Sabena Puri v. United States of America
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | R Gary Klausner |
Referred: | Alicia G Rosenberg |
Case #: | 2:20-cv-07270 |
Nature of Suit | 871 Federal Tax Suits - IRS-Third Party 26 USC 7609 |
Cause | 26:7609 IRS: Petition to Quash IRS Summons |
Case Filed: | Aug 12, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jan 12, 2021 |
Last checked: Monday Feb 08, 2021 12:48 AM PST |
Petitioner
Sabena Puri
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Thursday, November 16, 2023 | ||
46 | 46
order
Relief
Thu 11/16 3:34 PM
FOR COURT USE ONLY: STATISTICAL CORRECTION denying39 Motion for Relief re:45 Minutes (In Chambers) Order. (jp) |
|
Tuesday, November 14, 2023 | ||
45 | 45
order
R&R - Accepting Report and Recommendations
Thu 11/16 3:31 PM
MINUTE (In Chambers) ORDER ACCEPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION OF US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Judge R. Gary Klausner: No objections to the Report have been filed. The Court accepts the findings and recommendation of the Magistrate Judge. IT IS ORDERED that Petitioner's39 motion for relief under FRCP 60(b)(6) is DENIED. (jp) |
|
Monday, October 30, 2023 | ||
44 | 44
reportrecommend
Notice of Report and Recommendation
Mon 10/30 8:11 AM
NOTICE OF FILING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. Objections to R&R due by 11/13/2023. (See Attachment for Further Details). (kl) |
|
Att: 1 Report and Recommendation | ||
43 | 43
reportrecommend
Report and Recommendation (Issued)
Mon 10/30 8:09 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RE: PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT (Dkt. No. 39) issued by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. Re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Relief from Judgment of 1/12/21 Order re R&R - Accepting Report and Recommendations39 , Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 . (See Attachment for Further Details). (kl) |
|
Thursday, October 19, 2023 | ||
42 | 42
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 10/20 9:42 AM
ORDER RE: FURTHER PROCEEDINGS ON PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg, re MOTION for Relief from Judgment39 . The District Court referred the motion for report and recommendation. (Dkt. No. 41.) IT IS ORDERED that Petitioner may file an optional reply by October 26, 2023. Unless otherwise ordered, the court will take the matter under submission without oral argument. (hr) |
|
Wednesday, October 18, 2023 | ||
41 | 41
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 10/18 12:47 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) REFERRAL OF MOTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The MOTION for Relief from Judgment39 is hereby referred to Judge ALICIA G. ROSENBERG for hearing as necessary, and for a Report and Recommendation. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jre) |
|
Monday, October 16, 2023 | ||
40 | 40
respm
Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Mon 10/16 10:44 AM
OPPOSITION in Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Relief from Judgment of 1/12/21 Order re R&R - Accepting Report and Recommendations,, Terminated Case,31 39 United States' Opposition to Petitioner's Motion for Relief From Judgment filed by Respondent United States of America. (Greene, Gavin) |
|
Tuesday, October 03, 2023 | ||
39 | 39
motion
Relief
Tue 10/03 3:49 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Relief from Judgment of 1/12/21 Order re R&R - Accepting Report and Recommendations,, Terminated Case,31 filed by Petitioner Sabena Puri. Motion set for hearing on 11/6/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Schutzman, Scott) |
|
Thursday, January 12, 2023 | ||
38 | 38
appeal
USCA Mandate
Thu 01/12 2:20 PM
MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,32 , CCA # 21-55132 The judgment of this Court, entered August 22, 2022, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. [See USCA Memorandum37 , AFFIRMED.](mat) |
|
Monday, August 22, 2022 | ||
37 | 37
appeal
USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order
Mon 08/22 4:51 PM
MEMORANDUM from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals32 filed by Sabena Puri. CCA # 21-55132 The decision of the District Court is AFFIRMED. (jp) |
|
Wednesday, March 10, 2021 | ||
35 | 35
transcript
-Transcript
Thu 03/11 1:26 PM
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 11/10/2020. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: JAMS Certified Transcription, phone number (661) 609-4528. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 3/31/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/12/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/8/2021. (jlo) |
|
textonly
Notice of Filing Transcript
Thu 03/11 1:28 PM
NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 11/10/2020 re Transcript35 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jlo) |
||
Tuesday, February 23, 2021 | ||
34 | 34
transcript
-Transcript Order Form (G-120)
Tue 02/23 2:25 PM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER re: Court of Appeals case number 21-55132 as to Petitioner Sabena Puri for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Rocio Rivas at rrivas@mnrlawfirm.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Neiman, Jeffrey) |
|
Monday, February 22, 2021 | ||
33 | 33
appeal
USCA Notification of Case Number
Mon 02/22 2:48 PM
NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 21-55132 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals32 as to petitioner Sabena Puri. (jp) |
|
Tuesday, February 16, 2021 | ||
32 | 32
appeal
Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals
Tue 02/16 12:11 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Petitioner Sabena Puri. Appeal of R&R - Accepting Report and Recommendations,, Terminated Case,31 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-30560419.) (Schutzman, Scott) |
|
Tuesday, January 12, 2021 | ||
31 | 31
order
R&R - Accepting Report and Recommendations ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Tue 01/12 4:55 PM
ORDER ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Judge R. Gary Klausner for MOTION to Dismiss Case 16 , Report and Recommendation (Issued)27 . IT IS ORDERED that Petitioner's Petition to Quash Third Party Summons issued to Citibank, N.A. by the Internal Revenue Service is DENIED. Respondent's motion to deny and dismiss the Petition is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to close the case. (see document for further details) (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (hr) |
|
Wednesday, January 06, 2021 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Response
Wed 01/06 10:08 AM
RESPONSE filed by Respondent United States of Americato Objection to Report and Recommendations29 (Greene, Gavin) |
|
Wednesday, December 23, 2020 | ||
29 | 29
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendation
Wed 12/23 10:19 AM
OBJECTION to Report and Recommendation (Issued),,27 filed by Petitioner Sabena Puri.(Schutzman, Scott) |
|
Wednesday, December 09, 2020 | ||
28 | 28
reportrecommend
Notice of Report and Recommendation
Wed 12/09 10:21 AM
NOTICE OF FILING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. Objections to R&R due by 12/23/2020. (See Attachment for Further Details) (kl) |
|
Att: 1 Report and Recommendation | ||
27 | 27
reportrecommend
Report and Recommendation (Issued)
Wed 12/09 10:18 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RE: PETITIONER'S PETITION TO QUASH THIRD PARTY SUMMONS ISSUED TO CITIBANK, N.A. BY THE INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Dkt. No. 1) issued by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. For the foregoing reasons, it is recommended that the District Court accept this Report and Recommendation, deny the petition to quash the third party summons to Citibank N.A., and grant Respondent's motion to deny and dismiss the petition. Re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case16 , Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 . (See Attachment for Further Details) (kl) |
|
Tuesday, November 10, 2020 | ||
26 | 26
minutes
Telephone Conference ~Util - Terminate Hearings
Tue 11/10 1:16 PM
MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE RE: PETITIONER'S PETITION TO QUASH THIRD PARTY SUMMONS ISSUED TO CITIBANK, N.A. BY THE INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE1 held before Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. The court and counsel confer as stated on the record. The matter is taken under submission. Court Recorder: AT&T 11/10/2020. (hr) |
|
Friday, November 06, 2020 | ||
25 | 25
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Fri 11/06 8:57 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. Per Judge Rosenberg's Order (Dkt.20 ), a telephonic discovery conference is scheduled for 10:00 a.m. PST on Tuesday, November 10, 2020. Counsel are to contact Judge Rosenberg's Courtroom Deputy, Karl Lozada, at agr_chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov for the call-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kl) |
|
Thursday, October 29, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form
Thu 10/29 3:27 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Derick Vollrath to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Petitioner Sabena Puri (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28745928)22 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Other error(s) with document(s): NC missing. (Thrasher, Lupe) |
|
Wednesday, October 28, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 10/29 10:43 AM
ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner granting22 Non-Resident Attorney Derick R Vollrath APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Petitioner Sabena Puri, designating Scott E Schutzman as local counsel. (jp) |
|
22 | 22
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Wed 10/28 11:00 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Derick Vollrath to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Petitioner Sabena Puri (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28745928) filed by Plaintiff Sabena Puri. (Schutzman, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order on Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice | ||
Thursday, October 22, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Thu 10/22 7:35 PM
OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 16 filed by Petitioner Sabena Puri.(Schutzman, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Petitioner, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 -Legal Opinion of Judge (Ret.) Khare, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Legal Opinion of Judge (Ret.) Khare re Petitioner's Tax Residential Status, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Legal Opinion of Former Chief Commissioner of Income Tax for India, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Press Accounts of Abuse | ||
Tuesday, October 13, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Hearings
Tue 10/13 9:21 AM
ORDER re Briefing Schedule by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg, re Stipulation for Order re Briefing Schedule19 , MOTION to Dismiss 16 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. The United States' Motion to Deny and Dismiss Petitioner's Petition to Quash Third-Party Summons Issued to Citibank N.A. (document number 16) is its opposition to the Petition as required by the Briefing Schedule (document number 15). 2. On or before October 22, 2020, Sabena Puri may file a reply to the United States' opposition. 3. The hearing on the United States' Motion to Deny and Dismiss Petitioner's Petition scheduled for November 9, 2020 is hereby vacated. 4. A telephonic hearing on Petitioner's Petition is set for November 10, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. (hr) |
|
Friday, October 09, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
2
pgs
stip
Order
Fri 10/09 12:53 PM
STIPULATION for Order re Briefing Schedule filed by Respondent United States of America.(Greene, Gavin) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order re Briefing Schedule | ||
Thursday, October 08, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Thu 10/08 3:45 PM
ORDER SETTING INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. A Scheduling Conference has been placed on calendar for February 21, 2021, at 9:00 a.m. The Conference will be held pursuant to F.R.Civ. P. 16(b). Trial counsel must be present and there are no telephonic appearances. Counsel are ordered to file a joint statement providing a brief factual summary of the case, including the claims being asserted. The parties are reminded of their obligations to disclose information and confer on a discovery plan not later than 21 days prior to the scheduling conference, and to file a joint statement with the Court not later than 14 days after they confer, as required by F.R. Civ.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Failure to comply may lead to the imposition of sanctions. Plaintiffs counsel is directed to give notice of the scheduling conference to each party that makes an initial appearance in the action after this date. (jre) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Errata
Thu 10/08 3:36 PM
NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Respondent United States of America. correcting NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 16 (Greene, Gavin) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Dismiss Case
Thu 10/08 2:32 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Respondent United States of America. Motion set for hearing on 11/9/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attorney Gavin L Greene added to party United States of America(pty:res)) (Greene, Gavin) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Cathrine Reinecke, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Margaret O'Connor | ||
Tuesday, September 22, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 09/22 5:13 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS): BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg, re: Petition to Quash Third Party Summons Issued to CitiBank, N.A. by the Internal Revenue Service1 . 1. Respondent shall file an opposition on or before October 13, 2020. 2. Petitioner may file a reply within 14 days of service of the opposition. 3. A telephonic hearing on Petitioner's Petition is set for November 10, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. (hr) |
|
Monday, August 31, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed as to USA (60 days)
Mon 08/31 5:54 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sabena Puri, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to T. Garza. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Signature Indecipherable. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to signed LN - Person in Charge. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Schutzman, Scott) |
|
13 | 13
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed as to USA (60 days)
Mon 08/31 5:34 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sabena Puri, upon Defendant United States of America served on 8/18/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to T. Garza. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Signature Indecipherable. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to signed LN - Person in Charge. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Schutzman, Scott) |
|
Thursday, August 27, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
order
Transfer Pursuant to GO 19-03 DECLINED-(related case)(CV-34)
Fri 08/28 10:05 AM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03 filed. Transfer of case declined by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:20-cv-04792 AFM (rn) |
|
Tuesday, August 25, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Related Case(s)
Tue 08/25 3:49 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Petitioner Sabena Puri. per Local Rule 83-1.3.1 Related Case(s): 2:20-cv-04792-AFM (Schutzman, Scott) |
|
Thursday, August 20, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 08/20 3:25 PM
ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting9 Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey A Neiman APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Petitioner Sabena Puri, designating Scott E Schutzman as local counsel. (et) |
|
Wednesday, August 19, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Wed 08/19 3:57 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey A. Neiman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Petitioner Sabena Puri (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27702754) filed by Plaintiff Sabena Puri. (Schutzman, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case | ||
Friday, August 14, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
attorney
Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form
Fri 08/14 11:48 AM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey A. Neiman. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 08/14 11:41 AM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant United States of America. (lh) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 08/14 11:30 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (lh) |
|
Wednesday, August 12, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Summons Request
Wed 08/12 4:43 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Petitioner Sabena Puri. (Schutzman, Scott) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Wed 08/12 4:42 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Petitioner Sabena Puri. (Schutzman, Scott) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 08/12 4:38 PM
Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Petitioner Sabena Puri, (Schutzman, Scott) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 08/12 4:30 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Sabena Puri. (Schutzman, Scott) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 08/12 4:23 PM
PETITION to Quash Third Party Summons Issued to Citibank, N.A. by the Internal Revenue Service Receipt No: ACACDC-27603137 - Fee: $400, filed by Petitioner Sabena Puri. (Attorney Scott E Schutzman added to party Sabena Puri(pty:bkmov))(Schutzman, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Summons Issued by the IRS, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Tax Convention with India, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Press Clippings, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Press Release re MOU |