New York Southern District Court
Judge:Mary Kay Vyskocil
Case #: 1:20-cv-06766
Nature of Suit751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause29:2601 FMLA: Family and Medical Leave Act (Findings and Purposes)
Case Filed:Aug 21, 2020
Terminated:May 04, 2021
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 17, 2021 4:26 AM EST
Defendant
1stdibs.com, Inc.
Represented By
Jillian de Chavez-Lau
Epstein Becker & Green
contact info
Lauri Faith Rasnick
Epstein Becker & Green, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Klein
Represented By
Rita Marie Lenane-Massey
Barton Llp (graybar Building)
contact info
Scott G. Grubin
Barton LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Stephanie Muhs
Represented By
Rita Marie Lenane-Massey
Barton Llp (graybar Building)
contact info
Scott G. Grubin
Barton LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 64 minutes ago
Wednesday, June 02, 2021
30 30 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 06/02 8:32 AM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Stephanie Muhs and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by 1stdibs.com, Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Rasnick, Lauri)
Related: [-]
29 29 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 06/02 8:30 AM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Elizabeth Klein and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by 1stdibs.com, Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Rasnick, Lauri)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 28, 2021
28 28 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 05/28 3:40 PM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - SIGNATURE ERROR - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Elizabeth Klein and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by 1stdibs.com, Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Rasnick, Lauri) Modified on 5/28/2021 (dt)
Related: [-]
27 27 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 05/28 3:28 PM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Stephanie Muhs and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by 1stdibs.com, Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Rasnick, Lauri) Modified on 5/28/2021 (km)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 05/28 3:26 PM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Elizabeth Klein and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by 1stdibs.com, Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Rasnick, Lauri) Modified on 5/28/2021 (km)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Voluntary Dismissal Fri 05/28 3:31 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Lauri Rasnick. RE-FILE Document No. 27 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal 26 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the voluntary dismissal is against was/were selected. Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed PDF. (km)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Voluntary Dismissal Fri 05/28 3:52 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Lauri Rasnick. RE-FILE Document No. 28 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the stipulation of voluntary dismissal was not signed (ink signatures) by all parties who have appeared;. Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed (scanned ink signature image) PDF. (dt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 04, 2021
25 25 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 05/04 2:31 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court is in receipt of a report from the mediator informing the Court that the parties have reached agreement on all issues in this case [ECF #24]. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above-captioned action is discontinued without costs to any party and without prejudice to restoring the action to this Courts calendar if the application to restore the action is made by June 4, 2021. If no such application is made by that date, today's dismissal of the action is with prejudice. See Muze, Inc. v. Digital On Demand, Inc., 356 F.3d 492, 494 n.1 (2d Cir. 2004). All other dates and deadlines are adjourned sine die. SO ORDERED, Motions terminated:23 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Expert Discovery addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Rita Lenane-Massey dated April 22, 2021. filed by Elizabeth Klein, Stephanie Muhs. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 5/4/2021) (rj)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 22, 2021
23 23 2 pgs motion Extension of Time Thu 04/22 5:48 PM
JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Expert Discovery addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Rita Lenane-Massey dated April 22, 2021. Document filed by Elizabeth Klein, Stephanie Muhs..(Lenane-Massey, Rita)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Amended Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order
Thursday, March 11, 2021
adr Mediation Conference Scheduled Thu 03/11 5:26 PM
MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED First Mediation Conference scheduled for 4/29/2021 at 10:30 AM through video conference. (sb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 16, 2021
adr Notice of Mediator Assignment Tue 02/16 1:11 PM
NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 3/18/2021..(ah)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 29, 2021
22 22 order Mediation Referral Order Sun 01/31 4:19 PM
MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is referred to the Court-annexed Mediation Program. The parties are notified that Local Civil Rule 83.9 shall govern the mediation and are directed to participate in the mediation in good faith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, within five days of completing the mediation, the parties shall file a joint letter informing the Court whether the mediation was successful. The mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling Order issued by this Court without leave of the Court. Mediators will be assigned based on the nature of suit. Additional expertise requests should promptly be directed to the Mediation Office. SO ORDERED. Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 2/8/2021. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 1/29/2021) (ama)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 13, 2021
21 21 17 pgs answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 01/13 4:18 PM
ANSWER to13 Amended Complaint. Document filed by 1stdibs.com, Inc...(Rasnick, Lauri)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 08, 2021
20 20 8 pgs order Protective Order Fri 01/08 1:52 PM
STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 1/8/2021) (mro)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Fri 01/08 12:12 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by 1stdibs.com, Inc...(Rasnick, Lauri)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 23, 2020
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 12/23 2:59 PM
ORDER: granting17 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Granted. SO ORDERED. 1stdibs.com, Inc. answer due 1/19/2021. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 12/23/2020) (ama)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 12/23 10:03 AM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:16 Exhibit to Pleading,13 Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Lauri F. Rasnick dated December 23, 2020. Document filed by 1stdibs.com, Inc...(Rasnick, Lauri)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 18, 2020
16 16 misc Exhibit to Pleading Fri 12/18 8:54 PM
EXHIBIT TO PLEADING re:13 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Elizabeth Klein, Stephanie Muhs..(Grubin, Scott)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Fri 12/18 4:06 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Scott G. Grubin re: Document No. 14 Exhibit to Pleading. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Court's leave has not been granted.. File the Exhibit to Pleading event found under the event list Other Documents and attach either opposing party's written consent or Court's leave. (pc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 17, 2020
15 15 2 pgs misc Letter Thu 12/17 3:38 PM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Lauri F. Rasnick dated December 17, 2020 re: Status of Case. Document filed by 1stdibs.com, Inc...(Rasnick, Lauri)
Related: [-]
14 14 5 pgs misc Exhibit to Pleading Thu 12/17 12:27 PM
EXHIBIT TO PLEADING re:13 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Elizabeth Klein, Stephanie Muhs..(Grubin, Scott)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Thu 12/17 12:01 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Scott Grubin re: Document No. 13 Amended Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the pleading is amended more than 21 days after service of a responsive pleading;.. File the Exhibit to Pleading event found under the event list Other Documents and attach either opposing party's written consent or Court's leave. (gp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 16, 2020
13 13 22 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Wed 12/16 5:08 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint against 1stdibs.com, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Elizabeth Klein, Stephanie Muhs. Related document:1 Complaint..(Grubin, Scott)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 19, 2020
12 12 1 pgs order Order Thu 11/19 6:30 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, by December 17, 2020, the parties shall file a joint status letter. The parties shall inform the Court whether: (1) the EEOC has issued a Notice of Right to Sue, and (2) the parties have engaged in an informal exchange of information in aid of an early settlement of this case. If the parties have not reached a settlement by December 17, 2020, the Court will refer this case to the Court-annexed Mediation Program. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 11/19/2020) (rro)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Case Management Plan Thu 11/19 6:26 PM
CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). This case is to be tried to a jury. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is: 6 days. The Court has advised the parties that this estimate is unrealistic. Status Conference set for 6/24/2021 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 11/19/2020) (rro)
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Thu 11/19 12:07 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/19/2020. (rz)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 12, 2020
10 10 4 pgs misc Letter Thu 11/12 7:42 PM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Scott G. Grubin dated November 12, 2020 re: Joint Status Letter and Proposed Case Management Plan. Document filed by Elizabeth Klein, Stephanie Muhs..(Lenane-Massey, Rita)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Case Management Plan
Tuesday, October 20, 2020
9 9 2 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Tue 10/20 3:36 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: This case has been assigned to my docket. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference on November 19, 2020 at 11:30 AM. The conference shall be held by telephone. To join, dial 888-278-0296 at the scheduled time. When prompted, enter Access Code 5195844. The Court will join once all of the parties are on the line. Initial Conference set for 11/19/2020 at 11:30 AM before Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 10/20/2020) (mro)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/20 3:15 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rita Marie Lenane-Massey on behalf of Elizabeth Klein, Stephanie Muhs..(Lenane-Massey, Rita)
Related: [-]
7 7 12 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Tue 10/20 2:40 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint. Document filed by 1stdibs.com, Inc...(Rasnick, Lauri)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 10/20 2:39 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by 1stdibs.com, Inc...(Rasnick, Lauri)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/20 2:38 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jillian de Chavez-Lau on behalf of 1stdibs.com, Inc...(de Chavez-Lau, Jillian)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/20 2:35 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lauri Faith Rasnick on behalf of 1stdibs.com, Inc...(Rasnick, Lauri)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 01, 2020
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 09/01 12:51 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. 1stdibs.com, Inc. waiver sent on 8/21/2020, answer due 10/20/2020. Document filed by Elizabeth Klein; Stephanie Muhs..(Grubin, Scott)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 24, 2020
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Mon 08/24 9:57 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Scott G. Grubin. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 29:2617; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 29:2601; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (sj)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 08/24 10:00 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 08/24 10:02 AM
Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 08/24 10:02 AM
Case Designated ECF. (sj)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 21, 2020
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 08/21 4:47 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Grubin, Scott)
Related: [-]
1 1 20 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 08/21 4:45 PM
COMPLAINT against 1stdibs.com, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21274302)Document filed by Elizabeth Klein, Stephanie Muhs..(Grubin, Scott)
Related: [-]