Missouri Western District Court
Case #: 4:20-cr-00153
Case Filed:Jul 22, 2020
Last checked: Friday Aug 21, 2020 2:15 AM CDT
Defendant
Kirby K Jones (1)
Represented By
Angela Claire Hasty
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Joseph M. Marquez
United States Attorney'S Office-Kcmo
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/21/2020 3:01 AM CDT
Friday, June 26, 2020
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Kirby K Jones (1). (Melvin, Greg) [4:20-mj-00055-SWH]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Monday, June 29, 2020
2 2 MOTION for detention hearing by USA as to Kirby K Jones. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/13/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Marquez, Joseph) [4:20-mj-00055-SWH]
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION to continue detention hearing by USA as to Kirby K Jones. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/13/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Marquez, Joseph) [4:20-mj-00055-SWH]
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sarah W. Hays: INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Kirby K Jones held on 6/29/2020. Defendant advised of the charges, penalties and rights. Bail not set; a motion for detention hearing and for continuance of hearing filed by Government; granted; defendant temporarily detained pending detention hearing. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshals. Defendant stated he has retained counsel and does not request court appointed counsel. Preliminary Hearing and Detention Hearing set for 7/1/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6D, Kansas City before Magistrate Judge Sarah W. Hays. Counsel appearing for USA: Sean Foley. Time in court: 2:03 p.m. to 2:08 p.m. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Tracey Richard, 816-512-5073. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Richard, Tracey) [4:20-mj-00055-SWH]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 30, 2020
5 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE - Angela Claire Hasty appearing for Kirby K Jones. (Attorney Angela Claire Hasty added to party Kirby K Jones(pty:dft))(Hasty, Angela) [4:20-mj-00055-SWH]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 01, 2020
7 7 BOND REPORT as to Kirby K Jones. Document is available to applicable parties only. Authorized users enter PACER login and password first for authentication. (Hamre, Nikki) [4:20-mj-00055-SWH]
Related: [-]
8 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sarah W. Hays: DETENTION and PRELIMINARY HEARING as to Kirby K Jones held on 7/1/2020. Parties appear in person and with counsel ready to proceed on government's motion for pretrial detention. Parties stipulate to the factual contents of the Pretrial Services Report as being the direct testimony of the Pretrial Services Officer. There were no changes or corrections. Court in brief recess at the request of the government so counsel may contact the Agent. Parties stipulate to the factual contents of the affidavit attached to the complaint as being the direct testimony of Task Force Officer Orion M. Mata. No direct or cross-examinations held. No further evidence or arguments presented regarding probable cause. Arguments presented regarding detention. Probable cause established. Dft bound over to U.S. District Court for grand jury action or other proceedings. Based on the information before the Court, government's motion for pretrial detention is granted. The Court found reason to believe that no condition or combination of conditions of release would reasonably assure the appearance of the defendant or the safety of any other person or persons and the community. Defendant ordered detained without bail pending trial. Written detention order to be forthcoming. Defendant remanded to the custody of the US Marshals. Counsel appearing for USA: Joe Marquez. Counsel appearing for Defendant: Angela Hasty. Pretrial/Probation Officer: Angela Palmerton. Time in court: 10:29 a.m. to 10:43 a.m. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Joella Baldwin, 816-512-5052. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Baldwin, Joella) [4:20-mj-00055-SWH]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Kirby K Jones. Signed on 7/1/2020 by Magistrate Judge Sarah W. Hays. (Richard, Tracey) [4:20-mj-00055-SWH]
Related: [-]
Friday, July 10, 2020
10 10 ARREST WARRANT RETURNED EXECUTED on 6/29/2020 as to Kirby K Jones. Pursuant to the E-Government Act and Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure 49.1(a), access to this document is restricted to case participants and the court. (Melvin, Greg) [4:20-mj-00055-SWH]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 22, 2020
11 11 3 pgs INDICTMENT as to Kirby K Jones (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4. (Crocker, Susan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet