Trump v. Vance, Jr.
Original Case: 1:19-cv-08694
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:20-cv-02766 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Case Filed: | Aug 20, 2020 |
Terminated: | Oct 07, 2020 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 22, 2020 4:24 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Cyrus R. Vance, Jr., in his official capacity as District Attorney of the Country of New York
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Mazars USA, LLP
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Donald J. Trump
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10/07/2020 9:28 AM EDT |
Thursday, August 20, 2020 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Donald J. Trump, FILED. [2913096] 20-2766 [Entered: 08/20/2020 01:52 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 13 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 30+ pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 08/20/2020, RECEIVED.[2913101] 20-2766 [Entered: 08/20/2020 01:54 PM] | |
3 | 3 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 08/20/2020, RECEIVED.[2913103] 20-2766 [Entered: 08/20/2020 01:55 PM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2913105] 20-2766 [Entered: 08/20/2020 01:55 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 14 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED | ||
6 | 6 5 pgs MOTION, for admission pro hac vice, on behalf of Appellee Cyrus R. Vance, Jr., FILED. Service date 08/19/2020 by email.[2913666] 20-2766 [Entered: 08/21/2020 09:32 AM] | |
7 | 7 5 pgs MOTION, for admission pro hac vice, on behalf of Appellee Cyrus R. Vance, Jr., FILED. Service date 08/20/2020 by email.[2913667] 20-2766 [Entered: 08/21/2020 09:32 AM] |