Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Denise J Casper
Case #: 1:20-cv-11538
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Aug 16, 2020
Terminated:Oct 21, 2021
Last checked: Friday Feb 12, 2021 3:51 AM EST
Defendant
City of Newton
Represented By
Jennifer C. Pucci
City Of Newton Law Department
contact info
Plaintiff
Gregory Perez
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Mark Whooten
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Brian Quinn
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Matthew Pinzone
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Chris Petrie
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Rui Perpetua
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Carlo Quiles
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Dennis Panza
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeffrey O'Neil
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Brian Napolitano
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Al Moru
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Timothy Mcdonnell
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Brian Malo
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Steven Magazy
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Donald Leblanc
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Henry Langevin
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Joseph Ratta
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Josh Richardson
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Brian Riordan
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kelvin Sanders, Jr.
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Sanford
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Brian Saulnier
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Nick Shubarian
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Peter Spinelli
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Paul Thea
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Gregory Wansiewicz
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kendell Washington
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Paul Whelan
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
James White
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Mark Woods
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Stephen Yerardi
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Brendan Butler
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
William Conservo
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
E. Peter Colon
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Arthur Carter
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Patrick Carresi
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Scott Carlin
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Erik Capoccia
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Cannistrano
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Dominic Camilli
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Matthew D'Agastino
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Brad Butera
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
John Bryant
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Moses Brisson
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Paul Bindon
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Frank Bianco
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
William Bertrand
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Barrile
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ben Langkopf
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert D'Agastino
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Mike Daniele
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Antonio Decaro
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Arbold Dobson
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Matthew Drakas
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Joseph Driscoll
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeff Eccles
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Andrew Fadden
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Eugene Farese
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
John Fleming
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Fleming, Sr.,
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jackson Florestal
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Stephen Hodgdon
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Seth Humphreys
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Cleber De Almeida
Represented By
William T. Harrington
Harrington Rice, P.C.
contact info
Daniel W Rice
Glynn, Landry & Rice, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Thursday, October 21, 2021
65 65 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 10/21 4:44 PM
Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. Joint Motion for Approval of Settlement Agreement and Dismissal with Prejudice is GRANTED. The Court APPROVES the settlement reached by the Parties in this matter. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED, that this case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. (Hourihan, Lisa)
Related: [-]
minutes Motion Hearing Order on Motion for Settlement Thu 10/21 4:00 PM
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Denise J. Casper: Motion Hearing held on 10/21/2021 re61 Joint MOTION for Settlement of FLSA Claims filed by Patrick Carresi by video conference. Court hears from counsel. Copy of settlement agreement provided to the Court. Court grants61 Motion for Settlement and approves the settlement. Order to issue. (Court Reporter: Debra Joyce at joycedebra@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Daniel Rice for the plaintffs. Jennifer Pucci for the defendant.) (Hourihan, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 15, 2021
63 63 misc Proposed Documents Submitted to the Court Fri 10/15 4:17 PM
Proposed Document(s) submitted by Patrick Carresi. Document received: Proposed Order. (Rice, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 14, 2021
notice Notice Setting or Resetting Hearing on Motion Thu 10/14 8:47 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion61 Joint MOTION for Settlement of FLSA Claims : This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible. Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: [LINK:https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html] . For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on [LINK:www.mad.uscourts.gov] or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov . Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2021 03:00 PM in Courtroom 11 Related [+] before Judge Denise J. Casper. Counsel to file a one-page proposed order for approval of the settlement by 10/18/21.(Hourihan, Lisa)
Related: [-] mote only