New York Southern District Court
Judge:P Kevin Castel
Case #: 1:20-mc-00299
CauseM 77 Application to have subpoena issued to person living in this district re: action in foreign cou
Case Filed:Aug 21, 2020
Terminated:Aug 26, 2020

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 82 minutes ago
Friday, October 23, 2020
30 30 2 pgs order Order of Dismissal Fri 10/23 11:12 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: COME NOW Applicants, Seawolf Tankers Inc. ("Seawolf") and Heidmar Inc. ("Heidmar") (Seawolf and Heidmar collectively "Applicants"), and Respondent Ridgebury Kilo LLC ("Ridgebury Kilo") filing their Stipulation for Dismissal Without Prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1), and would respectfully state as follows: Applicants and Ridgebury Kilo have entered into a settlement agreement and have agreed to dismiss without prejudice this discovery action. WHEREFORE, upon the subjoined consent of the parties, this action shall be and hereby is dismissed without prejudice. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 10/23/2020) (jwh)
Related: [-]
30 30 2 pgs order Order of Dismissal Fri 10/23 11:12 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: COME NOW Applicants, Seawolf Tankers Inc. ("Seawolf") and Heidmar Inc. ("Heidmar") (Seawolf and Heidmar collectively "Applicants"), and Respondent Ridgebury Kilo LLC ("Ridgebury Kilo") filing their Stipulation for Dismissal Without Prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1), and would respectfully state as follows: Applicants and Ridgebury Kilo have entered into a settlement agreement and have agreed to dismiss without prejudice this discovery action. WHEREFORE, upon the subjoined consent of the parties, this action shall be and hereby is dismissed without prejudice. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 10/23/2020) (jwh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 22, 2020
29 29 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Thu 10/22 4:39 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Heidmar Inc., Seawolf Tankers Inc...(Power, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 17, 2020
28 28 notice Notice (Other) Thu 09/17 3:12 PM
NOTICE of filing the Notice of Dismissal on Sept. 16, 2020, in Case No. 20-6434 ECF No. 18. Document filed by Heidmar Inc., Seawolf Tankers Inc...(Power, James)
Related: [-]
27 27 misc Letter Thu 09/17 12:56 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from John D. Kimball dated 9/17/20 re: Response to Petitioner's Letter dated 9/16/20. Document filed by Ridgebury Kilo LLC..(Kimball, John)
Related: [-]
26 26 10 pgs respoth Memorandum of Law (non-motion) Thu 09/17 11:46 AM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW re:18 Order to Show Cause,,,, Set Deadlines,,, Related [+] . Document filed by Ridgebury Kilo LLC..(Kimball, John)
Related: [-] ply Memorandum of Law in Further Support
25 25 respoth Declaration (non-motion) Thu 09/17 11:45 AM
DECLARATION of Omar N. Omar re:18 Order to Show Cause,,,, Set Deadlines,,, Related [+] . Document filed by Ridgebury Kilo LLC..(Kimball, John)
Related: [-] ply Declaration in Further Support
Att: 1 Exhibit C - Legal Consultants,
Att: 2 Exhibit D - Advocates & Legal Consultants
24 24 respoth Declaration (non-motion) Thu 09/17 11:38 AM
DECLARATION of John D. Kimball re:18 Order to Show Cause,,,, Set Deadlines,,, Related [+] . Document filed by Ridgebury Kilo LLC..(Kimball, John)
Related: [-] ply Declaration in Further Support of Motion to Vacate Discovery Order
Att: 1 Exhibit D- Subpoena Addressed to DNB Bank,
Att: 2 Exhibit E - Subpoena Addressed to Riverstone Holdings, LLC
Wednesday, September 16, 2020
23 23 misc Letter Wed 09/16 9:09 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from James H. Power dated Sept. 16, 2020 re: response in connection with Statement of Relatedness. Document filed by Heidmar Inc., Seawolf Tankers Inc...(Power, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
22 22 misc Statement of Relatedness Tue 09/15 11:35 AM
STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 20cv6434 (RA). Document filed by Ridgebury Kilo LLC..(Kimball, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 11, 2020
21 21 30+ pgs respoth Memorandum of Law in Opposition (non-motion) Fri 09/11 6:29 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:18 Order to Show Cause,,,, Set Deadlines,,, . Document filed by Heidmar Inc., Seawolf Tankers Inc...(Power, James)
Related: [-]
20 20 respoth Reply (non-motion) Fri 09/11 6:22 PM
REPLY Declaration of Ravi Jawani in Support of Ex Parte Application For Discovery Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. § 1782 . Document filed by Heidmar Inc., Seawolf Tankers Inc...(Power, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - sea web report
19 19 respoth Declaration (non-motion) Fri 09/11 6:07 PM
DECLARATION of Nicholas Jeremy Shepherd In Support of Ex Parte Application For Discovery Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. § 1782 . Document filed by Heidmar Inc., Seawolf Tankers Inc...(Power, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 03, 2020
18 18 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 09/03 5:25 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE COURT SHOULD NOT GRANT RIDGEBURY KILO LLC'S MOTION TO VACATE DISCOVERY ORDER AND QUASH SUBPOENAS:It is hereby: ORDERED, that Petitioners Seawolf Tankers Inc and Heidmar Inc. show cause in writing before Hon. P. Kevin Castel, United States District Judge, by September 15, 2020 why an order should not be entered vacating this Court's August 21, 2020 Order Granting Ex Parte Application for Discovery Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1782 (Dkt. No. 10) and granting Ridgebury Kilo LLC such further and additional relief as the Court may deem just and proper. ORDERED, that service of a copy of this Order to Show Cause, together with the papers upon which it is granted, upon the parties to this action by ECF shall be deemed good and sufficient service; and it is further ORDERED, that reply papers, if any, be served by Ridgebury Kilo LLC via ECF on or before September 18, 2020. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/3/2020) (rro)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Letter Thu 09/03 3:17 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from John D. Kimball dated 9/3/20 re: Proposed Order to Show Cause to Vacate Discovery Order and Quash Subpoenas. Document filed by Ridgebury Kilo LLC..(Kimball, John)
Related: [-]
16 16 respoth Declaration in Support (non-motion) Thu 09/03 3:13 PM
DECLARATION of Omar N. Omar in Support re:13 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief. Document filed by Ridgebury Kilo LLC..(Kimball, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Expert Report,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Bank Guaranty
15 15 respoth Declaration in Support (non-motion) Thu 09/03 3:08 PM
DECLARATION of John D. Kimball in Support re:13 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief. Document filed by Ridgebury Kilo LLC..(Kimball, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Copies of Protocol of Delivery and Acceptance, etc., Dated June 30, 2020,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Copies of Protocol of Delivery and Acceptance, etc., Dated August 22, 2020,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Subpoena Served upon Bank of America
14 14 19 pgs respoth Memorandum of Law in Support (non-motion) Thu 09/03 3:02 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:13 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief . Document filed by Ridgebury Kilo LLC..(Kimball, John)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief Thu 09/03 3:00 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document filed by Ridgebury Kilo LLC. Related Document Number:10 ..(Kimball, John)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Court Regarding Proposed Order Thu 09/03 3:21 PM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document No. 13 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 28, 2020
12 12 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Fri 08/28 3:34 PM
ORDER denying without prejudice11 Letter Motion to Stay. Application DENIED without prejudice to the right of any party or non-party to assert their rights under Rule 45 and/or section 1782. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 8/28/2020) (kv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 27, 2020
11 11 motion Stay Thu 08/27 5:17 PM
LETTER MOTION to Stay re:10 Order on Motion for Discovery,,,, addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from John D. Kimball dated 8/27/20. Document filed by Ridgebury Kilo LLC..(Kimball, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 26, 2020
10 10 6 pgs order Order on Motion for Discovery Wed 08/26 3:08 PM
ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR DISCOVERY PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1782 granting1 Motion for Discovery: The Court hereby ORDERS as follows: The Application is GRANTED. 2. Applicants are authorized to issue and serve subpoenas on Riverstone Holdings LLC for the production of the following documents: A. minutes of board meetings authorizing sale of vessels, PIONEER, PRIDE, PROGRESS and PURPOSE and copies of sale agreements, financial records of Ridgebury Kilo and the affiliated Ridgebury Companies, records of distributions to members and/or investors beginning in January 2018, records identifying members or shareholders and ownership structure for the Ridgebury Group including specifically RT Holdings, yearly audit reports from third party accountants for the RT Holdings and all other Ridgebury Group entities, and as further set forth in this order. The Court shall retain jurisdiction over the matter for the purpose of enforcing this Order and assessing any supplemental request for discovery assistance that may be requested by Applicants. A copy of this Order shall be served with each discovery demand. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 8/25/2020) (jwh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 25, 2020
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/25 4:51 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas Hunt Belknap, Jr on behalf of Ridgebury Kilo LLC..(Belknap, Thomas)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/25 4:48 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Devereux Kimball on behalf of Ridgebury Kilo LLC..(Kimball, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 24, 2020
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 08/24 10:17 AM
Case Designated ECF. (wb)
Related: [-]
notice Miscellaneous Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 08/24 10:20 AM
MISCELLANEOUS CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] . .(wb)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 21, 2020
7 7 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 08/21 7:43 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Heidmar International Pools Inc. for Heidmar Inc.. Document filed by Heidmar Inc...(Power, James)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 08/21 7:41 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Heidmar International Pools Inc. for Seawolf Tankers Inc.. Document filed by Seawolf Tankers Inc...(Power, James)
Related: [-]
5 5 respoth Declaration (non-motion) Fri 08/21 7:39 PM
DECLARATION of Ravi Jawani in support of Ex Parte Application for Discovery Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1782 . Document filed by Heidmar Inc., Seawolf Tankers Inc...(Power, James)
Related: [-]
4 4 20 pgs respoth Memorandum of Law (non-motion) Fri 08/21 7:35 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in support of Ex Parte Application for Discovery Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1782 . Document filed by Heidmar Inc., Seawolf Tankers Inc...(Power, James)
Related: [-]
3 3 respoth Declaration (non-motion) Fri 08/21 7:32 PM
DECLARATION of James H. Power in Support of Application For Discovery Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. §1782 . Document filed by Heidmar Inc., Seawolf Tankers Inc...(Power, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 and 2,
Att: 2 Exhibit 3,
Att: 3 Exhibit 4-8,
Att: 4 Exhibit 9,
Att: 5 Exhibit 10
2 2 misc Miscellaneous Cover Sheet Fri 08/21 7:20 PM
MISCELLANEOUS COVER SHEET filed..(Power, James)
Related: [-]
1 1 motion Discovery Fri 08/21 7:17 PM
MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION for Discovery Ex Parte Application For Discovery Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. § 1782. . (Filing Fee $ 47.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21276618)Document filed by Heidmar Inc., Seawolf Tankers Inc..(Power, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order