Amelio v. Fischer & Burstein, P.C., et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Louis L Stanton |
Case #: | 1:20-cv-06277 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Aug 10, 2020 |
Terminated: | Mar 01, 2021 |
Last checked: Saturday Feb 06, 2021 3:34 AM EST |
Defendant
Harry H. Burstein
|
|
Defendant
Fischer & Burstein, P.C.
|
|
Defendant
Adriana Rodriguez
|
|
Plaintiff
Alfonso Amelio
32 Main Street
Milford, CT 06776 |
|
Plaintiff
Carmine P. Amelio
32 Main Street New Milford
Milford, CT 06776 |
|
Plaintiff
Paul Amelio
32 Main Street
New Milford, CT 06776 |
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, October 28, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
appeal
USCA Mandate
Thu 10/28 11:36 AM
MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to11 Notice of Appeal, filed by Alfonso Amelio, Carmine P. Amelio, Paul Amelio. USCA Case Number 21-1204 Ordered that the appeal is DISMISSED.. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 10/28/2021..(nd) |
|
Tuesday, May 04, 2021 | ||
misc
Mail Order by USPS
Tue 05/04 2:36 PM
Mailed a copy of12 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, to Carmine P. Amelio at 32 Main Street, New Milford, Milford, CT 06776; Alfonso Amelio at 32 Main Street, Milford, CT 06776; Paul Amelio at 32 Main Street, New Milford, CT 06776. (dsh) |
||
Monday, May 03, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Tue 05/04 1:38 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Notice of Appeal. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiffs and note service on the docket. The Court grants Plaintiff Carmine Amelio's motion for an extension of time to appeal (ECF No. 10). The notice of appeal Plaintiffs filed on April 30, 2021 was timely filed. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 5/3/2021) (sac) |
|
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Mon 05/03 9:23 AM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re:11 Notice of Appeal,..(nd) |
||
appeal
Appeal Record Sent to USCA - Electronic File
Mon 05/03 9:24 AM
Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for11 Notice of Appeal, filed by Alfonso Amelio, Carmine P. Amelio, Paul Amelio were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals..(nd) |
||
Friday, April 30, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Mon 05/03 9:23 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL from8 Order of Dismissal,9 Judgment. Document filed by Alfonso Amelio, Paul Amelio, Carmine P. Amelio. Form D-P is due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit..(nd) |
|
Att: 1 Motion IFP, | ||
Att: 2 IFP application Alfonso Amelio, | ||
Att: 3 IFP application Carmine Amelio, | ||
Att: 4 IFP Application Paul Amelio | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Mon 05/03 9:13 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Notice of Appeal. Document filed by Carmine P. Amelio..(nd) |
|
appeal
Appeal Fee Not Required
Mon 05/03 9:25 AM
Appeal Fee Not Required for11 Notice of Appeal. Application to proceed In Forma Pauperis granted on 2/23/2021..(nd) |
||
Tuesday, March 02, 2021 | ||
misc
Mail Order by USPS
Tue 03/02 9:58 AM
Mailed a copy of8 Order of Dismissal,9 Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint), to Carmine P. Amelio at 32 Main Street, New Milford, Milford, CT 06776; Alfonso Amelio at 32 Main Street, Milford, CT 06776; Paul Amelio at 32 Main Street, New Milford, CT 06776. (dsh) |
||
Monday, March 01, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
order
Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint)
Tue 03/02 9:26 AM
CIVIL JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the complaint is dismissed under Rule 12(h)(3) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court mail a copy of this judgment to Plaintiffs and note service on the docket. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 3/1/2021) (sac) |
|
Att: 1 Pro Se Appeal Package | ||
8 | 8
7
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal
Tue 03/02 9:23 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court directs the Clerk of Court to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiffs and note service on the docket. The Court dismisses this action for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(h)(3). All other pending matters in this action are terminated (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 3/1/2021) (sac) |
|
notice
Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment - Sua Sponte
Mon 03/01 10:53 AM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Louis L. Stanton. Judge Colleen McMahon is no longer assigned to the case. (vba) |
||
Tuesday, February 23, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order Granting IFP Application
Tue 02/23 10:26 AM
ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. § 1915. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/23/2021) (vn) |
|
Wednesday, October 21, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 10/22 8:33 AM
APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS. Document filed by Paul Amelio.(sc) |
|
Monday, October 19, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 10/20 7:51 AM
APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS. Document filed by Alfonso Amelio.(sc) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 10/19 2:37 PM
APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS. Document filed by Carmine P. Amelio.(sc) |
|
Friday, August 28, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application
Fri 08/28 7:46 AM
ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEE OR IFP APPLICATION: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this Order to each plaintiff and note service on the docket. Plaintiffs are directed to render payment of the filing fees or each submit an IFP application to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States , 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 9/28/2020. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 9/28/2020. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/28/2020) (ees) |
|
Att: 1 IFP application | ||
misc
Mail Order by USPS
Fri 08/28 8:35 AM
Mailed a copy of3 Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application, to Carmine P. Amelio at 32 Main Street, New Milford, Milford, CT 06776; Alfonso Amelio at 32 Main Street, Milford, CT 06776; Paul Amelio at 32 Main Street, New Milford, CT 06776. (dsh) |
||
Thursday, August 27, 2020 | ||
notice
Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment - Sua Sponte
Thu 08/27 3:26 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(bcu) |
||
Monday, August 10, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Mon 08/10 4:18 PM
COMPLAINT against Harry H. Burstein, Fischer & Burstein, P.C., Adriana Rodriguez. Document filed by Carmine P. Amelio, Paul Amelio, Alfonso Amelio..(rdz) |
|
1 | 1
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 08/10 4:17 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (rdz) |
|
utility
Case Designated ECF
Mon 08/10 4:24 PM
Case Designated ECF. (rdz) |