Member Case
Lead case is: 1:20-bk-11435

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Martin R Barash
Case #: 1:20-bk-11434
Case Filed:Aug 13, 2020
Terminated:Jun 22, 2022

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Sandbox VR Topanga, LLC
6600 Topanga Canyon Blvd # 1120
Woodland Hills, CA 91303-2609
Represented By
Steven Werth
Sulmeyerkupetz
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SV)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 9 minutes ago
Wednesday, June 22, 2022
24 24 court Close Bankruptcy Case Wed 06/22 11:16 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed - FINAL DECREE. The plan of reorganization in the above referenced case has been fully implemented. An application for a Final Decree closing this case was granted by the Court and this case is therefore closed. Related [+] (JC)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Sandbox VR Topanga, LLC,8 Amended Motion filed by Debtor Sandbox VR Topanga, LLC,13 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corporations or Partnerships) (309F1)
Tuesday, December 15, 2020
23 23 misc Monthly Operating Report Tue 12/15 9:44 AM
Monthly Operating Report. Operating Report Number: 4. For the Month Ending November 30, 2020 Filed by Debtor Sandbox VR Topanga, LLC. (Wu, Claire)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 16, 2020
22 22 misc Monthly Operating Report Mon 11/16 12:59 PM
Monthly Operating Report. Operating Report Number: 3. For the Month Ending 10/31/2020 Filed by Debtor Sandbox VR Topanga, LLC. (Wu, Claire)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 15, 2020
21 21 misc Monthly Operating Report Thu 10/15 4:05 PM
Monthly Operating Report. Operating Report Number: 2. For the Month Ending 9/30/2020 Filed by Debtor Sandbox VR Topanga, LLC. (Wu, Claire)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 16, 2020
20 20 misc Monthly Operating Report Wed 09/16 1:03 PM
Monthly Operating Report. Operating Report Number: 1. For the Month Ending August 31, 2020 Filed by Debtor Sandbox VR Topanga, LLC. (Werth, Steven)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 14, 2020
19 19 misc Disclosure of Compensation of Atty for Debtor (Official Form 2030) Mon 09/14 11:18 AM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Official Form 2030) Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by Debtor Sandbox VR Topanga, LLC Related [+]. (Kupetz, David)
Related: [-] Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (ccdn)
Friday, September 11, 2020
18 18 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Fri 09/11 3:28 PM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Wu, Claire. (Wu, Claire)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 10, 2020
17 17 misc Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Official Form 202) Thu 09/10 8:03 PM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Official Form 202) Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Official Form 202) with Schedule A/B; Schedule D; Schedule E/F; Schedule G; Schedule H; Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals and Statement of Financial Affairs Filed by Debtor Sandbox VR Topanga, LLC. (Werth, Steven)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 24, 2020
16 16 notice Notice Mon 08/24 1:45 PM
Notice Notice Of Joint Administration Of Cases And Requirements For Filing Documents (With Proof of Service) Filed by Debtor Sandbox VR Topanga, LLC Related [+]. (Kupetz, David)
Related: [-] 2 Emergency motion Emergency Motion For Order Directing Joint Administration Of Related Cases; Memorandum Of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Steven Zhao Filed by Debtor Sandbox VR Topanga, LLC,12 ORDER Granting Motion to Approve Joint Administration of Cases (BNC-PDF) Signed on 8/17/2020.
Thursday, August 20, 2020
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Notice Thu 08/20 9:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 80. Notice Date 08/20/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corporations or Partnerships) (309F1)
Wednesday, August 19, 2020
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 08/19 9:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/19/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 ORDER for joint administration (BNC-PDF)
Tuesday, August 18, 2020
13 13 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corporations or Partnerships) (309F1) Tue 08/18 9:29 AM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 9/14/2020 at 09:00 AM at UST-SVND2, TELEPHONIC MEETING. CONFERENCE LINE:1-866-820-9498, PARTICIPANT CODE:6468388. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 11/13/2020. Related [+]
Related: [-] my, Johanne
Monday, August 17, 2020
12 12 order Joint Administration (BNC-PDF) Mon 08/17 5:30 PM
ORDER Granting Motion to Approve Joint Administration of Cases (BNC-PDF) Signed on 8/17/2020. (Gasparian, Ana)
Related: [-]
Sunday, August 16, 2020
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 08/16 9:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/16/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Notice of Case Deficiency (11 U.S.C. Sec. 521 & Rule 1007) (Ch 11/12) (BNC)
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 08/16 9:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/16/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Case Commencement Deficiency Notice (BNC)
Friday, August 14, 2020
9 9 4 pgs notice Notice of Hearing Fri 08/14 2:20 PM
Notice of Hearing Notice of Hearing on Emergency Motion for Order Directing Joint Administration of Related Cases Filed by Debtor Sandbox VR Topanga, LLC Related [+]. (Kupetz, David)
Related: [-] 8 Amended Motion (related document(s):2 Emergency motion Emergency Motion For Order Directing Joint Administration Of Related Cases; Memorandum Of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Steven Zhao filed by Debtor Sandbox VR Topanga, LLC) Emergency Motion for Order Directing Joint Administration of Related Cases; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Steven Zhao - amend attorney of record Filed by Debtor Sandbox VR Topanga, LLC
8 8 25 pgs motion X - Amended Motion (Generic) (motion) Fri 08/14 9:44 AM
Amended Motion Related [+] Emergency Motion for Order Directing Joint Administration of Related Cases; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Steven Zhao - amend attorney of record Filed by Debtor Sandbox VR Topanga, LLC (Kupetz, David)
Related: [-] 2 Emergency motion Emergency Motion For Order Directing Joint Administration Of Related Cases; Memorandum Of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Steven Zhao filed by Debtor Sandbox VR Topanga, LLC
5 5 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Fri 08/14 8:28 AM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Petition was filed as complete, but schedules or statements are deficient. Deficient for Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-individuals; Schedule A/B; Schedule D; Schedule E/F; Schedule G; Schedule H; Statement of Financial Affairs; Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO FILE THE DEFICIENT DOCUMENTS. Related [+] (Cetulio, Julie)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Sandbox VR Topanga, LLC
4 4 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Fri 08/14 8:20 AM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Electronic signature does not correspond to the attorney login. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO COMPLY WITH SECTION 3 OF THE COURT MANUAL AND EITHER REFILE THE DOCUMENT WITH THE CORRECT LOGIN OR FILE A SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY. Related [+] (Cetulio, Julie)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Sandbox VR Topanga, LLC
3 3 court Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required Fri 08/14 8:17 AM
Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Incorrect/incomplete debtor(s) name and/or alias entered. THE COURT HAS CORRECTED THIS INFORMATION. THIS ENTRY IS PROVIDED FOR FUTURE REFERENCE. Related [+] (Cetulio, Julie)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Sandbox VR Topanga, LLC
Thursday, August 13, 2020
7 7 misc Case Commencement Deficiency Notice (manual - ccdn) (BNC) Fri 08/14 8:41 AM
Case Commencement Deficiency Notice (BNC) Related [+] (Cetulio, Julie)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Sandbox VR Topanga, LLC
6 6 misc Deficiency Notice (11 U.S.C. Sec. 521 & Rule 1007) (Ch 11/12) (manual - def) (BNC) Fri 08/14 8:37 AM
Notice of Case Deficiency Under 11 U.S.C. Sec. 521(a)(1) and Bankruptcy Rule 1007 (BNC) Related [+] (Cetulio, Julie)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Sandbox VR Topanga, LLC
2 2 25 pgs motion Emergency motion (motion) Thu 08/13 7:24 PM
Emergency motion Emergency Motion For Order Directing Joint Administration Of Related Cases; Memorandum Of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Steven Zhao Filed by Debtor Sandbox VR Topanga, LLC (Kupetz, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 25 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Thu 08/13 7:55 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Sandbox VR Topanga, LLC Chapter 11 Plan due by 12/11/2020. Disclosure Statement due by 12/11/2020. (Werth, Steven)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Thu 08/13 7:57 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(1:20-bk-11434) [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 51563290. Fee amount 1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
misc Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (ccdn) Fri 08/14 8:21 AM
Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (ccdn) Related [+] Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 8/27/2020. Statistical Summary (Form B6 Pg 2) due 8/27/2020. Incomplete Filings due by 8/27/2020. (Cetulio, Julie)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Sandbox VR Topanga, LLC
misc Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (def/deforco) Fri 08/14 8:22 AM
Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (def/deforco) Related [+] Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 8/27/2020. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 8/27/2020. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 8/27/2020. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 8/27/2020. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 8/27/2020. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 8/27/2020. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 8/27/2020. Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) due by 8/27/2020. Incomplete Filings due by 8/27/2020. (Cetulio, Julie)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Sandbox VR Topanga, LLC