Texas Eastern District Court
Case #: 6:20-cr-00050
Case Filed:Jul 15, 2020
Last checked: Friday Aug 14, 2020 2:36 AM CDT
Defendant
Tammy Lynn Dilbeck (4)
Represented By
L. Charles Van Cleef
Van Cleef Law Office
contact info
Defendant
Nasir Saleh-Saad Jabr (2)
Represented By
Kenneth Robert Hawk, II
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Defendant
Ralph Paul Pressley, III (3)
Represented By
Bobby D. Mims
Bobby D. Mims, PC
contact info
Defendant
Theresa Cecelia Soliz (1)
Represented By
Thomas Buie McClain
Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Lucas Ryan Machicek
United States Attorney'S Office - Tyler
contact info

GPO Jan 04 2021
FINDINGS OF FACT and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Plea of Guilty as to Ralph Paul Pressley, III. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 01/04/21. (mll, )
GPO Jan 07 2021
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as to Ralph Paul Pressley, III for 73 Findings of Fact, Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 01/06/2021. (efarris, )
GPO Jan 12 2021
FINDINGS OF FACT and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Plea of Guilty as to Nasir Saleh-Saad Jabr. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 01/12/21. (mll, )
GPO Jan 12 2021
FINDINGS OF FACT and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Plea of Guilty as to Tammy Lynn Dilbeck. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 01/12/21. (mll, )
GPO Jan 13 2021
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS AND FINDING DEFENDANT GUILTY as to Nasir Saleh-Saad Jabr for 86 Findings of Fact, Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 1/13/2021. (efarris, )
GPO Jan 13 2021
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and FINDING DEFENDANT GUILTY as to Tammy Lynn Dilbeck for 88 Findings of Fact, Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 1/13/2021. (efarris, )
GPO Mar 04 2021
FINDINGS OF FACT and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Plea of Guilty as to Theresa Cecelia Soliz. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 03/04/21. (mll, )
GPO Mar 04 2021
ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S FINDINGS OF FACT AND RECOMMENDATION ON GUILTY PLEA as to Theresa Cecelia Soliz for 104 Findings of Fact, Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 3/4/2021. (efarris, )

Docket last updated: 08/14/2020 3:05 AM CDT
Wednesday, July 15, 2020
1 1 SEALED INDICTMENT as to Theresa Cecelia Soliz (1) count(s) 1, 6, Nasir Saleh-Saad Jabr (2) count(s) 1, 2, 5, 7, 8, Ralph Paul Pressley, III (3) count(s) 1, 3-4, Tammy Lynn Dilbeck (4) count(s) 1, 3-4. (mll, )
Related: [-]
8 8 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum as to Nasir Saleh-Saad Jabr(mll, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order