New York Southern District Court
Judge:Andrew L Carter, Jr
Case #: 1:20-cv-06899
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:157(b) Bankruptcy Claim to be tried in U.S. District Court
Case Filed:Aug 26, 2020
Case in other court:New York Supreme Court, 653097/2020
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 24, 2021 4:04 AM EST
Defendant
Scan-Optics, LLC
Represented By
Sean Henry McMahon
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Christopher J. Clark
Latham & Watkins Llp (ny)
contact info
Plaintiff
Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC
Represented By
David Adam Berger
Allegaert Berger & Vogel LLP
contact info
Lauren Jill Pincus
Allegaert Berger & Vogel LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 62 minutes ago
Wednesday, October 26, 2022
31 31 order Memo Endorsement ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Wed 10/26 12:21 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:30 Letter filed by Scan-Optics, LLC. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate Attorney Sean H. McMahon from the docket. Attorney Sean Henry McMahon terminated. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 10/26/2022) (ate)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 25, 2022
30 30 misc Letter Tue 10/25 4:36 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Sean H. McMahon dated October 25, 2022 re: Withdrawal of Sean H. McMahon. Document filed by Scan-Optics, LLC..(McMahon, Sean)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 07, 2021
29 29 misc Status Report Tue 12/07 6:15 PM
STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Scan-Optics, LLC..(Clark, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 08, 2021
28 28 order Memo Endorsement Wed 09/08 2:29 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: (16 in 1:20-cv-06814-ALC) Letter, filed by Classified Interactive Publishing, LLC, Performance Designed Products, LLC, FSAR Holdings, Inc., (33 in 1:20-cv-06554-ALC) Letter filed by Glenoit, LLC, Ex-Cell Home Fashions, Inc., Glenoit Universal, Ltd., (28 in 1:20-cv-06905-ALC) Letter filed by 180s, Inc., (27 in 1:20-cv-06899-ALC) Letter filed by Scan-Optics, LLC, (24 in 1:20-cv-06876-ALC) Letter filed by Gorham Paper and Tissue, LLC, (24 in 1:20-cv-06860-ALC) Letter filed by UI Acquisition Holding Co., Hover-Davis, Inc., UI Holding Co., Universal Instruments Corp., (33 in 1:20-cv-06556-ALC) Letter, filed by Snelling Investments Inc., Snelling Holdings, LLC, Core Solutions, LLC, Snelling Medical Staffing, LLC, Snelling Services, LLC, Snelling Staffing, LLC, Snelling Employment Solutions, LLC, Snelling Employment, LLC, (27 in 1:20-cv-06946-ALC) Letter, filed by St. Honore Holding, Inc., IMG Holdings, Inc., Dana Fragrance Brands, LLC, IMG Fragrance Brands, LLC, Inter-Marketing Group, Inc., Dana Classic Fragrances, Inc., (33 in 1:20-cv-06552-ALC) Letter filed by Intrepid U.S.A., Inc., (16 in 1:20-cv-06868-ALC) Letter, filed by Vulcan Europe, Inc., Industrial Heating & Finishing Company, Inc., Vulcan Equipment Corp., Vantage Tooling Systems, Inc., Vulcan Engineering Co. ENDORSEMENT: The Parties are hereby ORDERED to file a joint status report no later than December 7, 2021. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 9/08/2021) (ama)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 07, 2021
27 27 misc Letter Tue 09/07 10:26 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Christopher J. Clark dated September 7, 2021 re: Status Report. Document filed by Scan-Optics, LLC..(Clark, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 08, 2021
26 26 order Memo Endorsement Tue 06/08 12:12 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (25 in 1:20-cv-06946-ALC) Letter re: Joint Status Report, filed by IMG Fragrance Brands, LLC, St. Honore Holding, Inc., IMG Holdings, Inc., Dana Fragrance Brands, LLC, Inter-Marketing Group, Inc., Dana Classic Fragrances, Inc. ENDORSEMENT:The parties are hereby ORDERED to submit a joint status report by September 7, 2021. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 6/8/2021) (rj)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 07, 2021
25 25 misc Letter Mon 06/07 12:20 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Christopher J. Clark dated June 7, 2021 re: Joint Status Report. Document filed by Scan-Optics, LLC..(Clark, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 03, 2021
24 24 notice Notice of Change of Address Mon 05/03 12:03 PM
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Sean Henry McMahon on behalf of Scan-Optics, LLC. New Address: Latham & Watkins LLP, 1271 Avenue of the Americas, New York, New York, United States 10020, 212-906-1200..(McMahon, Sean)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice of Change of Address Mon 05/03 11:58 AM
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Christopher J. Clark on behalf of Scan-Optics, LLC. New Address: Latham & Watkins LLP, 1271 Avenue of the Americas, New York, New York, United States 10020, 212-906-1200..(Clark, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 03, 2021
order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 03/03 1:27 PM
The parties are ordered to file a joint status report by no later than June 7, 2021. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr.) (Text Only Order) Copies of Notice of Electronic Filing Sent By Chambers. (tdh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 04, 2021
22 22 misc Letter Thu 02/04 4:43 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Christopher J. Clark dated February 4, 2021 re: Joint Status Report. Document filed by Scan-Optics, LLC..(Clark, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 06, 2020
21 21 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Fri 11/06 6:37 PM
ORDER granting20 Letter Motion to Stay: Accordingly, the Court hereby orders that all proceedings in these actions are STAYED. The Parties are hereby ORDERED to file a joint status report no later than February 4, 2021 advising the Court of the status of the underlying Chapter 11 bankruptcy proceedings, including the Stay Order. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 11/6/2020) (jwh)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 02, 2020
20 20 motion Stay Mon 11/02 10:02 PM
LETTER MOTION to Stay Litigation addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Christopher J. Clark dated November 2, 2020. Document filed by Scan-Optics, LLC..(Clark, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A --Order Staying Litigation Against the Portfolio Companies
Friday, October 16, 2020
19 19 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Fri 10/16 6:15 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:10 MOTION to Remand to State Court .,17 LETTER MOTION to Seal /File a redacted version of Plaintiff's Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of its Motion to Remand addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from David A. Berger dated October 16, 2020. Redacted . Document filed by Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC..(Berger, David)
Related: [-]
18 18 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Fri 10/16 6:14 PM
***SELECTED PARTIES*** REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:10 MOTION to Remand to State Court .,17 LETTER MOTION to Seal /File a redacted version of Plaintiff's Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of its Motion to Remand addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from David A. Berger dated October 16, 2020. Filed under seal . Document filed by Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC. Motion or Order to File Under Seal:17 .(Berger, David)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Seal Fri 10/16 6:10 PM
LETTER MOTION to Seal /File a redacted version of Plaintiff's Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of its Motion to Remand addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from David A. Berger dated October 16, 2020. Document filed by Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC..(Berger, David)
Related: [-]
16 16 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Fri 10/16 6:08 PM
DECLARATION of Lauren J. Pincus in Support re:10 MOTION to Remand to State Court .. Document filed by Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC..(Berger, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Friday, October 09, 2020
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/09 7:06 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sean Henry McMahon on behalf of Scan-Optics, LLC..(McMahon, Sean)
Related: [-]
14 14 respm Declaration in Opposition to Motion Fri 10/09 2:39 PM
DECLARATION of Sean H. McMahon in Opposition re:10 MOTION to Remand to State Court .. Document filed by Scan-Optics, LLC..(McMahon, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Bankruptcy Hearing Transcript dated August 4, 2020,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Summons and Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Zohar Adversary Proceeding Complaint [FILED UNDER SEAL]
13 13 respm Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Fri 10/09 2:31 PM
***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:10 MOTION to Remand to State Court . . Document filed by Scan-Optics, LLC, Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC.Motion or Order to File Under Seal:12 .(Clark, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 3 - Zohar Adversary Proceeding Complaint
12 12 motion Seal Fri 10/09 2:27 PM
LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Christopher J. Clark dated October 9, 2020. Document filed by Scan-Optics, LLC..(Clark, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 25, 2020
11 11 24 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Fri 09/25 6:47 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:10 MOTION to Remand to State Court . . Document filed by Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC..(Berger, David)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Remand to State Court Fri 09/25 6:21 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court . Document filed by Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC..(Berger, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 08, 2020
9 9 respm Response to Motion Tue 09/08 5:52 PM
LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from David A. Berger dated September 8, 2020 re:6 LETTER MOTION for Conference regarding a motion to transfer venue addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Christopher J. Clark dated September 2, 2020. . Document filed by Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC..(Berger, David)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/08 5:40 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lauren Jill Pincus on behalf of Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC..(Pincus, Lauren)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/08 5:38 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Adam Berger on behalf of Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC..(Berger, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 02, 2020
6 6 motion Conference Wed 09/02 12:19 PM
LETTER MOTION for Conference regarding a motion to transfer venue addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Christopher J. Clark dated September 2, 2020. Document filed by Scan-Optics, LLC..(Clark, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 31, 2020
utility Case Accepted as Related Mon 08/31 7:28 AM
CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:20-cv-05528-ALC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Mon 08/31 7:30 AM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 08/31 7:30 AM
Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (wb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 27, 2020
5 5 service Certificate of Service Other Thu 08/27 12:16 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal (with Exhibits), Statement of Relatedness, Civil Cover Sheet, Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, Docket Sheet, Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions, and Local Rules of the United States District Courts for the Southern and Eastern Districts of New York served on Plaintiff Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC on August 26, 2020. Service was made by electronic mail. Document filed by Scan-Optics, LLC..(Clark, Christopher)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Thu 08/27 9:09 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pne)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 08/27 9:09 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pne)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred as Possibly Related/Similar Thu 08/27 9:11 AM
CASE REFERRED TO Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. as possibly related to 1:20-cv-06868-UA (1:20-cv-06868-UA possibly related to 1:20-cv-06554-UA, which is possibly related to 1:20-cv-05540-UA; all cases currently unassigned pending Judge Carter's acceptance of related case 1:20-cv-05528-ALC). (pne)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 26, 2020
4 4 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 08/26 1:19 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Scan-Optics, LLC..(Clark, Christopher)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 08/26 1:14 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Clark, Christopher)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Statement of Relatedness Wed 08/26 1:13 PM
STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 20-cv-6868. Document filed by Scan-Optics, LLC..(Clark, Christopher)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 08/26 1:07 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 653097/2020. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21339663).Document filed by Scan-Optics, LLC..(Clark, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 12 pgs Exhibit 1- State Court Filings,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2- Bankruptcy Court Settlement Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3- Bankruptcy Court Hearing Transcript dated August 4, 2020