New York Southern District Court
Judge:Gabriel W Gorenstein
Case #: 1:20-cv-06644
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Aug 19, 2020
Terminated:Nov 18, 2021
Last checked: Monday Feb 15, 2021 3:58 AM EST
Defendant
Ori Shinar
16 Concord Street
Connecticut, CT 06831
Represented By
Alan Gerson
Bruce Montague & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
Advanced Behavioral Health, LLP
Represented By
Vyacheslav Polyakov
Sibilla Alessi Pantano Gupta, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, November 18, 2021
78 78 misc AO 121 Form Copyright - Case Terminated - Submitted Thu 11/18 11:52 AM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE TERMINATED- SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 11/18/2021 in a court action filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (ama)
Related: [-]
77 77 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Thu 11/18 11:25 AM
ORDER OF DISCONTINUANCE: On October 27, 2020, an order was issued on the parties' consent agreeing to disposition of this matter by the undersigned pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). It has now been reported to the Court that the parties have reached a settlement of this matter. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that this action is dismissed with prejudice and without costs (including attorney's fees) to either party. If either party wishes to reinstate this matter, the party must make a letter application to the undersigned before the 30-day period expires seeking to re-open this matter. Any application to reopen filed thereafter may be denied solely for failure to meet the 30-day deadline. Any pending motions are moot. The Clerk is requested to close the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 11/18/2021) (ama)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 17, 2021
76 76 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 11/17 1:21 PM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) All Parties and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Suzanne Feinstein. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Polyakov, Vyacheslav) Modified on 11/17/2021 (km)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Voluntary Dismissal Wed 11/17 1:25 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Vyacheslav Polyakov. RE-FILE Document No. 76 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the voluntary dismissal is against was/were selected. When refiling, do not select that the dismissal is to all parties or all defendants. Please select each individual party that you are dismissing. Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed PDF. (km)
Related: [-]