California Central District Court
Judge:Michael W Fitzgerald
Referred: Pedro V Castillo
Case #: 2:20-cv-07441
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Aug 18, 2020
Terminated:Feb 04, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Feb 14, 2021 2:42 AM PST
Defendant
DOES 1-10
Defendant
VGA Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Ivan Mnatzaganian
Mnatz Law Group
contact info
Mediator (ADR Panel)
Stephen H Marcus
Represented By
Stephen H Marcus
Gittler And Bradford
contact info
Plaintiff
Brenda Core
Represented By
Anoush Hakimi
Law Office Of Hakimi And Shahriari
contact info
Peter Shahriari
Law Office Of Hakimi And Shahriari
contact info
Laura Anne Steven
Law Office Of Hakimi And Shahriari
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, February 04, 2021
25 25 order Dismissing Case Thu 02/04 3:51 PM
ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE24 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Plaintiff Brenda Core's action against Defendant VGA Holdings, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company is dismissed with prejudice. Each party will be responsible for their own fees and costs. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (iv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 03, 2021
24 24 stip Dismiss Case Wed 02/03 5:09 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Settlement filed by Plaintiff Brenda Core.(Attorney Laura Anne Steven added to party Brenda Core(pty:pla))(Steven, Laura)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Dismissing Case
Thursday, January 28, 2021
23 23 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 01/29 10:35 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. In light of the Notice of Settlement filed January 12, 2021, the Court sets a hearing on Order To Show Cause Re Dismissal for March 29, 2021 at 11:30 a.m. If a stipulated dismissal is filed prior to this date, the matter will be taken off calendar and no appearance is needed. All other hearings and deadlines are hereby vacated. (iv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 19, 2021
22 22 notice Settlement Tue 01/19 1:24 PM
NOTICE of Settlement signed jointly and filed by Plaintiff Brenda Core. (Steven, Laura)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 07, 2021
21 21 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 01/07 1:29 PM
ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. In light of the expiration of the Stay Re Early Mediation and the reports that this matter has not settled, Defendant shall respond to the Complaint no later than 1/22/2021. If Defendant fails to timely file a response to the Complaint, Plaintiff shall file an Application to Clerk to Enter Default no later than 1/29/2021. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smom)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 04, 2020
20 20 misc Status Report Fri 12/04 4:09 PM
STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiff Brenda Core. (Shahriari, Peter)
Related: [-]
19 19 adr Mediation Report (ADR-3) Unable to Reach Agreement Fri 12/04 10:19 AM
MEDIATION REPORT Filed by Mediator (ADR Panel) Stephen H Marcus: Mediation held on December 3, 2020. The parties are unable to reach an agreement at this time. Counsel: Please evaluate the effectiveness of the ADR Program by completing a survey on your mediation experience. To access the survey, click on the following link:[LINK:MediationParticipantSurvey] (Marcus, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 04, 2020
18 18 adr Notice of Mediation Date (ADR-13) Wed 11/04 4:18 PM
NOTICE OF MEDIATION DATE filed. Mediation set for December 3, 2020.(Marcus, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 27, 2020
17 17 adr Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11) Tue 10/27 1:51 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Stephen H Marcus has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 20, 2020
16 16 adr Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Assigned) - (ADR-2) Tue 10/20 12:39 PM
STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties request that the ADR Program assign a Panel Mediator from the following area of law: ADA Access Litigation. Filed by Plaintiff Brenda Core(Shahriari, Peter)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 15, 2020
15 15 misc Statement Thu 10/15 3:27 PM
STATEMENT of Case filed by Plaintiff Brenda Core re: Order on Application to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-22)14 . (Shahriari, Peter)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 02, 2020
14 14 order Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-22) Fri 10/02 3:24 PM
ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Granting13 APPLICATION to Stay Case re Early Mediation ADA Disability Access Litigation as to All Defendants. The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than 12/16/2020. (iv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
13 13 motion Stay Case and Early Mediation (ADR-21) Tue 09/15 4:26 PM
APPLICATION to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation, filed by Defendant VGA Holdings, LLC. Application set for hearing on 10/21/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (Attorney Ivan Mnatzaganian added to party VGA Holdings, LLC(pty:dft)) (Mnatzaganian, Ivan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, September 09, 2020
12 12 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 09/09 10:20 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brenda Core, upon Defendant VGA Holdings, LLC served on 9/2/2020, answer due 9/23/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gabriel Tashchyan - Co-occupant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Shahriari, Peter)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 03, 2020
11 11 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Thu 09/03 2:34 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DECLINING TO EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER PLAINTIFF'S STATE LAW CLAIMS by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. In light of the foregoing, the Court, in its discretion, declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiffs state claims asserted in the Complaint. The Court therefore dismisses any such claims without prejudice. (iv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 02, 2020
10 10 misc Response Wed 09/02 10:27 AM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Brenda Coreto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,,9 (Shahriari, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Peter Shahriari in support,
Att: 2 Declaration of Brenda Core
Thursday, August 20, 2020
9 9 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 08/20 3:19 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Plaintiff is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE in writing as to why this Court should exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act claim and the other state law claims alleged by Plaintiff. The Response shall be filed on or before SEPTEMBER 3, 2020. Failure to timely or adequately respond to this Order to Show Cause may, without further warning, result in the dismissal of the entire action without prejudice or the Court's declining to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act claim and the dismissal of that claim pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1367(c). (iv)
Related: [-]
8 8 adr Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20) Thu 08/20 3:17 PM
NOTICE to Parties Re (ADR-20) ADA Disability Access Litigation/Application for Stay and Early Mediation: PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED to serve the ADA Packet on Defendant(s) at the same time the summons and complaint are served, if possible. If, upon receipt of this Notice to Parties, Plaintiff has already served Defendant(s), Plaintiff must serve the ADA Packet no later than fourteen (14) days after this Notice to Parties is filed by the Court. Within three (3) days of serving Defendant(s), Plaintiff must file with the Court a proof of service indicating that the ADA Packet was served on Defendant(s). *See Notice for further details.* (smom)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 19, 2020
7 7 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 08/19 3:06 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant VGA Holdings, LLC. (jtil)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 08/19 2:58 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 08/19 2:57 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 18, 2020
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 08/18 6:06 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Brenda Core, (Shahriari, Peter)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 08/18 6:06 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Brenda Core. (Shahriari, Peter)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Summons Request Tue 08/18 6:05 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Brenda Core. (Shahriari, Peter)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 08/18 6:05 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27672686 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Brenda Core. (Attorney Peter Shahriari added to party Brenda Core(pty:pla))(Shahriari, Peter)
Related: [-]