Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:19-bk-20836

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01190
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
Case Filed:Aug 19, 2020
Terminated:Jul 05, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Michael Bonert
273 S. Canon Drive
Beverly Hills, CA 90212
Represented By
Michael Bonert
contact info
Defendant
Vivien Bonert
273 S. Canon Drive
Beverly Hills, CA 90212
Represented By
Vivien Bonert
contact info
Plaintiff
Graphic Packaging International, LLC
Represented By
Scott E Blakeley
Blakeley LLP
contact info
Trustee
Gregory Kent Jones (TR)
Stradling Yocca Carlson & Rauth 10100 N. Santa Monica Blvd., Suite 1400
Los Angeles, CA 90067
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Tuesday, July 05, 2022
6 6 court Close Adversary Case Tue 07/05 9:33 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1190 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. (LG)
Related: [-]
Saturday, July 02, 2022
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 07/03 1:08 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 07/02/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, June 30, 2022
4 4 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Thu 06/30 2:32 PM
Order Granting Debtors Motion To Approve Compromise With Bakery Creditors, Disallowing Claim Nos. 5, 7, 11, 12, 17, 18, 21, 22, 23, 24, 25, 26, 27, 28, 30, And 31; Dismissing Related Adversary Proceedings. Order previously entered in bankruptcy case 2:19-bk-20836-ER, Michael Bonert and Vivien Bonert on 2/18/2021 (BNC-PDF) Signed on 6/30/2022 Related [+]. (LG)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Graphic Packaging International, LLC
Saturday, August 22, 2020
3 3 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 08/22 9:22 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 08/22/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, August 20, 2020
2 2 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Thu 08/20 10:06 AM
Order Consolidating Litigation Of Claims Asserted Against The Debtors Estate. with Adv. No. 2:19-ap-01377-ER being designated as the lead case . Creditors shall serve each Complaint upon the Debtors, but shall not be required to obtain and serve a Summons upon the Debtors in connection with each Complaint. (the Lead Case). (PLEASE READ ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (ORDER PREVIOUSLY ENTERED IN Adv. No. 2:19-ap-01377-ER ON 8/14/2020) (BNC-PDF) Signed on 8/20/2020. (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 19, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 08/19 2:49 PM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01190. Complaint by Graphic Packaging International, LLC against Michael Bonert, Vivien Bonert. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Blakeley, Scott)
Related: [-]