Washington Eastern District Court
Judge:Stanley A Bastian
Case #: 1:20-cv-03127
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Aug 18, 2020
Last checked: Friday Oct 02, 2020 1:54 AM PDT
Amicus
Amici Curiae Brady and Team Enough
Represented By
Theresa DeMonte
Mcnaul Ebel Nawrot & Helgren PLLC
contact info
Amicus
Amici Curiae Members of Congress
Represented By
Emily Dodds Powell
Calfo Eakes & Ostrovsky PLLC
contact info
Dayna J Zolle
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Brianne J Gorod
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Elizabeth B Wydra
Constitutional Accountability Center
contact info
Anna F Cavnar
Calfo Eakes & Ostrovsky PLLC
contact info
Amicus
City of Seattle
Represented By
Ghazal Sharifi
Seattle City Attorney'S Office
contact info
Amicus
United States House of Representatives
Represented By
Douglas Letter
Office Of General Counsel - Dc
contact info
Defendant
Louis DeJoy
Represented By
Joseph Borson
U S Department Of Justice (civil)
contact info
Alexis Echols
Us Department Of Justice - Dc
contact info
Defendant
Donald J Trump
President of United States of America The White House 1600 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20500
Represented By
Joseph Borson
U S Department Of Justice (civil)
contact info
Alexis Echols
Us Department Of Justice - Dc
contact info
Defendant
United States Postal Service
Represented By
Joseph Borson
U S Department Of Justice (civil)
contact info
Alexis Echols
Us Department Of Justice - Dc
contact info
Defendant
United States of America
Represented By
Joseph Borson
U S Department Of Justice (civil)
contact info
Alexis Echols
Us Department Of Justice - Dc
contact info
Plaintiff
Commonwealth of Virginia
Commonwealth of Virginia Attorney General's Office 202 North Ninth St.
Richmond, VA 23219
Represented By
Noah G Purcell
Attorney General Of Washington
contact info
Michelle S Kallen
Office Of The Attorney General - Va
contact info
Kristin Beneski
Attorney Generals Office - Seattle (tort)
contact info
Carol L Lewis
Office Of The Attorney General - Va
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Colorado
State of Colorado Attorney General's Office 1300 Broadway, 10th Floor
Denver, CO 80203
Represented By
Noah G Purcell
Attorney General Of Washington
contact info
Kristin Beneski
Attorney Generals Office - Seattle (tort)
contact info
Eric R Olson
Office Of The Attorney General - Co
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Connecticut
State of Connecticut Attorney General's Office 165 Capitol Avenue
Hartford, CT 06106
Represented By
Noah G Purcell
Attorney General Of Washington
contact info
Kristin Beneski
Attorney Generals Office - Seattle (tort)
contact info
Joshua Perry
Office Of The Attorney General - Ct
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Illinois
State of Illinois 100 West Randolph St., 12th Floor
Chicago, IL 60601
Represented By
Noah G Purcell
Attorney General Of Washington
contact info
Kristin Beneski
Attorney Generals Office - Seattle (tort)
contact info
Christopher G Wells
Office Of The Attorney General - Il
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Maryland
State of Maryland Attorney General's Office 200 St. Paul Place
Baltimore, MD 21202
Represented By
Noah G Purcell
Attorney General Of Washington
contact info
Jeffrey Paul Dunlap
Office Of The Attorney General - Md
contact info
Kristin Beneski
Attorney Generals Office - Seattle (tort)
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Michigan
State of Michigan Attorney General's Office 525 W. Ottowa Street
Lansing, MI 48933
Represented By
Noah G Purcell
Attorney General Of Washington
contact info
Kristin Beneski
Attorney Generals Office - Seattle (tort)
contact info
Christina Grossi
Michigan Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Minnesota
State of Minnesota Attorney General's Office 445 Minnesota St., Ste. 1400
St. Paul, MN 55101
Represented By
Noah G Purcell
Attorney General Of Washington
contact info
Kristin Beneski
Attorney Generals Office - Seattle (tort)
contact info
Angela Behrens
Office Of The Attorney General - Mn
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Nevada
State of Nevada Attorney General's Office 555 E. Washington Ave., Ste. 3900
Las Vegas, NV 89101
Represented By
Noah G Purcell
Attorney General Of Washington
contact info
Kristin Beneski
Attorney Generals Office - Seattle (tort)
contact info
Heidi Parry Stern
Office Of The Attorney General - Nv
contact info
Plaintiff
State of New Mexico
State of New Mexico Attorney General's Office 201 Third St. NW, Ste. 300
Albuquergue, NM 87102
Represented By
Noah G Purcell
Attorney General Of Washington
contact info
Nicholas M Sydow
Office Of The Attorney General - Nm Albuquerque
contact info
Kristin Beneski
Attorney Generals Office - Seattle (tort)
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Oregon
State of Oregon Attorney General's Office 100 SW Market Street
Portland, OR 97201
Represented By
Noah G Purcell
Attorney General Of Washington
contact info
James S Smith
Oregon State Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Rhode Island
State of Rhode Island Attorney General's Office 150 South Main Street
Providence, RI 02903
Represented By
Noah G Purcell
Attorney General Of Washington
contact info
Kristin Beneski
Attorney Generals Office - Seattle (tort)
contact info
Keith Hoffmann
Office Of The Attorney General - Ri
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Vermont
State of Vermont Attorney General's Office 109 State Street
Montpelier, VT 05609
Represented By
Noah G Purcell
Attorney General Of Washington
contact info
Eleanor Spottswood
Office Of Attorney General - Vt
contact info
Kristin Beneski
Attorney Generals Office - Seattle (tort)
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Washington
State of Washington Attorney General's Office 800 Fifth Avenue, Suite 2000
Seattle, WA 98104
Represented By
Noah G Purcell
Attorney General Of Washington
contact info
Karl D Smith
Washington State Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Andrew Wenderoff Hughes
Washington State Attorney General - Seattle
contact info
Kristin Beneski
Attorney Generals Office - Seattle (tort)
contact info
Emma Grunberg
Attorney General Of Washington
contact info
Cristina Sepe
Washington State Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Nathan Bays
Attorney Generals Office - Seattle (tort)
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Wisconsin
State of Wisconsin Attorney General's Office P. O. Box 7857
Madison, WI 53707
Represented By
Noah G Purcell
Attorney General Of Washington
contact info
Kristin Beneski
Attorney Generals Office - Seattle (tort)
contact info
Colin Roth
Wisconsin Department Of Justice
contact info

GPO Sep 03 2020
ORDER GRANTING 49 DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ENTRY OF A PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (LTR, Case Administrator)
GPO Sep 17 2020
ORDER GRANTING 54 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (LTR, Case Administrator)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, November 23, 2020
117 117 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 11/23 10:02 AM
Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, ECF No.116 , is GRANTED. The deadline to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is extended to December 9, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A. Bastian. Text entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order on the matter. (LTR, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 20, 2020
116 116 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 11/20 12:07 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by All Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2020 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian.(Borson, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order