California Northern District Court
Judge:Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Referred: Thomas S Hixson
Case #: 3:20-cv-05640
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Case Filed:Aug 13, 2020
Terminated:Sep 10, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 09, 2021 12:26 AM PST
Amicus
Edward W. Hayter
Represented By
Rachele R. Byrd
Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP
contact info
Amicus
Edward Lawrence
Represented By
Rachele R. Byrd
Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP
contact info
Amicus
Robert Pepper
Represented By
Rachele R. Byrd
Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP
contact info
Amicus
Stephen H. Schwartz
Represented By
Rachele R. Byrd
Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP
contact info
Counter-claimant
Apple Inc.
Represented By
Jagannathan P Srinivasan
Gibson Dunn
contact info
William F Stute
Orrick, Herrington And Sutcliffe LLP
contact info
Ethan D. Dettmer
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Jason C Lo
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
E. Joshua Rosenkranz
Orrick Herrington Sutcliffe LLP
contact info
John J. Calandra
Mcdermott Will And Emery LLP
contact info
Elizabeth Andrea Rodd
Mcdermott Will And Emery
contact info
Peter John Sacripanti
Mcdermott Will And Emery LLP
contact info
Jessica E Phillips
Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton Garrison LLP
contact info
William A. Isaacson
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Scott A Schaeffer
contact info
Karen Leah Dunn
Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Hannah Cannom
Walker Stevens Cannom LLP
contact info
Evan N Schlom
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Richard Joseph Doren
Gibson Dunn Crutcher
contact info
Michelle S Lowery
Mcdermott Will And Emery
contact info
Betty X Yang
Gibson Dunn And Crutcher LLP
contact info
Meredith Richardson Dearborn
Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Bethany Marvin Stevens
Walker Stevens Cannom LLP
contact info
Daniel Glen Swanson
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Cynthia Richman
Gibson Dunn And Crutcher LLP
contact info
Anna Tryon Pletcher
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Katrina Marie Robson
O'Melveny And Myers
contact info
Nicole Lauren Castle
Mcdermott Will And Emery LLP
contact info
Mark A. Perry
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
David R. Eberhart
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Karen Hoffman Lent
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher Flom LLP
contact info
Elena Zarabozo
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Veronica Smith Lewis
Gibson Dunn Crutcher LLP
contact info
Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Counter-defendant
Epic Games, Inc.
Represented By
Paul Jeffrey Riehle
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Nathan E Denning
Wiggin And Dana LLP
contact info
Michael Brent Byars
Cravath, Swaine Moore LLP
contact info
Christine A Varney
Cravath, Swaine And Moore LLP
contact info
Lauren Ann Moskowitz
Cravath Swaine Moore LLP
contact info
Gary Andrew Bornstein
Cravath, Swaine And Moore
contact info
Yonatan Even
Cravath, Swaine And Moore LLP
contact info
Katherine B. Forrest
Cravath Swaine And Moore LLP
contact info
Defendant
Apple Inc.
Represented By
Zainab Ahmad
Gibson, Dunn And Crutcher
contact info
Jagannathan P Srinivasan
Gibson Dunn
contact info
William F Stute
Orrick, Herrington And Sutcliffe LLP
contact info
Ethan D. Dettmer
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Jason C Lo
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
E. Joshua Rosenkranz
Orrick Herrington Sutcliffe LLP
contact info
John J. Calandra
Mcdermott Will And Emery LLP
contact info
Elizabeth Andrea Rodd
Mcdermott Will And Emery
contact info
Peter John Sacripanti
Mcdermott Will And Emery LLP
contact info
Anna L Casey
Gibson, Dunn, And Crutcher
contact info
Jessica E Phillips
Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton Garrison LLP
contact info
William A. Isaacson
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Scott A Schaeffer
contact info
Karen Leah Dunn
Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Hannah Cannom
Walker Stevens Cannom LLP
contact info
Evan N Schlom
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Richard Joseph Doren
Gibson Dunn Crutcher
contact info
Michelle S Lowery
Mcdermott Will And Emery
contact info
Rachel S. Brass
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Betty X Yang
Gibson Dunn And Crutcher LLP
contact info
Meredith Richardson Dearborn
Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Bethany Marvin Stevens
Walker Stevens Cannom LLP
contact info
Daniel Glen Swanson
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Cynthia Richman
Gibson Dunn And Crutcher LLP
contact info
Anna Tryon Pletcher
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Katrina Marie Robson
O'Melveny And Myers
contact info
Nicole Lauren Castle
Mcdermott Will And Emery LLP
contact info
Mark A. Perry
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
David R. Eberhart
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Karen Hoffman Lent
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher Flom LLP
contact info
Elena Zarabozo
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Veronica Smith Lewis
Gibson Dunn Crutcher LLP
contact info
Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Donald R. Cameron
Represented By
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Ben Michael Harrington
Hagens Berman
contact info
Robert F Lopez
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Miscellaneous
Samsung Electronics America Inc
Represented By
Kyle Kenneth Batter
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Sullivan
contact info
Victoria F. Maroulis
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP
contact info
Miscellaneous
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd
Represented By
Kyle Kenneth Batter
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Sullivan
contact info
Plaintiff
Epic Games, Inc.
Represented By
Michael Brent Byars
Cravath, Swaine Moore LLP
contact info
John I Karin
Cravath, Swaine And Moore LLP
contact info
Christina Norma Barreiro
Cravath, Swaine Moore LLP
contact info
Hector J Valdes
Cravath, Swaine And Moore LLP
contact info
Omid H. Nasab
Cravath, Swaine Moore LLP
contact info
Lauren Ann Moskowitz
Cravath Swaine Moore LLP
contact info
Samuel Adams Stuckey
Cravath, Swaine Moore LLP
contact info
Katherine B. Forrest
Cravath Swaine And Moore LLP
contact info
Justin C Clarke
Cravath, Swaine And Moore LLP
contact info
Darin P. McAtee
Cravath, Swaine And Moore LLP
contact info
Paul Jeffrey Riehle
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Nathan E Denning
Wiggin And Dana LLP
contact info
Benjamin Hans Diessel
Wiggin And Dana LLP
contact info
Joe Wesley Earnhardt
Cravath, Swaine And Moore LLP
contact info
Robert Seth Hoff
Wiggin And Dana LLP
contact info
Vanessa A. Lavely
Cravath, Swaine And Moore LLP
contact info
Christine A Varney
Cravath, Swaine And Moore LLP
contact info
Gary Andrew Bornstein
Cravath, Swaine And Moore
contact info
Yonatan Even
Cravath, Swaine And Moore LLP
contact info


1. Apple takes its fight with Epic Games over the App Store to court (washingtonpost.com)
Submitted Wed 05/12/2021
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
1512 1512 NOTICE by Epic Games, Inc. re1468 Order for Parties to Submit Hard Copies re: Objections to the Special Masters Rulings (Zaken, Michael)
Related: [-]
1511 1511 1 pgs ORDER OF REFERRAL TO UNITED STATES ATTORNEY FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/30/2025. (eac, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1510 1510 2 pgs RESPONSE re1498 Objection to Special Master Rulings on Apple Inc.'s Productions of Re-Reviewed Documents by Epic Games, Inc.. (Even, Yonatan)
Related: [-]
1508 1508 ORDER GRANTING EPIC GAMES, INC.'S MOTION TO ENFORCE INJUNCTION; DENYING APPLE INC.'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT; DENYING APPLE INC.'S MOTION UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF EVIDENCE 502(D); DENYING APPLE INC.'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON ITS INDEMNIFICATION COUNTERCLAIM WITHOUT PREJUDICE; AND REFERRAL TO THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY RE CRIMINAL CONTEMPT by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Terminating 876 Motion for Attorney Fees; Granting 897 Motion ; Denying 1018 Motion to Set Aside Judgment; Terminating 1198 Motion ; Terminating 1328 Motion to Strike. (eac, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1507 1507 NOTICE by Apple Inc. / Notice of Lodging of Privilege Log Entries 4457, 4527, 4592, 4813, 5900, 7706, 7756, 8030, 8067 and 8122 for In Camera Review (Perry, Mark)
Related: [-]
1506 1506 RESPONSE re1494 Objection, to Special Master Rulings on Apple Inc.'s Productions of Re-Reviewed Privileged Documents by Apple Inc.. (Perry, Mark)
Related: [-]
1505 1505 RESPONSE re1492 Objection, to Special Master Rulings on Apple Inc.'s Productions of Re-Reviewed Privileged Documents by Apple Inc.. (Perry, Mark)
Related: [-]
1504 1504 Statement re1485 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 79-5 regarding Epic Games, Inc.'s Response to Apple's Objection to Special Master Ruling (Apple Inc.'s Statement in Support of Sealing) by Apple Inc..(Perry, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Mark A. Perry,
Att: 2 Exhibit A (Redacted),
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
1503 1503 ORDER: In ECF No. 1459 , Epic stated that the Special Masters stated they would endeavor to complete the review of all remaining documents no later than May 15, 2025. The Court ORDERS the parties to file a status report on May 16, 2025. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 4/29/2025. (tshlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1502 1502 NOTICE by Apple Inc. / Notice of Lodging of Privilege Log Entries 3602, 3607, 3968 and 4174 for In Camera Review (Perry, Mark)
Related: [-]
1501 1501 RESPONSE re1489 Objection, to Special Master Rulings on Apple Inc.'s Productions of Re-Reviewed Privileged Documents by Apple Inc.. (Perry, Mark)
Related: [-]
1500 1500 Statement re1481 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 79-5 regarding Epic Games, Inc.'s Objections to Special Master Determinations (Apple Inc.'s Statement in Support of Sealing) by Apple Inc..(Perry, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Mark A. Perry,
Att: 2 Exhibit A (Redacted),
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Monday, April 28, 2025
1499 1499 NOTICE by Apple Inc. / Notice of Lodging of Privilege Log Entries 4423 and 4428 for In Camera Review (Perry, Mark)
Related: [-]
1498 1498 OBJECTIONS to Special Master Ruling on Apple Inc.'s Productions of Re-Reviewed Privileged Documents by Apple Inc..(Perry, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Privilege Log Excerpts
1497 1497 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit A to Objections to Special Master Rulings filed by Apple Inc..(Perry, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Mark A. Perry,
Att: 2 Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A - Privilege Log Excerpts,
Att: 4 Certificate/Proof of Service
1496 1496 NOTICE by Epic Games, Inc. re1468 Order for Parties to Submit Hard Copies re: Objections to Special Masters Rulings (Zaken, Michael)
Related: [-]
1495 1495 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 79-5 filed by Epic Games, Inc..(Even, Yonatan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Certificate/Proof of Service
1494 1494 OBJECTIONS to Special Master Determinations Issued April 22, 2025 Regarding Apple's Withheld Documents by Epic Games, Inc..(Even, Yonatan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Y. Even in Support of Epic Games Inc.'s Objections to Special Master Determinations,
Att: 2 Exhibit A
1493 1493 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 79-5 filed by Epic Games, Inc..(Even, Yonatan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Certificate/Proof of Service
1492 1492 OBJECTIONS to Special Master Determinations Regarding Redacted Documents by Epic Games, Inc..(Even, Yonatan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Y. Even in Support of Epic Games Inc.'s Objections to Special Master Determinations Regarding Redacted Documents,
Att: 2 Exhibit A
1491 1491 Statement re1476 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 79-5 regarding Epic Games, Inc.'s Objections to Special Master Determinations (Apple Inc.'s Statement in Support of Sealing) by Apple Inc..(Perry, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Mark A. Perry,
Att: 2 Exhibit A (Redacted),
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Friday, April 25, 2025
1490 1490 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed filed by Epic Games, Inc..(Even, Yonatan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Certificate/Proof of Service
1489 1489 OBJECTIONS to Special Master Determinations Regarding Redacted Documents by Epic Games, Inc..(Even, Yonatan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Yonatan Even In Support of Epic Games, Inc.'s Objections to Special Master Determinations Regarding Redacted Documents,
Att: 2 Exhibit A
1488 1488 NOTICE by Epic Games, Inc. re1468 Order for Parties to Submit Hard Copies re: Objections to the Special Masters Rulings (Zaken, Michael)
Related: [-]
1487 1487 Statement re1470 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 79-5 regarding Epic Games, Inc.'s Objections to Special Master Determinations (Apple Inc.'s Statement in Support of Sealing) by Apple Inc..(Perry, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Mark A. Perry,
Att: 2 Exhibit A (Redacted),
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 24, 2025
1486 1486 Statement re1464 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 79-5 Regarding Epic Games, Inc's Objections to Special Master Rulings (Apple Inc.'s Statement In Support of Sealing) by Apple Inc..(Perry, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Mark A. Perry,
Att: 2 Exhibit A (Redacted),
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
1485 1485 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 79-5 filed by Epic Games, Inc..(Even, Yonatan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Certificate/Proof of Service
1484 1484 Response re1471 Objection to Special Master Rulings on Apple's Productions of Re-Reviewed Documents by Epic Games, Inc..(Even, Yonatan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Y. Even in Support of Epic Games's, Inc.'s Response to Apple's Objections to Special Master Rulings on Apple's Productions of Re-Reviewed Documents,
Att: 2 Exhibit A
1483 1483 NOTICE by Apple Inc. / Notice of Lodging of Privilege Log Entries 5699, 5715, 5735, 5739, 7717, 7868, 7877, 7968, 8035, 8180 and 8347 for In Camera Review (Perry, Mark)
Related: [-]
1482 1482 RESPONSE re1475 Objection, to Special Master Rulings Issued April 15, 2025 Regarding Apple Inc.'s Productions of Re-Reviewed Privileged Documents by Apple Inc.. (Perry, Mark)
Related: [-]