Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Nora Barry Fischer
Case #: 2:20-cv-01224
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Aug 18, 2020
Terminated:Feb 12, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Feb 14, 2021 4:27 AM EST
Defendant
KAREN ATKISON
Defendant
GEORGE KUBINI
Defendant
CYNTHIA PIELIN
Defendant
JOEL RECK
Defendant
ARTHUR SMITH
Represented By
Stephen S. Stallings
The Law Offices Of Stephen S. Stallings, Esq.
contact info
Defendant
DANIEL J. SPORRER
Defendant
SANDRA SVARANOWIC
Represented By
William C. Kaczynski
contact info
Plaintiff
DOV RATCHKAUSKAS
Represented By
Andrew M. Gross
Gross & Patterson, LLC
contact info

GPO Feb 12 2021
MEMORANDUM OPINION Defendants' Motions to dismiss 5, 10, 12 are hereby GRANTED and his complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice. An appropriate order follows. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 02/12/2021. (aju)

Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, February 12, 2021
20 20 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 02/12 5:34 PM
ORDER granting12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by SANDRA SVARANOWIC,10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ARTHUR SMITH,5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by DANIEL J. SPORRER. Plaintiff Dov Ratchkauskas's Complaint is DISMISSED, with PREJUDICE as to Defendants George Kubini, Karen Atkison, Cynthia Pielin, Joel Reck, Daniel Sporrer, Arthur Smith, and Sandra Svaranowic. Clerk is to mark CASE CLOSED. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 02/12/2021. (aju)
Related: [-]
19 19 11 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Fri 02/12 5:27 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION Defendants' Motions to dismiss5 ,10 ,12 are hereby GRANTED and his complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice. An appropriate order follows. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 02/12/2021. (aju)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 22, 2021
18 18 respm Reply Brief Fri 01/22 3:20 PM
REPLY BRIEF re15 Brief in Opposition to Motion filed by SANDRA SVARANOWIC. (Kaczynski, William)
Related: [-]
17 17 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 01/22 12:10 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re15 Brief in Opposition to Motion filed by ARTHUR SMITH. (Stallings, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 08, 2021
16 16 order Order ~Util - Set Briefing Schedule Fri 01/08 5:55 PM
ORDER that upon consideration of15 Brief in Opposition to Motion filed by DOV RATCHKAUSKA, Defendants shall file a Reply brief by 1/22/2021. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 1/8/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdk)
Related: [-]
15 15 respm Brief / Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Fri 01/08 2:25 PM
BRIEF in Opposition re10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,12 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, filed by DOV RATCHKAUSKAS. (Gross, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 22, 2020
14 14 order Order Response/Briefing Schedule Tue 12/22 11:56 AM
ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re:10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by ARTHUR SMITH and12 Motion to Join and Adopt Defendant Arthur Smith's Motion to Dismiss filed by SANDRA SAVARANOWIC, and having conferred with counsel for the parties by email, the deadline for Plaintiff DOV RATCHKAUSKAS to file a Response to said Motions is extended to 1/8/2021. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 12/22/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 02, 2020
13 13 order Order Reassigning Case Wed 12/02 4:12 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Nora Barry Fischer for all further proceedings. Judge David S. Cercone no longer assigned to case. This civil action is related to 2:11cr14. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 12/2/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (kly)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 30, 2020
12 12 motion Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies) Mon 11/30 10:48 AM
MOTION re11 Brief in Support of Motion, filed by ARTHUR SMITH,10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ARTHUR SMITH to Join and Adopt Defendant Smiths Motion to Dismiss and Briefing by SANDRA SVARANOWIC. (Kaczynski, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
11 11 respm Brief / Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Mon 11/30 9:21 AM
BRIEF in Support re10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by ARTHUR SMITH. (Stallings, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Ratchkauskas Restitution Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Ratchkauskas Restitution Victim List,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Smith Judgment
10 10 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 11/30 9:18 AM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by ARTHUR SMITH. (Stallings, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, October 12, 2020
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/12 1:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by William C. Kaczynski on behalf of SANDRA SVARANOWIC. (Kaczynski, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 05, 2020
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 10/05 1:00 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DOV RATCHKAUSKAS. ARTHUR SMITH waiver sent on 10/1/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (Gross, Andrew)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/05 10:06 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen S. Stallings on behalf of ARTHUR SMITH. (Stallings, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 26, 2020
6 6 respm Response to Motion Sat 09/26 3:34 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by DOV RATCHKAUSKAS. (Gross, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Friday, September 11, 2020
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 09/14 3:38 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by DANIEL J. SPORRER. (jv)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Tuesday, September 08, 2020
4 4 service Summons/Return of Service Returned Executed Tue 09/08 3:24 PM
SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by DOV RATCHKAUSKAS. KAREN ATKISON served on 8/26/2020, answer due 9/16/2020; GEORGE KUBINI served on 8/20/2020, answer due 9/10/2020; CYNTHIA PIELIN served on 8/29/2020, answer due 9/21/2020; JOEL RECK served on 8/29/2020, answer due 9/21/2020; DANIEL J. SPORRER served on 8/26/2020, answer due 9/16/2020; SANDRA SVARANOWIC served on 8/20/2020, answer due 9/10/2020. (Gross, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 03, 2020
3 3 adr Notice of ADR Designation Thu 09/03 12:07 PM
NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (kak)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 19, 2020
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 08/19 11:40 AM
Summons Issued as to KAREN ATKISON, GEORGE KUBINI, CYNTHIA PIELIN, JOEL RECK, ARTHUR SMITH, DANIEL J. SPORRER, SANDRA SVARANOWIC (jv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 18, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint (for Clerk of Court personnel only) Wed 08/19 11:38 AM
COMPLAINT against KAREN ATKISON, GEORGE KUBINI, CYNTHIA PIELIN, JOEL RECK, ARTHUR SMITH, DANIEL J. SPORRER, SANDRA SVARANOWIC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5843208), filed by DOV RATCHKAUSKAS. (jv)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2