Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jerry A Funk
Case #: 3:20-bk-02387
Case Filed:Aug 12, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors5,001-10,000
Est. Assets$500,000,001 to $1 billion
Est. Liabilities $500,000,001 to $1 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Stein Mart, Inc.
1200 Riverplace Blvd
Jacksonville, FL 32207-9046
Represented By
Mark J. Wolfson
Foley & Lardner
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - JAX 11
Office of the United States Trustee George C Young Federal Building 400 West Washington Street, Suite 1100
Orlando, FL 32801

GPO Mar 29 2021
Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law (related document(s)936, 934, 848). Service Instructions: Mark Wolfson is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)

1. Stein Mart, Inc. Voluntarily Files Chapter 11 Bankruptcy (globenewswire.com)
Submitted Wed 08/12/2020
Docket last updated: 56 minutes ago
Monday, April 21, 2025
1684 1684 misc Statement (BK) Mon 04/21 1:47 PM
Statement Plan Administrator's Quarterly Statement of Professional Fees and Expenses for the Quarter Ending March 31, 2025 Filed by Ronald E Gold on behalf of Other Prof. Advisory Trust Group, LLC. (Gold, Ronald)
Related: [-]
1683 1683 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Mon 04/21 1:39 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 20-02388 for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2025 Filed by Ronald E Gold on behalf of Other Prof. Advisory Trust Group, LLC. (Gold, Ronald)
Related: [-]
1682 1682 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Mon 04/21 1:37 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 20-02389 for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2025 Filed by Ronald E Gold on behalf of Other Prof. Advisory Trust Group, LLC. (Gold, Ronald)
Related: [-]
1681 1681 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Mon 04/21 1:36 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2025 Filed by Ronald E Gold on behalf of Other Prof. Advisory Trust Group, LLC. (Gold, Ronald)
Related: [-]