New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Sanket J Bulsara
Referred: Sanket J Bulsara
Case #: 1:20-cv-03840
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Aug 21, 2020
Terminated:Mar 02, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 17, 2021 4:17 AM EST
Defendant
Steven Hublle
Represented By
Younghoon Ji
Ahne & Ji, LLP
contact info
Defendant
The Farm on Adderley
Represented By
Younghoon Ji
Ahne & Ji, LLP
contact info
Mediator
Raymond Nardo
Law Office of Raymond Nardo 129 Third Street
Mineola, NY 11501
Plaintiff
Eddy Luc
Represented By
Tyrone Anthony Blackburn
T. A. Blackburn Law, Pllc.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, March 02, 2022
order Order Dismissing Case Wed 03/02 12:53 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: The Court so-ordered the parties' stipulation of dismissal41 ; the Clerk of Court is directed to close the above case caption. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 3/2/2022. (Manson, Eddie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 01, 2022
41 41 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 03/01 12:21 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Gary Jonas, Allison McDowell (Raic, Leopold)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 08, 2022
order Order on Motion for Settlement Tue 02/08 5:39 PM
ORDER: The parties have filed a motion for settlement approval40 and have consented to jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge39 . Having reviewed the settlement agreement, I find that "the agreement reflects a reasonable compromise of disputed issues [rather] than a mere waiver of statutory rights brought about by an employer's overreaching." Le v. SITA Information Networking Computing, USA, Inc. , No. 07-CV-86, 2008 WL 724155, at *1 (E.D.N.Y. Mar. 13, 2008) (quotations and citation omitted); see also Cheeks v. Freeport Pancake House, Inc. , 796 F.3d 199 (2d Cir. 2015). In reaching this conclusion, I have considered, among other things, (1) that the settlement amount as reflected in the settlement agreement is substantial and fair in light of litigation risk and is within the possible range of recovery; (2) that the attorney's fees and costs portion of the settlement is reasonable and commensurate with the degree of success obtained, see Fisher v. SD Protection Inc. , 948 F.3d 593, 606-07 (2d Cir. 2020); (3) that the release provided for in the agreement is limited in scope; and (4) that the settlement agreement does not impose a duty of confidentiality. For the reasons above, the terms of the settlement are fair and reasonable and otherwise satisfy the factors set forth in Wolinsky v. Scholastic Inc. , 900 F. Supp. 2d 332, 335-36 (S.D.N.Y. 2012). See Fisher , 948 F.3d at 600 (instructing that Wolinsky factors guide fairness inquiry). The settlement is therefore approved, and the motion for settlement approval is granted. The parties are directed to file a stipulation of dismissal by 3/1/2022 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 2/8/2022. (Morrow, Emily)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 07, 2022
40 40 misc Settlement Agreement Mon 02/07 6:10 PM
SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT by Eddy Luc (Blackburn, Tyrone)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit C,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B
Tuesday, January 18, 2022
utility Case No Longer Referred Tue 01/18 9:33 AM
Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. (Gonzalez, Fida)
Related: [-]
misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Tue 01/18 9:43 AM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge: The39 Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge is So Ordered. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara for all further proceedings. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 1/18/2022. Judge Pamela K. Chen no longer assigned to case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Gonzalez, Fida)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 16, 2022
order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement Sun 01/16 5:06 PM
ORDER: In light of the parties' notice of settlement, the parties are directed to file a motion for settlement approval as required by Cheeks v. Freeport Pancake House, Inc. , 796 F.3d 199 (2d Cir. 2015) by 2/7/2022 . The motion to correct38 is granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 1/16/2022. (Morrow, Emily)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 14, 2022
39 39 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Fri 01/14 10:23 AM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Eddy Luc. (Blackburn, Tyrone)
Related: [-]
38 38 motion Amend/Correct/Supplement Fri 01/14 10:21 AM
First MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement37 Notice of Settlement by Eddy Luc. (Blackburn, Tyrone)
Related: [-]
37 37 notice Notice of Settlement Fri 01/14 10:13 AM
NOTICE of Settlement that the parties have reached an agreement in principle resolving this matter by Eddy Luc (Blackburn, Tyrone)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 22, 2021
minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 12/22 10:37 AM
MINUTE ENTRY AND ORDER: A status conference was held on 12/21/2021 before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Counsel for all parties were present. The Court adopts the parties' proposed discovery schedule36 as follows: the deadline to complete fact discovery is 8/3/2022 , the deadline to complete all discovery is 10/3/2022 , and the last date to take the first step in dispositive motion practice is 11/3/2022 . A settlement conference will be held on 3/7/2022 at 2:30 P.M. in courtroom in 324N before Magistrate Judge Bulsara. All parties must be present. Parties are to submit their respective ex parte settlement positions via Chamber's email no later than three days before 3/7/2022. Counsel are to refer to the Settlement Section of this Court's Individual Rules in preparation for the conference, which is available on the Court's website. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 12/22/2021. (AT&T Log: 12:31 - 12:35 P.M.) (Morrow, Emily)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Settlement Wed 12/22 4:34 PM
ORDER: For the reasons stated at the conference and hearing held on 8/19/2021, the motion for settlement approval21 as to the Defendants The Farm on Adderley and Steven Hublle is granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 12/22/2021. (Morrow, Emily)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 20, 2021
36 36 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Mon 12/20 11:46 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Blackburn, Tyrone)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 23, 2021
order Scheduling Order Tue 11/23 9:01 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: A status conference will be held on 12/21/2021 at 12:30 P.M. before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. The conference will proceed by video. The Court will send a Microsoft Teams meeting link to the email addresses listed on the docket. Counsel may request that the Court send the link to email addresses not on the docket by providing the email addresses to Chambers' email no later than 12/17/2021. All others may join the conference via telephone by using the toll-free number (877) 336-1274 and passcode 6534420. Parties shall join five (5) minutes prior to the start of the conference. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded that photographing, recording, or rebroadcasting of any Court proceeding or communication with the Court is prohibited. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 11/23/2021. (Morrow, Emily)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 21, 2021
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Case No Longer Referred Thu 10/21 12:19 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara for all pretrial, non-dispositive matters. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Mahoney, Brenna)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 20, 2021
35 35 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 10/20 3:45 PM
DEFENDANT'S ANSWER to25 Amended Complaint by Gary Jonas, Allison McDowell. (Raic, Leopold)
Related: [-]
34 34 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/20 3:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Leopold Raic on behalf of Gary Jonas, Allison McDowell (aty to be noticed) (Raic, Leopold)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 12, 2021
33 33 order Order(Other) Tue 10/12 12:12 PM
ORDER: The Stipulation of Dismissal32 is So Ordered. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 10/12/2021. (Morrow, Emily)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 11, 2021
32 32 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 10/11 12:42 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Eddy Luc As to Defendants The Farm on Adderley and Steven Hublle (Blackburn, Tyrone)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 05, 2021
31 31 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 10/05 10:29 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eddy Luc. Gary Jonas served on 10/1/2021, answer due 10/22/2021. (Blackburn, Tyrone)
Related: [-]
30 30 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 10/05 10:28 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eddy Luc. Allison McDowell served on 10/1/2021, answer due 10/22/2021. (Blackburn, Tyrone)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 29, 2021
29 29 service Summons Issued Wed 09/29 3:40 PM
Summons Issued as to Allison McDowell. (Galeano, Sonia)
Related: [-]
28 28 service Summons Issued Wed 09/29 3:38 PM
Summons Issued as to Gary Jonas. (Galeano, Sonia)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 27, 2021
27 27 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Mon 09/27 10:37 AM
Proposed Summons. by Eddy Luc (Blackburn, Tyrone)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Mon 09/27 10:33 AM
Proposed Summons. by Eddy Luc (Blackburn, Tyrone)
Related: [-]
25 25 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 09/27 10:26 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Allison McDowell, Gary Jonas, filed by Eddy Luc. (Blackburn, Tyrone)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 23, 2021
order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement Thu 09/23 4:34 PM
ORDER: The letter motion seeking permission to file an amended complaint24 is granted. The amended complaint shall be filed by 10/7/2021 . Upon service, because of the appearance of new parties, absent consent, the case will be reassigned to a district judge. The Court reserves any determination of subject matter jurisdiction, consistent with its ongoing obligation to verify that it has such jurisdiction. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 9/23/2021. (Morrow, Emily)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 10, 2021
24 24 motion Amend/Correct/Supplement Fri 09/10 4:36 PM
Letter MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement1 Complaint and to add Defendants Allison McDowell and Gary Jonas former owners of The Farm on Adderley by Eddy Luc. (Blackburn, Tyrone)
Related: [-]
utility Case No Longer Referred Fri 09/10 5:10 PM
Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. (Gonzalez, Fida)
Related: [-]
misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Fri 09/10 5:13 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge: The23 Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge is So Ordered. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara for all further proceedings. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 9/10/2021. Judge Pamela K. Chen no longer assigned to case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our [LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Gonzalez, Fida)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 08, 2021
23 23 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Wed 09/08 9:41 AM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Steven Hublle, The Farm on Adderley. (Ji, Younghoon)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 01, 2021
order Order(Other) Wed 09/01 4:54 PM
ORDER: To the extent the parties intend to consent to the jurisdiction of the undersigned Magistrate Judge for the purpose of the Cheeks motion for settlement approval, they shall complete and file the appropriate form by 9/8/2021 . If they do not do so, the undersigned will issue a Report and Recommendation on the pending motion. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 9/1/2021. (Farrell, Gillian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 26, 2021
minutes Fairness Conference Thu 08/26 10:24 AM
Minute Entry and Order: A Cheeks motion hearing was held on 8/19/2021 before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Counsel for all parties were present. As stated on the record, the parties intend to consent to the jurisdiction of the undersigned Magistrate Judge for the purpose of the motion for settlement approval21 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 8/26/2021. (AT&T Log #10:03-10:12) (Farrell, Gillian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 03, 2021
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Tue 08/03 5:21 PM
ORDER: The Motion to Adjourn Conference22 is granted. The Cheeks hearing scheduled for 8/5/2021 is adjourned to 8/19/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. The hearing will proceed by video. The Court will send a Microsoft Teams meeting link to the email addresses listed on the docket. Counsel may request that the Court send the link to email addresses not on the docket by providing the email addresses to Chambers' email no later than 8/16/2021. All others may join the conference via telephone by using the toll-free number 877-336-1274 and passcode 6534420. Parties shall join five (5) minutes prior to the start of the conference. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded that photographing, recording, or rebroadcasting of any Court proceeding or communication with the Court is prohibited. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 8/3/2021. (Farrell, Gillian)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 02, 2021
22 22 motion Adjourn Conference Mon 08/02 1:31 PM
Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference on 8/5/2021, and request to rescheduled for a date after 8/8/2021 by Eddy Luc. (Blackburn, Tyrone)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 16, 2021
order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 07/16 4:56 PM
ORDER: A Cheeks motion hearing will be held on 8/5/2021 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. The hearing will proceed by video. The Court will send a Microsoft Teams meeting link to the email addresses listed on the docket. Counsel may request that the Court send the link to email addresses not on the docket by providing the email addresses to Chambers' email no later than 8/2/2021. All others may join the conference via telephone by using the toll-free number 877-336-1274 and passcode 6534420. Parties shall join five (5) minutes prior to the start of the conference. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded that photographing, recording, or rebroadcasting of any Court proceeding or communication with the Court is prohibited. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 7/16/2021. (Farrell, Gillian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 15, 2021
21 21 motion Settlement Thu 07/15 10:49 PM
First MOTION for Settlement approval-Cheeks Review by Eddy Luc. (Blackburn, Tyrone)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Thursday, July 01, 2021
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Thu 07/01 4:42 PM
ORDER: The Motion for Extension of Time to File20 is granted. The parties shall file a Cheeks motion for settlement approval by 7/15/2021 . Counsel are encouraged to consider whether they will file a form3 consenting to reassignment of this case to the undersigned Magistrate Judge for all purposes, including for review of the settlement agreement. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 7/1/2021. (Farrell, Gillian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 30, 2021
20 20 misc Letter Wed 06/30 4:42 PM
Letter Requesting a 14 Day extension of time to submit settlement agreement for Cheeks review by Eddy Luc (Blackburn, Tyrone)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 01, 2021
minutes Settlement Conference Tue 06/01 4:47 PM
Minute Entry and Order: A settlement conference was held on 6/1/2021 before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Counsel and clients for all parties were present. A settlement was reached. The parties shall file a Cheeks motion for settlement approval by 7/1/2021 . Counsel are encouraged to consider whether they will file a form3 consenting to reassignment of this case to the undersigned Magistrate Judge for all purposes, including for review of the settlement agreement. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Buslara on 6/1/2021. (Log # 2:33-4:40) (Farrell, Gillian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 26, 2021
order 1 - Terminate Hearings Scheduling Order Wed 05/26 10:16 AM
RE-SCHEDULING ORDER: In light of a scheduling conflict, the settlement conference scheduled for 6/1/2021 at 1:30 PM is moved to 6/1/2021 at 2:30 PM . The conference will proceed by video. Parties are reminded to submit their respective ex parte settlement positions via Chambers' email no later than three days before 6/1/2021. With their submissions, counsel must also provide email addresses and phone numbers for counsel and clients to the Court so that the Court may connect the parties to the video conference. Counsel are to refer to the Settlement Section of this Court's Individual Rules in preparation for the conference, which is available on the Court's website. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 5/26/2021. (Altreuter, Sylvia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 04, 2021
minutes Status Conference Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 03/04 11:01 AM
Minute Entry and Order: A telephonic status conference was held on 3/4/2021 before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Counsel for all parties were present. As stated on the record, the motion for extension of discovery19 is granted. The deadline for completion of fact discovery is 5/3/2021 . A settlement conference will be held on 6/1/2021 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. The settlement conference will be held via video. Parties are to submit their respective ex parte settlement positions via Chambers email no later than three days before 6/1/2021 . Counsel are to refer to the Settlement Section of this Court's Individual Rules in preparation for the conference, which is available on the Court's website. Counsel must also provide email addresses and phone numbers for counsel and clients to the Court so that the Court may connect the parties to the video conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 3/4/2021. (AT&T #9:58-10:06) (Farrell, Gillian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 25, 2021
19 19 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 02/25 3:22 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Steven Hublle, The Farm on Adderley. (Ji, Younghoon)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 13, 2021
order Scheduling Order Sat 02/13 5:25 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic status conference will be held on 3/4/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. The parties are directed to call the toll-free number 877-336-1274 . The access code is 6534420 . The parties shall dial in five (5) minutes before the 10:00 AM conference. SO Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 2/13/2021. (Farrell, Gillian)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 12, 2021
18 18 misc Letter Fri 02/12 12:37 PM
Letter joint status report on the status of mediation and what, if any, further discovery is necessary in the case. by Eddy Luc (Blackburn, Tyrone)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 08, 2021
adr Report of Mediation(Settled/Unsettled) Mon 02/08 4:22 PM
REPORT of Mediation unsettled. Both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be e-mailed to nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov within two weeks following mediation session.Mediation Report due by 2/22/2021. (Weinstein, Robyn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 26, 2021
adr Selection of Mediator Tue 01/26 10:34 PM
SELECTION OF MEDIATOR: Raymond Nardo selected as Mediator. The first mediation session will take place on February 4, 2021 at 2:00 PM via Zoom. Fourteen days on or before the session date, counsel shall file with the Mediator their client's mediation statement summarizing the facts, legal issues, particulars of any prior settlement discussions, and the name and title of the client or client representative with full settlement authority who will attend the mediation in person. Attendance in person is required of the trial attorney, insurance adjuster, and client or client representative with full settlement authority. The Confidentiality Stipulation must be signed at the mediation session by all participants and the Mediator and returned via e-mail nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov or fax (718) 613-2333. Contact information for the Mediator is on the docket sheet. Upon completion of the mediation, both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be e-mailed to nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov within two weeks following mediation session. Report of Mediation due by 2/18/2021. (Priftakis, Tina)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 13, 2021
order Scheduling Order Wed 01/13 8:56 PM
ORDER: The parties are directed to file a joint status report by 2/12/2021 updating the Court on the status of mediation and what, if any, further discovery is necessary in the case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 1/13/2021. (Farrell, Gillian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 12, 2021
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 01/12 1:46 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Mahoney, Brenna)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 17, 2020
17 17 minutes Initial Conference Hearing ~Util - Case Referred to Mediation ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 11/17 1:59 PM
Minute Entry: Initial Conference Hearing held on 11/17/2020 before Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Blackburn for plaintiff, Ji for defendants. The parties will complete paper discovery by December 15, 2020. THIS CASE IS REFERRED TO COURT-ANNEXED FLSA MEDIATION. (Gillespie, Saudia)
Related: [-]
adr Mediation Instructions Tue 11/17 3:56 PM
MEDIATION INSTRUCTIONS for Counsel are available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. Counsel are to select a mediator, schedule the first mediation session, and file the name of the mediator, date, time and place of the first mediation session via CM/ECF using the event Selection of Mediator. For a list of the EDNY Mediators and their qualifications, see the Court's website at https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr/Mediation/displayAll.cfm. EDNY Mediators are compensated in accordance with EDNY Local Civil Rule 83.8(f)(1)[formerly EDNY Local Civil Rule 83.11(f)(1)]. The Confidentiality Stipulation must be signed at the mediation session by all participants, including the mediator, and sent via email to Robyn_Weinstein@nyed.uscourts.gov. The Confidentiality Stipulation is available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. Upon completion of the mediation, both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be e-mailed to nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov within two weeks following mediation session. (Priftakis, Tina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 29, 2020
16 16 minutes Initial Conference Hearing ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 10/29 4:49 PM
Minute Entry: Initial Conference Hearing held on 10/29/2020 before Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Ji for defendants. No appearance by plaintiff, whose counsel cannot be reached. Accordingly THE INITIAL CONFERENCE IS ADJOURNED TO NOVEMBER 16, 2020 AT 10:00 AM. (Gillespie, Saudia)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Letter Thu 10/29 11:54 AM
Letter Apology for Scheduling Conference Call error by Eddy Luc (Blackburn, Tyrone)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 19, 2020
14 14 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Mon 10/19 2:16 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Eddy Luc (Blackburn, Tyrone)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Initial Conference Questionnaire
Saturday, October 03, 2020
13 13 order Scheduling Order Sat 10/03 11:24 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic-initial conference will be held on October 29, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. before the undersigned. Counsel for all parties must participate. Counsel shall confer with each other, complete the attached initial conference questionnaire and electronically file two days prior to the conference. Each party is directed to call the following conference number: 877-336-1839 and use access code 3482793 . Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 10/3/2020. (Gillespie, Saudia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Chamber's Individual Rules
Tuesday, September 29, 2020
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 09/29 1:41 PM
Defendants' ANSWER to1 Complaint by Steven Hublle, The Farm on Adderley. (Ji, Younghoon)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/29 1:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Younghoon Ji on behalf of Steven Hublle, The Farm on Adderley (aty to be noticed) (Ji, Younghoon)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 16, 2020
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 09/16 12:14 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eddy Luc. The Farm on Adderley served on 9/8/2020, answer due 9/29/2020. (Blackburn, Tyrone)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 09/16 12:13 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eddy Luc. Steven Hublle served on 9/8/2020, answer due 9/29/2020. (Blackburn, Tyrone)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 14, 2020
8 8 service Affidavit of Service Mon 09/14 3:52 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint on The Farm on Adderley, Corporate Defendant served on Lian (Doe), Manager on September 8, 2020, filed by Eddy Luc. (Blackburn, Tyrone)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Affidavit of Service Mon 09/14 3:51 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint for Steven Hubble served on Lian (Doe), Manager on September 8, 2020, filed by Eddy Luc. (Blackburn, Tyrone)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Certificate of Service Mon 09/14 3:48 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Eddy Luc Service of Corporate Defendant (Blackburn, Tyrone)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Certificate of Service Mon 09/14 3:47 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Eddy Luc On Individual Defendant (Blackburn, Tyrone)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 21, 2020
4 4 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Fri 08/21 11:33 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Fri 08/21 11:30 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Fri 08/21 10:29 AM
Civil Cover Sheet.. by Eddy Luc (Blackburn, Tyrone)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/21 10:27 AM
COMPLAINT against Steven Hublle, The Farm on Adderley filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13246526 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Eddy Luc. (Blackburn, Tyrone)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 08/21 11:29 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen and Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]