Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:20-bk-07626

Arizona Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Daniel P Collins
Case #: 3:20-ap-00224
Nature of Suit91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 11, 2020
Terminated:Dec 31, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
U & M Enterprises, LLC
Uri Shemesh, Statutory Agent 4408 N. 12th Street, Ste. 200
Phoenix, AZ 85014
Represented By
U & M Enterprises, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Uri Shemesh
3240 E. Camelback Rd, #101
Phoenix, AZ 85018
Represented By
Uri Shemesh
contact info
Defendant
Bobby Barnes and Associates, LLC
1849 E. Morten Ave., #170
Phoenix, AZ 85020
Represented By
Bobby Barnes and Associates, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Bobby Barnes
1849 E. Morten Ave., #170
Phoenix, AZ 85020
Represented By
Bobby Barnes
contact info
Defendant
JEBS Management LLC
6846 N. 3rd Ave.
Phoenix, AZ 85013
Represented By
JEBS Management LLC
contact info
Defendant
Michael L. Yancey
6848 N. 3rd Ave.
Phoenix, AZ 85013
Represented By
Michael L. Yancey
contact info
Plaintiff
Gary William Carder
3060 W. Old Ranch Rd.
Prescott, AZ 86305
Represented By
GERVAIS R. BRAND
Brand And Associates, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Thursday, December 31, 2020
47 47 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 01/02 10:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 46 Order Dismissing Adversary
46 46 order oDismissing Adversary Thu 12/31 10:10 AM
ORDER Dismissing Adversary signed on 12/31/2020 Related [+] . (Stangret, Wesley)
Related: [-] 43 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
court Close Adversary Thu 12/31 10:14 AM
Adversary Terminated . (Stangret, Wesley)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 21, 2020
45 45 notice Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of) Tue 12/22 10:10 AM
Amended Notice of Lodging Proposed Order (to include main case number) filed by Gary William Carder Related [+]. (Radicke-Stevenson, Michelle)
Related: [-] 44 Notice of Lodging Proposed Order
44 44 notice Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of) Tue 12/22 9:54 AM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order filed by Gary William Carder Related [+]. (Radicke-Stevenson, Michelle)
Related: [-] 43 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
43 43 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Motion to) Tue 12/22 9:52 AM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Gary William Carder Related [+]. (Radicke-Stevenson, Michelle)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, December 15, 2020
42 42 answer Objection Tue 12/15 11:58 AM
Objection to Motion/Application Related [+] filed by ALAN A. MEDA of Burch & Cracchiolo PA on behalf of Uri Shemesh, U & M Enterprises, LLC. (MEDA, ALAN)
Related: [-] lated to motions(s)36
Thursday, December 10, 2020
41 41 order oWithdraw as Attorney Thu 12/10 8:30 AM
ORDER Granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney In Adversary Proceeding Only (With Consent) ((Related Doc #39 ) signed on 12/10/2020 . (Brenner, Christel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 09, 2020
40 40 notice Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of) Wed 12/09 8:55 PM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Approving Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Debtor/Plaintiff Gary Carder in the Adversary Proceeding Only (With Consent) filed by GERVAIS R. BRAND of BRAND AND ASSOCIATES, PLLC on behalf of Gary William Carder. (BRAND, GERVAIS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order Approving Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Debtor/Plaintiff Gary Carder in the Adversary Proceeding Only (With Consent)
39 39 motion Withdraw as Attorney (Motion to) Wed 12/09 8:46 PM
Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Debtor/Plaintiff Gary Carder in Adversary Proceeding Only (With Consent) filed by GERVAIS R. BRAND of BRAND AND ASSOCIATES, PLLC on behalf of Gary William Carder. (BRAND, GERVAIS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 03, 2020
38 38 other Declaration Thu 12/03 8:37 PM
Declaration Plaintiff's Declaration In Support of Motion For Reconsideration of Defendants U&M Enterprises, LLC, and Uri Shemesh's Motion To Dismiss Pursuant to FRBP Rule 7012 filed by GERVAIS R. BRAND of BRAND AND ASSOCIATES, PLLC on behalf of Gary William Carder.(BRAND, GERVAIS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Loan Application
37 37 motion Reconsideration (Motion for) Thu 12/03 8:32 PM
Motion for Reconsideration Motion To Reconsider The Court's Order Dated November 20,2020, Dismissing The Complaint Alleging Liability of Uri Shemesh and U&M Enterprises, LLC, in 3:20-ap-00224 and 3:20-ap-00225 filed by GERVAIS R. BRAND of BRAND AND ASSOCIATES, PLLC on behalf of Gary William Carder. (BRAND, GERVAIS)
Related: [-]
36 36 motion Amend (Motion to) Thu 12/03 8:29 PM
Motion to Amend Motion For Leave To File Amended Adversary Complaint filed by GERVAIS R. BRAND of BRAND AND ASSOCIATES, PLLC on behalf of Gary William Carder. (BRAND, GERVAIS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amended Complaint To Determine Declaratory Judgment and Rescission and/or For Damages For Unlawful Acts Alleged
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibits A thru E to Exhibit A Proposed Amended Complaint
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit F to Exhibit A - Proposed Amended Complaint
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit G thru I to Exhibit A - Proposed Amended Complaint
Friday, November 20, 2020
35 35 order o~Generic~ Order Fri 11/20 7:45 AM
ORDER Dismissing Defendants U&M Enterprises, LLC and Uri Shemesh signed on 11/20/2020 Related [+] . (Vargas, Rosario)
Related: [-] 5 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Thursday, November 19, 2020
34 34 notice Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of) Thu 11/19 3:31 PM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order filed by ALAN A. MEDA of Burch & Cracchiolo PA on behalf of Uri Shemesh, U & M Enterprises, LLC Related [+]. (MEDA, ALAN)
Related: [-] 5 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Friday, November 13, 2020
33 33 audio Mon 11/16 9:42 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 11/13/2020 01:30 PM ]. File Size [ 46,078 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:38:18 ]. (vCal Hearing ID (1440656)).(Carmona, Ruth)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 02, 2020
32 32 notice Appearance in Adversary Proceeding (Notice of) Mon 11/02 4:10 PM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by EMORY THOMAS HURLEY of UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE on behalf of U.S. Dept. of Agriculture. (HURLEY, EMORY)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 29, 2020
31 31 notice Notice of Submitting Thu 10/29 3:32 PM
Notice of Submitting To Defendants Plaintiff's (Proposed) Amended Complaint to Determine Declaratory Judgment and Rescission and For Damages For Unlawful Acts as Alleged filed by GERVAIS R. BRAND of BRAND AND ASSOCIATES, PLLC on behalf of Gary William Carder. (BRAND, GERVAIS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - (Proposed) Amended Complaint to Determine Declaratory Judgment and Rescission and For Damages For Unlawful Acts as Alleged
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Exhibit A
Att: 3 Exhibit B to Exhibit A
Att: 4 Exhibit C to Exhibit A
Att: 5 Exhibit D to Exhibit A
Att: 6 Exhibit E to Exhibit A
Att: 7 Exhibit F to Exhibit A
Att: 8 Exhibit G to Exhibit A
Att: 9 Exhibit H to Exhibit A
Att: 10 Exhibit I to Exhibit A
Att: 11 Exhibit J to Exhibit A
Att: 12 Exhibit K to Exhibit A
Tuesday, October 27, 2020
30 30 answer Reply Tue 10/27 2:34 PM
Reply to Motion/Application Defendants U&M Enterprises LLC and Uri Shemesh's Reply In Support of Their Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Response to Defendants U&M Enterprises, LLC and Uri Shemesh's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRBP Rule 7012 Related [+] filed by ALAN A. MEDA of Burch & Cracchiolo PA on behalf of Uri Shemesh, U & M Enterprises, LLC. (MEDA, ALAN)
Related: [-] lated to motions(s)19
29 29 answer Response Tue 10/27 2:31 PM
Response to Motion/Application Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendants U&M Enterprises, LLC and Uri Shemesh's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and FRBP 7012 Related [+] filed by ALAN A. MEDA of Burch & Cracchiolo PA on behalf of Uri Shemesh, U & M Enterprises, LLC. (MEDA, ALAN)
Related: [-] lated to motions(s)23
Monday, October 19, 2020
28 28 vCal Minute Entry Wed 10/21 2:30 PM
Minutes of Hearing held on: 10/19/2020 Subject: RULE 16B SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY BOBBY BARNES, BOBBY BARNES AND ASSOCIATES, LLC, JEBS MANAGEMENT LLC, AND MICHAEL L. YANCEY. (vCal Hearing ID (1439518)). Related [+] (Lowry, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 7
27 27 audio Tue 10/20 3:18 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 10/19/2020 11:00 AM ]. File Size [ 6,914 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:14:45 ]. (vCal Hearing ID (1439518)).(Carter, Tayler)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 15, 2020
25 25 notice Appearance (Notice of) Thu 10/15 10:51 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by DANIEL E. FREDENBERG of FREDENBERG BEAMS on behalf of Bobby Barnes, Bobby Barnes and Associates, LLC, JEBS Management LLC, Michael L. Yancey.(FREDENBERG, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 14, 2020
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 10/16 10:51 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24 Notice of Telephonic or Videoconference Hearing
24 24 court Notice of Telephonic or Videoconference Hearing - Form Wed 10/14 8:21 AM
Notice of Telephonic or Videoconference Hearing Related [+] Hearing set for 10/19/2020 at 11:00 AM for a Videoconference Hearing . (Lowry, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 11 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Procedures
Tuesday, October 13, 2020
23 23 motion Strike (Motion to) Tue 10/13 10:07 PM
Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendants U&M Enterprises, LLC and Uri Shemesh's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6) and FRBP Rule 7012 filed by GERVAIS R. BRAND of BRAND AND ASSOCIATES, PLLC on behalf of Gary William Carder. (BRAND, GERVAIS)
Related: [-]
22 22 answer Response Tue 10/13 10:04 PM
Response to Motion/Application Plaintiff's Response to Defendants U&M Enterprises, LLC, and Uri Shimesh's Motion To Strike Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's U&M Enterprises, LLC and Uri Shemesh's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRBP Rule 7012 Related [+] filed by GERVAIS R. BRAND of BRAND AND ASSOCIATES, PLLC on behalf of Gary William Carder. (BRAND, GERVAIS)
Related: [-] lated to motions(s)19
Thursday, October 08, 2020
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 10/10 10:26 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Notice of Telephonic or Videoconference Hearing
20 20 answer Reply Thu 10/08 12:48 PM
Reply to Motion/Application Related [+] filed by ALAN A. MEDA of Burch & Cracchiolo PA on behalf of Uri Shemesh, U & M Enterprises, LLC. (MEDA, ALAN)
Related: [-] lated to motions(s)5
19 19 motion Strike (Motion to) Thu 10/08 12:47 PM
Motion to Strike filed by ALAN A. MEDA of Burch & Cracchiolo PA on behalf of Uri Shemesh, U & M Enterprises, LLC Related [+]. (MEDA, ALAN)
Related: [-] 14 Response
18 18 court Notice of Telephonic or Videoconference Hearing - Form Thu 10/08 7:35 AM
Notice of Telephonic or Videoconference Hearing Related [+] Hearing set for 11/13/2020 at 01:30 PM for a Videoconference Hearing . (Lowry, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 14 Response
Friday, October 02, 2020
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 10/04 10:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Notice of Telephonic or Videoconference Hearing
16 16 court Notice of Telephonic or Videoconference Hearing - Form Fri 10/02 8:35 AM
Notice of Telephonic or Videoconference Hearing Related [+] Hearing set for 10/19/2020 at 11:00 AM as a Telephonic Hearing . (Lowry, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 11 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Procedures
Thursday, October 01, 2020
15 15 other Declaration Thu 10/01 10:40 PM
Declaration of Plaintiff in Support of Plaintiff's Response to Defendants U&M Enterprises, LLC, and Uri Shemesh's Motion To Dismiss Pursuant to FRBP Rule 7012 filed by GERVAIS R. BRAND of BRAND AND ASSOCIATES, PLLC on behalf of Gary William Carder. (BRAND, GERVAIS)
Related: [-]
14 14 answer Response Thu 10/01 10:31 PM
Response to Motion/Application Plaintiff's Response to Defendants U&M Enterprises, LLC, and Uri Shemesh's Motion To Dismiss Pursuant To FRBP Rule 7012 Related [+] filed by GERVAIS R. BRAND of BRAND AND ASSOCIATES, PLLC on behalf of Gary William Carder. (BRAND, GERVAIS)
Related: [-] lated to motions(s)5
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Arizona Corporation Commission status of Paradise Wire and Cable, LLC
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Loan Application
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Warranty Deed
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Nov. 2018 Promissory Note
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Nov. 2018 Deed of Trust
Att: 6 Exhibit F - March 2019 Escrow Instructions
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Loan Application
Att: 8 Exhibit H - March 2019 Settlement Statement
Att: 9 Exhibit I - March 2019 Promissory Note
Att: 10 Exhibit J - March 2019 Deed of Trust
Att: 11 Exhibit K - August 2019 Escrow Instructions
Att: 12 Exhibit L - August 2019 Settlement Statement
Att: 13 Exhibit M - August 2019 Payoff Quote
Att: 14 Exhibit N - August 2019 Promissory Note
Att: 15 Exhibit O - August 2019 Deed of Trust
Att: 16 Exhibit P - Test Message from Bobby Barnes
Att: 17 Exhibit Q - APOR Values
Att: 18 Exhibit R - Sundby vs. Marquee Ruling
13 13 other Certificate of Service and No Objections Thu 10/01 4:37 PM
Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by ALAN A. MEDA of Burch & Cracchiolo PA on behalf of Uri Shemesh, U & M Enterprises, LLC. Related [+] (MEDA, ALAN)
Related: [-] 5 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Notice Thu 09/17 9:45 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Procedures
11 11 order oSetting Scheduling Conference and Procedures Form Tue 09/15 9:34 AM
ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference and Procedures Related [+] Scheduling Conference set for 10/19/2020 at 11:00 AM at Telephonic Hearing . (Lowry, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 7 Answer to Complaint,8 Answer to Complaint,9 Answer to Complaint,10 Answer to Complaint
Monday, September 14, 2020
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 09/14 4:32 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by CHRISTIAN C.M. BEAMS of FREDENBERG BEAMS on behalf of Michael L. Yancey Related [+]. (BEAMS, CHRISTIAN)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 09/14 4:31 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by CHRISTIAN C.M. BEAMS of FREDENBERG BEAMS on behalf of JEBS Management LLC Related [+]. (BEAMS, CHRISTIAN)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 09/14 4:30 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by CHRISTIAN C.M. BEAMS of FREDENBERG BEAMS on behalf of Bobby Barnes and Associates, LLC Related [+]. (BEAMS, CHRISTIAN)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 09/14 4:29 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by CHRISTIAN C.M. BEAMS of FREDENBERG BEAMS on behalf of Bobby Barnes Related [+]. (BEAMS, CHRISTIAN)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
6 6 notice Notice of Errata Mon 09/14 4:08 PM
Notice of Errata filed by ALAN A. MEDA of Burch & Cracchiolo PA on behalf of Uri Shemesh, U & M Enterprises, LLC Related [+]. (MEDA, ALAN)
Related: [-] 5 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Friday, September 11, 2020
5 5 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Motion to) Fri 09/11 11:51 AM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by ALAN A. MEDA of Burch & Cracchiolo PA on behalf of U & M Enterprises, LLC Related [+]. (MEDA, ALAN)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, August 12, 2020
4 4 court Summons Issued (Form) Wed 08/12 1:00 PM
Summons Issued . (Carter, Tayler)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 11, 2020
3 3 cmp Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 08/11 8:07 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons filed by GERVAIS R. BRAND of BRAND AND ASSOCIATES, PLLC on behalf of Gary William Carder. (BRAND, GERVAIS)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 08/11 8:06 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons filed by GERVAIS R. BRAND of BRAND AND ASSOCIATES, PLLC on behalf of Gary William Carder. (BRAND, GERVAIS)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 08/11 8:02 PM
Adversary case 3:20-ap-00224. Complaint (No Fee Due or Fee Deferred) against U & M Enterprises, LLC, Uri Shemesh, Bobby Barnes and Associates, LLC, Bobby Barnes, JEBS Management LLC, Michael L. Yancey filed by GERVAIS R. BRAND of BRAND AND ASSOCIATES, PLLC on behalf of Gary William Carder Nature of Suit: 91 (Declaratory judgment) 14 Related [+] Complaint To Determine Declaratory Judgment and Rescission, and For Damages For Unlawful Acts As Alleged. (BRAND, GERVAIS)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - other
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Att: 5 Exhibit E
Att: 6 Exhibit F