Iowa Northern District Court
Judge:Mark A Roberts
Case #: 1:20-mc-00004
Case Filed:Aug 27, 2020
Terminated:Dec 18, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, December 18, 2023
utility Terminate Civil Case Mon 12/18 4:32 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (MAR) (rjs)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 02, 2020
10 10 misc Termination of Garnishment and Final Accounting upon Termination of Garnishment Fri 10/02 10:42 AM
TERMINATION of Garnishment and Final Accounting Upon Termination of Garnishment by The Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund for Garnishee, Cedar Rapids Bank and Trust Co. (Wood, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 23, 2020
9 9 service Certificate of Service Wed 09/23 11:29 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund (Wood, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 21, 2020
8 8 service Writ Issued Mon 09/21 10:33 AM
WRIT of of Garnishment Issued in regard to Garnishee Cedar Rapids Bank and Trust Co. (Amash, Michael)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Pro Hac Vice Mon 09/21 9:40 AM
TEXT ORDER ONLY granting5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brandon E. Wood (Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3288330). Upon review of the motion and certificate of good standing, the court finds the motion should be granted. It so ordered that Attorney Brandon E. Wood is authorized to appear on behalf of Plaintiff The Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund. Signed by Clerk on 9/21/2020. (jag)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 18, 2020
5 5 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 09/18 10:30 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brandon E. Wood ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3288330) by Plaintiff The Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund (Wood, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 17, 2020
6 6 misc Sealed Document with Access to Selected Parties Fri 09/18 3:41 PM
SEALED Answer of Writ of Garnishment re4 Writ of Garnishment by Cedar Rapids Bank and Trust Co., The Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund (ksy)(NEf to filer)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 11, 2020
4 4 order Writ of Garnishment Fri 09/11 9:43 AM
WRIT of Garnishment issued (jag)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Thursday, September 10, 2020
3 3 misc Application for Writ (Garnishment/Execution) Thu 09/10 4:15 PM
APPLICATION for Writ of of Garnishment by The Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund to Garnishee Cedar Rapids Bank and Trust Co. (Amash, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Notice and Summons of Garnishment,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Interrogatories to Garnishee,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Writ of Garnishment,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Return of Service of Writ on Garnishee
2 2 notice Notice (Other) Thu 09/10 3:53 PM
NOTICE by The Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund of Intent to Use Private Process Server (Amash, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 31, 2020
misc Fee Receipt Mon 08/31 3:15 PM
FEE Receipt: $47.00, receipt number IAN110027734 for filing fee by The Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund. (NEF mailed to remitter) (pac)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 27, 2020
1 1 misc Certification of Judgment Thu 08/27 2:59 PM
CERTIFICATION of Judgment from the USDC Eastern District of Virginia in favor of Plaintiff against Defendants in the sum of 41,638.00. (NEF eHarney) (jjh)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 08/27 3:09 PM
Set Deadline: Fee due by 9/3/2020. (jjh)
Related: [-]