Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:20-bk-30319

Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Elizabeth D Katz
Case #: 3:20-ap-03016
Nature of Suit63 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(8), student loan
Case Filed:Aug 25, 2020
Terminated:Dec 06, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Towd Point Asset Grantor Trust
402 West Broadway #2000
San Diego, CA 92101
Represented By
Towd Point Asset Grantor Trust
contact info
Plaintiff
Nicole M Chisholm
74 Partridge Dr
Springfield, MA 01119
Represented By
Gerald Glasser
Kalill, Glasser & Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Monday, December 06, 2021
utility Disposition of Adversary Mon 12/06 8:18 AM
Disposition of Adversary Number 20-3016 Judgment entered. (pf)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Mon 12/06 8:20 AM
Adversary Case 20-3016 Closed. (pf)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 21, 2021
34 34 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 11/22 12:25 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 11/21/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 31 Order
33 33 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 11/22 12:25 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 11/21/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 30 Judgment
32 32 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 11/22 12:25 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 11/21/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 29 Order on Motion for Approval
Friday, November 19, 2021
31 31 1 pgs order Order (Generic) Fri 11/19 11:40 AM
Order dated 11/19/2021 Re:1 Complaint. THE HEARING SET FOR FEBRUARY 10, 2022 IS CANCELED. (pf)
Related: [-]
30 30 order Judgment Fri 11/19 10:59 AM
Judgment dated 11/19/2021. See Order for Full Text. (pf)
Related: [-]
29 29 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Approval Fri 11/19 10:57 AM
Endorsed Order dated 11/19/2021 Re:28 Joint Motion filed by Defendant Towd Point Asset Grantor Trust to Approve27 Stipulation and Agreement for Judgment. GRANTED. THE STIPULATION IS APPROVED. (pf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 18, 2021
28 28 motion Approve Thu 11/18 12:26 PM
Joint Motion filed by Defendant Towd Point Asset Grantor Trust to Approve27 Stipulation and Agreement for Judgment with certificate of service. (Burnett, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Judgment
27 27 misc Agreement for Judgment Thu 11/18 12:25 PM
Stipulation and Agreement for Judgment By Defendant Towd Point Asset Grantor Trust and Plaintiff Nicole M. Chisholm Related [+] filed by Defendant Towd Point Asset Grantor Trust (Burnett, Joshua)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, November 12, 2021
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 11/13 12:23 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 11/12/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 25 Order
Wednesday, November 10, 2021
25 25 1 pgs order Order (Generic) Wed 11/10 2:07 PM
Proceeding Memorandum and Order dated 11/10/2021 Re: Pre-Trial Hearing on1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Nicole M Chisholm. THE DISCOVERY DEADLINE IS SET FOR JANUARY 3, 2022. A FINAL PRE-TRIAL HEARING HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR FEBRUARY 10, 2022 AT 11:00 AM IN SPRINGFIELD, BERKSHIRE COURTROOM. (pf)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Scheduled/Cont/Resched (No Forms Attached) Wed 11/10 2:04 PM
Pre-Trial Hearing Held and Continued to 2/10/2022 at 11:00 AM at Springfield Courtroom - Berkshire Re:1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Nicole M Chisholm. (pf)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 01, 2021
24 24 misc Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference Mon 11/01 12:32 PM
Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference and Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan with certificate of service filed by Plaintiff Nicole M Chisholm (Glasser, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 07, 2021
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 10/08 12:25 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 10/07/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 22 Pre-Trial Order
Tuesday, October 05, 2021
22 22 order Pre-Trial Order Tue 10/05 9:51 AM
Scheduling and Pre-Trial Order dated 10/5/21 Re:1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Nicole M Chisholm. IMPORTANT DEADLINES; NO NOT IGNORE. Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/10/2021 at 11:00 AM at a Telephonic Hearing. Discovery due by 1/3/2022. (ag)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 04, 2021
21 21 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 10/04 12:32 PM
Answer to Complaint with certificate of service filed by Towd Point Asset Grantor Trust. (Burnett, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 12, 2021
20 20 cmp Summons Service Executed Sun 09/12 9:07 PM
Summons Service Executed on Nicole M Chisholm 9/10/2021 (Glasser, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 04, 2021
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 09/05 12:22 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 09/04/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Order on Generic Motion
Thursday, September 02, 2021
18 18 court Alias Summons Issued Thu 09/02 3:23 PM
Alias Summons Issued on Towd Point Asset Grantor Trust Date Issued 9/2/2021, Answer Due 10/4/2021. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. Related [+]. (pf)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Nicole M Chisholm
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Generic Motion Thu 09/02 3:22 PM
Endorsed Order dated 9/2/2021 Re:13 Motion filed by Defendant Towd Point Asset Grantor Trust to Set Aside Entry of Default. GRANTED. NO OBJECTIONS HAVE BEEN FILED. THE CLERK'S JULY 26, 2021 ENTRY OF DEFAULT IS VACATED AND THE HEARING SET FOR SEPTEMBER 3, 2021 IS CANCELED. THE CLERK IS DIRECTED TO ISSUE AN ALIAS SUMMONS FORTHWITH. (pf)
Related: [-]
Sunday, August 15, 2021
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Mon 08/16 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. Related [+] Notice Date 08/15/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Hearing Scheduled
Friday, August 13, 2021
15 15 misc Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing Fri 08/13 1:09 PM
Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing Related [+] filed by Defendant Towd Point Asset Grantor Trust (Burnett, Joshua)
Related: [-] 13 Miscellaneous Motion
14 14 court Hearing Scheduled (Forms Attached) Fri 08/13 10:20 AM
TELEPHONIC Hearing Scheduled for 9/3/2021 at 11:30 AM Re:13 Motion of Defendant to Set Aside Entry of Default. Objections due by 08/31/21 at 4:00PM. (spr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 10, 2021
13 13 motion Miscellaneous Motion Tue 08/10 4:35 PM
Motion filed by Defendant Towd Point Asset Grantor Trust to Set Aside Default with certificate of service. (Burnett, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Wednesday, July 28, 2021
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 07/29 12:29 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 07/28/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Defendant Towd Point Asset Grantor Trust
Monday, July 26, 2021
11 11 court Clerk's Entry of Default Mon 07/26 9:45 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default as to Towd Point Asset Grantor Trust. (pf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 20, 2021
10 10 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 07/20 6:25 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by William J. Amann with certificate of service filed by Defendant Towd Point Asset Grantor Trust (Amann, William)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 07/20 6:24 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Joshua A. Burnett with certificate of service filed by Defendant Towd Point Asset Grantor Trust (Burnett, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 28, 2021
8 8 motion Default Mon 06/28 11:12 AM
Request for Default filed by Plaintiff Nicole M Chisholm with certificate of service (Glasser, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, December 09, 2020
7 7 1 pgs order Order (Generic) Wed 12/09 12:48 PM
Proceeding Memorandum and Order dated 12/9/2020 Re:1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Nicole M Chisholm. PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 42(a), MADE APPLICABLE BY FED. R. BANKR. P. 7042, THIS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING IS CONSOLIDATED FOR TRIAL WITH ADVERSARY PROCEEDING NUMBERS 20-3012 20-3013 AND 20-3020 (pf)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Held Wed 12/09 12:47 PM
Status Conference Hearing Held Re:1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Nicole M Chisholm. (pf)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 22, 2020
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 11/23 12:29 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 11/22/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Order To Set Hearing
Friday, November 20, 2020
5 5 1 pgs order Order To Set Hearing Fri 11/20 2:25 PM
Order dated 11/20/2020 Re:1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Nicole M Chisholm. A STATUS CONFERENCE IN THIS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING IS SET FOR DECEMBER 9, 2020 AT 11:30 A.M. SO THAT THE COURT CAN INQUIRE AS TO WHETHER THIS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING SHOULD BE CONSOLIDATED WITH ADVERSARY PROCEEDING NUMBERS 20-3012 20-3013 AND 20-3020 THE HEARING WILL BE CONDUCTED TELEPHONICALLY. PARTIES MAY PARTICIPATE BY DIALING 888-363-4734, AND ENTERING ACCESS CODE 496 4809 WHEN PROMPTED. (pf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 26, 2020
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 08/26 10:44 AM
Summons Service Executed on Nicole M Chisholm 8/25/2020 (Glasser, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 25, 2020
3 3 court Summons Issued Tue 08/25 1:16 PM
Summons Issued on Towd Point Asset Grantor Trust. Answer Due 9/24/2020. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (pf)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Tue 08/25 1:11 PM
Adversary Cover Sheet Related [+] filed by Plaintiff Nicole M Chisholm (Glasser, Gerald)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 08/25 1:10 PM
Adversary case 20-03016 Complaint by Nicole M Chisholm against Towd Point Asset Grantor Trust. Fee Amount $0.00. Nature of Suit(63 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(8), student loan))(Glasser, Gerald)
Related: [-]