
Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Metlife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Jacobson, Jeannine)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 09/14 3:07 PM
Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Jacobson, Jeannine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 01, 2020
7 7 notice Clerk's Notice - Attorney Admissions Tue 09/01 3:09 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has not updated address and/or email information for attorney Jeannine Cline Jacobson re6 Notice of Change of Address. Attorney has not followed the required procedures for updating their information with the Court. Attorney is instructed to go to their PACER account, Manage My Account, to complete the process of updating their information. The attorney is responsible for ensuring they apply their updates to all of their cases. The Court is not responsible for updating secondary email addresses. See the Courts website for detailed instructions.[LINK:www.flsd.uscourts.gov/updating-your-information] (cw)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Change of Address Tue 09/01 12:09 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Jeannine Cline Jacobson (Jacobson, Jeannine)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 27, 2020
5 5 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Thu 08/27 4:10 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Quiana Carter. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company served on 8/24/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Palamara, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 17, 2020
4 4 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 08/17 9:43 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeannine Cline Jacobson on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Attorney Jeannine Cline Jacobson added to party Metropolitan Life Insurance Company(pty:dft). (Jacobson, Jeannine)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 10, 2020
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 08/10 2:53 PM
Summons Issued as to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (scn)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Mon 08/10 2:49 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (scn)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 08/10 2:16 PM
COMPLAINT against Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13323949, filed by Quiana Carter.(Palamara, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s)