Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:20-bk-20882

Wisconsin Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:G Michael Halfenger
Case #: 2:20-ap-02111
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
Case Filed:Aug 12, 2020
Terminated:Oct 06, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
James Peterson Sons, Inc.
N2251 Gibson Drive
Medford, WI 54451
Represented By
James Peterson Sons, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Cornerstone Pavers, LLC
6422 Hwy 31
Racine, WI 53402
Represented By
Austin B. Borton
Jeffrey Leavell, S.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:11 PM CDT
Wednesday, October 06, 2021
35 35 court Close Adversary Case Wed 10/06 10:00 AM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-2111 Closed. (jah, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
34 34 utility Disposition of Adversary Wed 10/06 9:56 AM
Disposition of Adversary 2:20-ap-2111 Dismissed on Stipulation. (jah, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 05, 2021
33 33 misc Proposed Order Tue 10/05 11:09 AM
Proposed Order for Dismissal (Agreed to by the Parties) RE:32 - Stipulation filed by Attorney Austin B. Borton of Jeffrey Leavell, S.C. on behalf of Cornerstone Pavers, LLC. (Borton, Austin)
Related: [-]
32 32 misc Stipulation Tue 10/05 11:06 AM
Stipulation By Cornerstone Pavers, LLC and James Peterson Sons, Inc. for Dismissal Filed by Cornerstone Pavers, LLC (Borton, Austin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 23, 2021
31 31 misc Correspondence Thu 09/23 3:22 PM
Correspondence To Judge re Settlement Filed by West Bend Mutual Insurance Company Related [+] (Piper, William)
Related: [-] 25 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Cornerstone Pavers, LLC
Monday, September 20, 2021
30 30 answer Response (Not for Claims) Mon 09/20 2:50 PM
Response Filed by Plaintiff Cornerstone Pavers, LLC, Interested Party West Bend Mutual Insurance Company Reply in support of to (25 Motion For Summary Judgment Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement filed by Plaintiff Cornerstone Pavers, LLC,27 Response filed by Defendant James Peterson Sons, Inc.,28 Declaration filed by Defendant James Peterson Sons, Inc., 29 Order (Virtual Event)) Filed by Cornerstone Pavers, LLC, West Bend Mutual Insurance Company Related [+](Piper, William)
Related: [-] 25 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Cornerstone Pavers, LLC,27 Response filed by Defendant James Peterson Sons, Inc.,28 Declaration filed by Defendant James Peterson Sons, Inc., 29 Order (Virtual Event)
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of William S. Piper
Saturday, September 11, 2021
29 29 order Order (Virtual Event) Sat 09/11 5:22 PM
Order: Any reply in support of the motion to enforce settlement agreement must be filed on or before September 20, 2021. s/ G. Michael Halfenger Chief Bankruptcy Judge Related [+]. (Halfenger, G.)
Related: [-] 25 Motion For Summary Judgment Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement , 26 Order (Virtual Event),27 Response
Friday, September 10, 2021
28 28 misc Declaration Fri 09/10 4:08 PM
Declaration of John P. Shanahan filed by John Patrick Shanahan on behalf of James Peterson Sons, Inc.. Related [+]. (Shanahan, John)
Related: [-] 27 Response
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - July 28 Correspondence Between Counsel
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - July 29 Correspondence Enclosing Letter to WisDOT
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - August 20 Correspondence Between Counsel
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Correspondence with WisDOT
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - August 24 Correspondence Between Counsel
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - August 30 Correspondence with WisDOT
27 27 answer Response to Motion (Not for Claims) Fri 09/10 3:56 PM
Response Filed by John Patrick Shanahan of Hansen Reynolds LLC on behalf of Defendant James Peterson Sons, Inc.. to25 Motion For Summary Judgment Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement filed by Plaintiff Cornerstone Pavers, LLC and Certificate of Service (Shanahan, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 30, 2021
26 26 order Order (Virtual Event) Mon 08/30 1:43 PM
Order: On August 27, 2021, the plaintiff and West Bend Mutual Insurance Company filed a motion to enforce a settlement agreement with the defendant. The defendant must respond to the motion by no later than September 10, 2021 . s/ G. Michael Halfenger Chief Bankruptcy Judge Related [+]. (Halfenger, G.)
Related: [-] 25 Motion For Summary Judgment Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement
Friday, August 27, 2021
25 25 motion Summary Judgment Fri 08/27 3:48 PM
Motion For Summary Judgment Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement with Notice of Motion and Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Cornerstone Pavers, LLC (Leo, T.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- 2021.05.26 - Term Sheet
Att: 2 Exhibit B- Fully executed settlement
Att: 3 Exhibit C- Notice of Proposed Distribution
Att: 4 Exhibit D- Email 7.20.21
Att: 5 Exhibit E- CP release of lie
Att: 6 Exhibit F- 7.29 direction
Att: 7 Exhibit G- Email
Att: 8 Declaration of William S. Piper
24 24 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 08/27 3:12 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by West Bend Mutual Insurance Company (Piper, William)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 08/27 3:07 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by West Bend Mutual Insurance Company (Leo, T.)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 08, 2021
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 05/09 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+]. Notice Date 05/08/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 21 Scheduling Order
Thursday, May 06, 2021
21 21 order Scheduling Order Thu 05/06 8:51 AM
Amended Scheduling Order. Final Pre-Trial Conference set for 2/28/2022 at 01:00 PM by Telephone Hearing Related [+].(jam, Deputy Clerk) (Signed: 05/05/2021)
Related: [-] 19 Stipulation,17 Scheduling Order
Tuesday, April 27, 2021
20 20 misc Proposed Order Tue 04/27 3:24 PM
Proposed Order to Amend Scheduling Order (Agreed to by the Parties) RE:19 - Stipulation filed by Attorney Austin B. Borton of Jeffrey Leavell, S.C. on behalf of Cornerstone Pavers, LLC. (Borton, Austin)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Stipulation Tue 04/27 3:17 PM
Stipulation By Cornerstone Pavers, LLC and James Peterson Sons, Inc. to Amend Scheduling Order Filed by Cornerstone Pavers, LLC (Borton, Austin)
Related: [-]
Saturday, November 14, 2020
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 11/15 12:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+]. Notice Date 11/14/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Scheduling Order
Thursday, November 12, 2020
17 17 order Scheduling Order Thu 11/12 8:38 AM
Scheduling Order. Final Pretrial Conference scheduled for 8/23/2021 at 01:30 PM To appear by telephone, you must call the Court conference line at 1-888-684-8852, and enter access code 7183566 before the scheduled hearing time. (jam, Deputy Clerk) (Signed: 11/11/2020)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 02, 2020
16 16 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 11/02 10:40 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice with Certificate of Service Filed by Cornerstone Pavers, LLC (Kerkman, Jerome)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 30, 2020
15 15 misc Rule 26(f) Conference Worksheet - Adversary Proceeding Fri 10/30 9:05 AM
Rule 26(f) Conference Worksheet - Adversary Proceeding Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) Report Filed by Cornerstone Pavers, LLC (Borton, Austin)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 09, 2020
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 10/10 12:54 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+]. Notice Date 10/09/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order (Generic)
Wednesday, October 07, 2020
13 13 2 pgs order Order (Generic) Wed 10/07 7:32 AM
Order Regarding Notice of Appearance Filed by John Patrick Shanahan on September 11, 2020 Related [+]. (jam, Deputy Clerk) (Signed: 10/06/2020)
Related: [-] 5
Sunday, October 04, 2020
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 10/05 12:43 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+]. Notice Date 10/04/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Order (Generic)
Friday, October 02, 2020
11 11 2 pgs order Order (Generic) Fri 10/02 7:37 AM
Order Requiring Rule 26(f) Report. (jam, Deputy Clerk) (Signed: 10/01/2020)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 29, 2020
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 09/29 4:19 PM
Answer to Complaint and Certificate of Service Filed by James Peterson Sons, Inc.. (Shanahan, John)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Tue 09/29 3:49 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by James Peterson Sons, Inc. (Shanahan, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 17, 2020
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 09/17 11:49 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+]. Notice Date 09/17/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order on Stipulation
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
7 7 4 pgs order Order on Stipulation Tue 09/15 12:35 PM
Order on Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Related [+] (jam, Deputy Clerk) (Signed: 09/15/2020)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,6 Proposed order
Friday, September 11, 2020
6 6 misc Proposed Order Fri 09/11 9:17 AM
Proposed Order (Agreed to by the Parties) RE:1 - Complaint filed by Attorney Austin B. Borton of Jeffrey Leavell, S.C., John Patrick Shanahan of Hansen Reynolds LLC on behalf of Cornerstone Pavers, LLC, James Peterson Sons, Inc.. (Shanahan, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint
5 5 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 09/11 8:45 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by John Patrick Shanahan on behalf of James Peterson Sons, Inc.. (Shanahan, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 18, 2020
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Tue 08/18 3:07 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Cornerstone Pavers, LLC (Borton, Austin)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint, 3 Summons
Thursday, August 13, 2020
3 3 court Electronic Summons Issued Thu 08/13 1:41 PM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004, and file a certificate of service with the Court. Answer Due by 9/14/2020. United States and its offices and agencies answer due by 9/17/2020. (saa, Law Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 12, 2020
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 08/12 4:25 PM
Receipt of Complaint 20-02111 gmh) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 19674597. Fee amount 350.00 Related [+] . (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 1
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 08/12 4:24 PM
Adversary case 20-02111 Complaint by Cornerstone Pavers, LLC (attorney Austin B. Borton) against James Peterson Sons, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)))(Borton, Austin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit