Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Timothy S Hillman
Case #: 4:20-cv-40105
Nature of Suit140 Contract - Negotiable Instrument
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Aug 19, 2020
Terminated:Nov 06, 2020
Last checked: Monday Feb 15, 2021 3:32 AM EST
Defendant
Chosen Consulting, LLC
211 North Broadway Suite 2035
St. Louis, MO 63102
Defendant
Jay Orlinsky
1135 Boulevard
New Milford, NJ 07646
Defendant
Moshe Orlinsky
286 Ridge Street
New Milford, NJ 07646
Plaintiff
Berkshire Bank
386 Main Street
Worcester, MA 01608
Represented By
Robert B. Gibbons
Mirick, O'Connell, Demallie & Lougee
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, November 05, 2020
8 8 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 11/05 9:02 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Berkshire Bank (Gibbons, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 21, 2020
7 7 service Affidavit of Service Mon 09/21 3:45 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Berkshire Bank. Jay Orlinsky served on 9/8/2020, answer due 9/29/2020. Acknowledgement filed by Berkshire Bank. (Gibbons, Robert)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Mon 09/21 3:43 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Berkshire Bank. Moshe Orlinsky served on 9/8/2020, answer due 9/29/2020. Acknowledgement filed by Berkshire Bank. (Gibbons, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 20, 2020
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 08/20 9:40 AM
Summons Issued as to Chosen Consulting, LLC, Jay Orlinsky, Moshe Orlinsky. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Case Assignment Thu 08/20 9:39 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Jones, Sherry)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 19, 2020
3 3 5 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Wed 08/19 12:43 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Berkshire Bank. (Gibbons, Robert)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Preliminary Injunction Wed 08/19 12:42 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Berkshire Bank.(Gibbons, Robert)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 08/19 12:39 PM
COMPLAINT (Verified) against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8380571 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Berkshire Bank.(Gibbons, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-F,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Category Sheet