Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Cynthia M Rufe
Case #: 2:20-cv-04020
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:451 Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Aug 18, 2020
Terminated:Mar 04, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Feb 14, 2021 4:17 AM EST
Defendant
ABC CORPORATIONS 1 THROUGH 10
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1 THROUGH 10
Defendant
LORIE A. KERNECKEL
Represented By
SARAH E. BOUCHARD
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
ERIC C. KIM
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Defendant
BARBARA ROZSAS
Represented By
SARAH E. BOUCHARD
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
ERIC C. KIM
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Defendant
URBAN OUTFITTERS, INC.
Represented By
SARAH E. BOUCHARD
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
ERIC C. KIM
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
JENNIFER WEILER
Represented By
NICHOLAS A. VYTELL
Reppert Kelly & Vytell LLC
contact info
J. VINCENT REPPERT
Reppert Kelly & Vytell LLC
contact info
GREGORY MARCHESINI
Sandler & Marchesini, P.C.
contact info
Unrepresented Party
LORIE A. KERNECKEL
5000 SOUTH BROAD ST.
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19112
Unrepresented Party
BARBARA ROZSAS
5000 SOUTH BROAD STREET
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19112
Unrepresented Party
URBAN OUTFITTERS, INC.
5000 SOUTH BROAD STREET
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19112


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, March 04, 2021
15 15 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case - 41(b) Thu 03/04 9:45 AM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS ON 3/4/21. 3/4/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 25, 2021
14 14 order Scheduling Order Thu 02/25 2:47 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER THAT FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 7/16/21. COUNSEL FOR THE PARTIES ARE DIRECTED TO REPORT TO JUDGE WELLS CHAMBERS ON 3/11/21 AT 10:00 A.M.. ALL DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED ON OR BEFORE 9/15/21; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 2/25/21. 2/25/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 16, 2021
13 13 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 02/16 10:37 AM
ORDER THAT THE RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE HAS BEEN RESCHEDULED TO TAKE PLACE ON TUESDAY, 2/23/21 AT 2:30 PM BEFORE HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 2/16/21. 2/16/21 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 09, 2021
12 12 misc Report Of Tue 02/09 7:41 PM
Report Of Rule 26(f) Meeting, Joint by LORIE A. KERNECKEL, BARBARA ROZSAS, URBAN OUTFITTERS, INC.. (KIM, ERIC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 27, 2021
11 11 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 01/27 1:50 PM
ORDER THAT THE RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE HAS BEEN RESCHEDULED TO TAK PLACE ON TUESDAY, 2/16/21 AT 10:30 AM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 1/27/21. 1/27/21 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 26, 2021
10 10 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 01/26 3:19 PM
ORDER THAT A RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE IS SET FOR WEDNESDAY, 2/10/21 AT 10:30 AM BEFORE HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 1/26/21. 1/26/21 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/26 12:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC C. KIM on behalf of LORIE A. KERNECKEL, BARBARA ROZSAS, URBAN OUTFITTERS, INC. with Certificate of Service(KIM, ERIC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, January 25, 2021
8 8 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Mon 01/25 7:05 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by URBAN OUTFITTERS, INC..(BOUCHARD, SARAH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 01/25 7:03 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by LORIE A. KERNECKEL, BARBARA ROZSAS, URBAN OUTFITTERS, INC..(BOUCHARD, SARAH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, December 16, 2020
misc Remark Wed 12/16 9:45 AM
PAPERS #5, #6 MAILED TO UNREPS (JL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 15, 2020
6 6 1 pgs order Order Tue 12/15 11:33 AM
ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF J. VINCENT REPPERT, ESQ.3 TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LRCP 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 12/15/20. 12/15/20 ENTERED & E-MAILED. NOT MAILED TO UNREPS.(fdc)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order Tue 12/15 11:32 AM
ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF NICHOLAS A. VYTELL, ESQ.3 TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LRCP 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 12/15/20. 12/15/20 ENTERED & E-MAILED. NOT MAILED TO UNREPS.(fdc)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Tue 12/15 10:14 AM
APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of J. Vincent Reppert, Esquire by JENNIFER WEILER. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14781184.). (MARCHESINI, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Tue 12/15 10:12 AM
APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of NICHOLAS A. VYTELL by JENNIFER WEILER. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14781109.). (MARCHESINI, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 01, 2020
2 2 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 12/01 1:09 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JENNIFER WEILER. All Defendants. (MARCHESINI, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 19, 2020
service Summons Issued Wed 08/19 1:07 PM
Summons Issued as to LORIE A. KERNECKEL, BARBARA ROZSAS, URBAN OUTFITTERS, INC.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 8/19/2020 (bw, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 18, 2020
1 1 22 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney) Tue 08/18 10:54 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14502068.), filed by JENNIFER WEILER.(MARCHESINI, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Tue 08/18 2:04 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by JENNIFER WEILER. (JL )
Related: [-]