Mississippi Southern District Court
Judge:Carlton W Reeves
Referred: Lakeysha Greer Isaac
Case #: 3:20-cv-00562
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Civil Rights Violation
Case Filed:Aug 21, 2020
Terminated:Jun 21, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 17, 2021 2:59 AM CST
Defendant
Bobby Brown
Defendant
John Does 1-5
Defendant
Mississippi Action for Progress, Inc.
Defendant
Mississippi Action for Progress, Inc. Board of Supervisors
Plaintiff
Cassandra Jackson
Represented By
Mary Lee Holmes
Holmes, Mclelland & Ferraez, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, June 21, 2022
55 55 order Judgment Tue 06/21 9:56 AM
FINAL JUDGMENT: For the reasons stated in the Order issued this day by this Court, see Docket No. 54, judgment is hereby entered in the defendants favor. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 6/21/2022 (LAT)
Related: [-]
54 54 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Tue 06/21 9:39 AM
ORDER granting46 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 6/21/22. (AC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 15, 2022
53 53 8 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Wed 06/15 1:57 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re46 MOTION for Summary Judgment Related [+] filed by Bobby Brown, Mississippi Action for Progress Board of Directors, Mississippi Action for Progress, Inc. (Clark, Howard)
Related: [-] ply Memorandum
52 52 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 06/15 1:55 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re46 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Bobby Brown, Mississippi Action for Progress Board of Directors, Mississippi Action for Progress, Inc.(Clark, Howard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Excerpts from the deposition of Rejohnna Mitchell