New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Roanne L Mann
Referred: Roanne L Mann
Case #: 1:20-cv-03638
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim
Case Filed:Aug 12, 2020
Terminated:Jun 04, 2021
Last checked: Monday Feb 08, 2021 3:19 AM EST
Defendant
Alana Byam
Represented By
Jonathan Adam Siegel
New York State Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Marcella Ilori
Represented By
Jonathan Adam Siegel
New York State Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Devon John
Represented By
Jonathan Adam Siegel
New York State Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
SUNY Downstate Health Sciences University
Represented By
Jonathan Adam Siegel
New York State Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Dara Stephenson
Represented By
Jonathan Adam Siegel
New York State Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
Christina Sierra
Represented By
Adena L. Wayne
New York Legal Assistance Group
contact info
Susan Victoria Hazeldean
Bls Legal Services Corporation
contact info
Anamaria Segura
New York Legal Assistance Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, June 04, 2021
43 43 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 06/04 9:46 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: the parties' Settlement Agreement [42-1] is so-ordered. The claims against defendants are dismissed with prejudice against defendants pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) and without payments, attorneys' fees, costs, disbursements, or expenses in excess of the amounts set forth in Paragraph 3 of the Settlement Agreement. The Clerk of Court is directed to mark this case as closed. See attached . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 6/4/2021. (Proujansky, Josh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 03, 2021
42 42 1 pgs misc Settlement Agreement Thu 06/03 10:40 AM
SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT with Tranmittal Letter by Alana Byam, Marcella Ilori, Devon John, SUNY Downstate Health Sciences University, Dara Stephenson (Siegel, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 24 pgs Exhibit Settlement Agreement
Thursday, May 06, 2021
order Order(Other) Thu 05/06 1:33 PM
ORDER re41 Settlement Conference. The parties have informed this Court that they have accepted its settlement proposal. They are directed to file a Stipulation of Discontinuance with the Clerk of the Court via ECF no later than June 7, 2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 5/6/2021. (Proujansky, Josh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 05, 2021
41 41 1 pgs minutes Settlement Conference Wed 05/05 4:00 PM
Minute Entry for Settlement Conference held before Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 5/5/2021. Settlement discussions held. Each party is directed to respond to the Court's settlement recommendation, via email, by 5:00 p.m. tomorrow. See attached . (Proujansky, Josh)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 03, 2021
40 40 2 pgs misc Letter Mon 05/03 3:52 PM
Letter in response to April 29, 2021 Order by Alana Byam, Marcella Ilori, Devon John, SUNY Downstate Health Sciences University, Dara Stephenson (Siegel, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 30, 2021
38 38 motion Leave to File Document Fri 04/30 5:36 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Document Ex Parte for May 5 Settlement Conference by Alana Byam, Marcella Ilori, Devon John, SUNY Downstate Health Sciences University, Dara Stephenson. (Siegel, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
37 37 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 04/30 2:08 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re35 MOTION to Compel filed by All Defendants. (Siegel, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's First Document Request,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiff's First Interrogatories
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Fri 04/30 6:15 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part38 Motion for Leave to File. The parties may submit via email a settlement statement in advance of the conference, but not on an ex parte basis. The request to proceed remotely is granted, either by videoconference or telephone, with counsel to promptly confer regarding the preferred method. Chambers will contact the parties separately regarding logistics. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 4/30/2021. (Proujansky, Josh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 29, 2021
order Scheduling Order Thu 04/29 12:36 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER re34 MOTION to Compel filed by defendants. In response to defendants' motion to compel documents withheld by plaintiff on privilege grounds (DE #34), plaintiff's counsel inquired as to the method by which the March 18, 2019 letter at issue should be submitted to the Court for in camera review and, inter alia , suggested that the Court need not address defendants' challenge to the withholding of documents shared with the New York City Commission on Human Rights, as defendants already obtained those documents from the NYCCHR ( see DE #36 at 2). By May 3, 2021, plaintiff is directed to file the aforesaid 3/18/19 letter ex parte via ECF. By that same date, defendants shall file a letter stating whether or not defendants have in fact obtained each of the documents sought from the NYCCHR; defendants shall further advise whether the redactions in the documents obtained from the NYCCHR are limited to the names of the parties and whether the redactions render the documents unintelligible. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 4/29/2021. (Proujansky, Josh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 28, 2021
36 36 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 04/28 4:57 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re34 MOTION to Compel filed by Christina Sierra. (Wayne, Adena)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Monday, April 26, 2021
35 35 motion Compel Mon 04/26 8:03 PM
MOTION to Compel by Christina Sierra. (Wayne, Adena)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Defendants' Responses to Plaintiff's First Document Requests,
Att: 2 Exhibit Defendants' Responses to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories,
Att: 3 Exhibit Defendants' Privilege Log,
Att: 4 Exhibit Plaintiff's Letter in Renz v. SUNY
order Order on Motion to Compel Mon 04/26 1:04 PM
ORDER deferring ruling on34 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff's response is due by April 28, 2021 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 4/26/2021. (LK)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 23, 2021
34 34 motion Compel Fri 04/23 5:56 PM
MOTION to Compel by Alana Byam, Marcella Ilori, Devon John, SUNY Downstate Health Sciences University, Dara Stephenson. (Siegel, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Privilege Log
Wednesday, March 24, 2021
33 33 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Discovery Wed 03/24 4:41 PM
ORDER32 Motion for Discovery. Is so-ordered. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 3/24/2021. (LK)
Related: [-]
32 32 motion Discovery Wed 03/24 3:25 PM
Joint MOTION for Discovery by Christina Sierra. (Wayne, Adena)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Regarding Medical Records and HIPAA
Friday, March 19, 2021
31 31 misc Letter Fri 03/19 4:17 PM
Letter to Correct A Misstatement of Fact Made By Plaintiff's Counsel by Christina Sierra (Hazeldean, Susan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 16, 2021
30 30 minutes Telephone Conference Tue 03/16 6:12 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on March 16, 2021: The Court hears argument on defendants' motion to compel (DE #27 ) and, for the reasons stated on the record, grants it in limited part only. The parties are directed to confer and to submit the proposed orders discussed at the conference by March 26, 2021. See attached . (GM)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Discovery Tue 03/16 6:21 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part27 Motion for Discovery: For the reasons stated on the record during the March 16, 2021 telephone conference, the Court grants defendants' motion to compel (DE #27 ) in limited part only, and directs the parties to confer and to submit the proposed orders discussed during the hearing by March 26, 2021. See 3/16/2021 Minute Entry, DE #30 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 3/16/2021. (GM)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 15, 2021
order Scheduling Order Mon 03/15 1:47 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for March 16, 2021 at 4:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. To dial in to the conference, the parties are directed to call (877) 336-1839 and type in the access code 6672833. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 3/15/2021. (GM)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 12, 2021
29 29 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 03/12 6:28 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re28 Motion to Compel, 1 - Sealed Document CV filed by Christina Sierra. (Hazeldean, Susan)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 08, 2021
28 28 motion Compel 1 - Sealed Document - to be used ONLY in conjunction with other selection Mon 03/08 3:59 PM
MOTION to Compel by Alana Byam, Marcella Ilori, Devon John, SUNY Downstate Health Sciences University, Dara Stephenson. (Siegel, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Pl Resp to RFP,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Sealed Confidential Documents
order Order on Motion for Hearing Mon 03/08 9:16 AM
ORDER finding as moot23 Motion for Hearing. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 3/8/2021. (LK)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Discovery Mon 03/08 9:17 AM
ORDER deferring ruling on27 Motion for Discovery. Confidential materials contained in exhibits to a motion to compel should not be furnished to the Court by email, outside the record. The movant is authorized and directed to electronically file Exhibit 2, with access restricted to counsel of record and court users. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 3/8/2021. (LK)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Compel Order on Motion for Discovery Mon 03/08 6:00 PM
ORDER deferring ruling on27 ,28 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff's response to defendants' motion (DE #27/#28) is due by March 12, 2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 3/8/2021. (Proujansky, Josh)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 05, 2021
27 27 motion Discovery Fri 03/05 2:33 PM
MOTION for Discovery by Alana Byam, Marcella Ilori, Devon John, SUNY Downstate Health Sciences University, Dara Stephenson. (Siegel, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Pl Resp to RFP,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Confidential - Attached to Courtesy Copy
Friday, February 19, 2021
26 26 order Order(Other) Fri 02/19 4:43 PM
ORDER re25 allowing law student appearances in this case. See attached . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 2/19/2021. (GM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Admission Information
25 25 misc Letter Fri 02/19 3:31 PM
Letter addressed to Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann from Susan V. Hazeldean dated February 19, 2021 re: student appearance forms by Christina Sierra (Hazeldean, Susan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Law Student Intern Appearance Form - Andrew Russell,
Att: 2 Law Student Intern Appearance Form - Maya Ureno-Dembar
Thursday, January 28, 2021
order Order on Motion for Hearing Thu 01/28 11:07 AM
ORDER24 Motion for Hearing. Application granted. A settlement conference will be held on May 5, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. As the date approaches, counsel will be provided with logistical details, including whether the proceeding will be held in person or remotely. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 1/28/2021. (LK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 27, 2021
24 24 motion Hearing Wed 01/27 2:55 PM
Joint MOTION for Hearing - Settlement Conference (Clarifying ECF No. 23) by Christina Sierra. (Wayne, Adena)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 22, 2021
23 23 motion Hearing Fri 01/22 12:24 PM
Joint MOTION for Hearing - Settlement Conference by Christina Sierra. (Wayne, Adena)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Hearing Fri 01/22 5:13 PM
ORDER deferring ruling on23 Motion for Hearing. The parties' request for a settlement conference does not specify approximately when they anticipate they will have conducted sufficient discovery to have meaningful settlement discussions, nor do they clarify whether they would prefer to have another magistrate judge conduct the conference, inasmuch as this is a section 636 consent case. The parties shall confer and file a joint letter clarifying these matters by January 27, 2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 1/22/2021. (Proujansky, Josh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 22, 2020
order Order on Motion for Protective Order Tue 12/22 6:56 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting22 Motion for Protective Order. The Court so-orders DE #22-1. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 12/22/2020. (Proujansky, Josh)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 21, 2020
22 22 motion Protective Order Mon 12/21 7:20 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Alana Byam, Marcella Ilori, Devon John, SUNY Downstate Health Sciences University, Dara Stephenson. (Siegel, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Revised Confidentiality Agreement & Proposed Order (Replacing ECF No. 21-1),
Att: 2 Exhibit Redline Showing Changes to Revised Confidentiality Agreement & Proposed Order
21 21 motion Protective Order Mon 12/21 7:46 AM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Alana Byam, Marcella Ilori, Devon John, SUNY Downstate Health Sciences University, Dara Stephenson. (Siegel, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Confidentiality Agreement & Order,
Att: 2 Proposed Order FRE 502(d) Order
order Order on Motion for Protective Order Mon 12/21 1:55 PM
ORDER21 Motion for Protective Order. Granting in part, deferring decision in part on #21: Having reviewed the parties' two stipulations (DE #21-1 and #21-2), the Court so-orders DE #21-2 but identifies several issues in connection with DE #21-1: Section 4(d) includes a reference to Section 15 that may be a typo. Section 10(b) concerns filings under seal, which should be done electronically. Section 26 does not apply to the Court's copies of such materials. Changes pursuant to Section 28 must be approved by the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 12/21/2020. (LK)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 20, 2020
20 20 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Fri 11/20 10:34 AM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann for all further proceedings. Judge Frederic Block no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Marziliano, August)
Related: [-]
utility Case No Longer Referred Fri 11/20 10:34 AM
Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. (Marziliano, August)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 19, 2020
19 19 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Thu 11/19 6:30 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Alana Byam, Marcella Ilori, Devon John, SUNY Downstate Health Sciences University, Dara Stephenson. (Siegel, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 17, 2020
18 18 minutes Initial Conference Hearing Tue 11/17 6:06 PM
Minute Entry for Initial Conference Hearing held on 11/17/2020 before Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. The parties advise that they will file a section 636 consent form. Pleadings may be amended and new parties added as of right by December 31, 2020. Fact discovery must be completed by May 21, 2021. Absent further court order, requests for a premotion conference are due by July 30, 2021. By January 22, 2021, the parties must file a joint letter-motion requesting a settlement conference (with the undersigned or another magistrate judge) or a referral to court-annexed mediation. The parties' submission should also indicate whether plaintiff intends to use a medical or psychiatric expert. If plaintiff intends to use an expert, plaintiff's expert disclosures must be served by May 21, 2021, defendants' expert disclosures must be served by June 21, 2021, and expert depositions must be completed by July 20, 2021. See attached for further details . (Proujansky, Josh)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 16, 2020
17 17 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Mon 11/16 1:56 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Wayne, Adena)
Related: [-]
order Order(Other) Mon 11/16 11:44 AM
ORDER [16-1] & [16-2] are so ordered.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 11/16/2020. (LK)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 13, 2020
16 16 misc Letter Fri 11/13 5:48 PM
Letter addressed to Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann from Susan V. Hazeldean dated November 13, 2020 re: student appearance forms by Christina Sierra (Hazeldean, Susan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Law Student Intern Appearance Form - Amal Alzendani,
Att: 2 Law Student Intern Appearance Form - Sheilagh Lichtenfels
Thursday, October 22, 2020
15 15 misc Letter Thu 10/22 5:43 PM
Letter addressed to Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann from Susan V. Hazeldean dated October 22, 2020 re: student appearance forms by Christina Sierra (Hazeldean, Susan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Law Student Intern Appearance Form - Amal Alzendani,
Att: 2 Law Student Intern Appearance Form - Sheilagh Lichtenfels
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/22 5:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Susan Victoria Hazeldean on behalf of Christina Sierra (notification declined or already on case) (Hazeldean, Susan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 20, 2020
13 13 motion Adjourn Conference Tue 10/20 2:28 PM
Consent MOTION to Adjourn Conference and interim deadlines by 2 weeks by Alana Byam, Marcella Ilori, Devon John, SUNY Downstate Health Sciences University, Dara Stephenson. (Siegel, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Tue 10/20 5:18 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting in substantial part, on consent13 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The October 27th initial conference is adjourned to Tuesday, November 17, 2020, at noon. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 10/20/2020. (Proujansky, Josh)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 19, 2020
12 12 order Scheduling Order Mon 10/19 7:28 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Order: A telephonic initial conference will be held on October 27, 2020 @ 2:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. SEE ATTACHED: ORDER, INITIAL CONFERENCE QUESTIONNAIRE, AND MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR CONFERENCE. Counsel are directed to confer to jointly fill out and docket the attached questionnaire by close of business October 26, 2020 @ 4:00 p.m. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 10/19/2020. (GM)
Related: [-]
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 10/19 4:45 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants. (Siegel, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/19 4:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Adam Siegel on behalf of Alana Byam, Marcella Ilori, Devon John, Dara Stephenson (aty to be noticed) (Siegel, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 23, 2020
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/23 10:51 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Anamaria Segura on behalf of Christina Sierra (aty to be noticed) (Segura, Anamaria)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 22, 2020
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/22 5:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Adena L. Wayne on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Wayne, Adena)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 09/22 5:28 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Devon John, Marcella Ilori, Alana Byam, SUNY Downstate Health Sciences University, Dara Stephenson. All Defendants. (Wayne, Adena)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 14, 2020
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 08/14 10:13 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer obo all defendants by SUNY Downstate Health Sciences University. (Siegel, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 08/14 9:53 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer obo all defendants by SUNY Downstate Health Sciences University. (Siegel, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 08/14 10:01 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: The defendants letter application 9 for an extension of time to serve and file an answer is DENIED without prejudice to re-file their application addressed to MJ Mann who will be handling all pre-trial matters in this litigation. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 8/14/2020. (Innelli, Michael)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 08/14 2:03 PM
ORDER6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application granted, on consent. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 8/14/2020. (LK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 12, 2020
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 08/12 4:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Adam Siegel on behalf of SUNY Downstate Health Sciences University (notification declined or already on case) (Siegel, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service of Notice of Removal, Notice of Appearance
3 3 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Wed 08/12 4:33 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Wed 08/12 4:33 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 08/12 3:49 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SUNY Downstate Health Sciences University from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Kings, case number 508650/2020. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-13200414) (Siegel, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 08/12 4:32 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]