Washington Western District Court
Judge:Benjamin H Settle
Case #: 3:20-cv-05864
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Case Filed:Aug 26, 2020
Terminated:Sep 22, 2020
Case in other court:Thurston County Superior Court, 20-00002-01837-34
Last checked: Monday Feb 22, 2021 1:21 AM PST
Defendant
Monsanto Company
Represented By
Jennifer Campbell
Schwabe Williamson & Wyatt (sea)
contact info
Plaintiff
Joslyn Ethel Kooi
Represented By
Daniel Foster Johnson
Breskin Johnson & Townsend PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, September 25, 2020
9 9 transfer Case Transferred Out - Email notification Fri 09/25 3:53 PM
TRANSFERRED CASE opened in Northern District of California as case 3:20-cv-06656 on 9/23/2020. (LH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 22, 2020
transfer Case Transferred Out - District Transfer Tue 09/22 10:28 AM
Case sent to the Northern District of California by electronic case transfer. (PM)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 14, 2020
8 8 misc MDL Transfer Order Tue 09/22 10:26 AM
MDL 2741 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO -233). In re Roundup Products Liability Litigation; Northern District of Caifornia; assigned to Judge Vince Chharbria. (PM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 08, 2020
7 7 order BHS - Discovery, Depositions, and JSR Order (FORM) Tue 09/08 2:02 PM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 12/7/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 11/23/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/30/2020. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 28, 2020
6 6 utility Judge Assignment Letter (Removal & Transfer cases only) Fri 08/28 10:43 AM
LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Thurston County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (ERA)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 08/28 10:42 AM
Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (ERA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 26, 2020
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 08/26 3:04 PM
ANSWER to Complaint; with JURY DEMAND by Monsanto Company.(Campbell, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
4 4 discov Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 08/26 2:47 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Monsanto Company (Campbell, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Verification of State Court Records Wed 08/26 2:43 PM
VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Monsanto Company (Campbell, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Certificate of Service Wed 08/26 2:38 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Monsanto Company re1 Notice of Removal (Campbell, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 08/26 2:30 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Thurston County Superior Court, case number 20 2-01837 34; Related [+], filed by Monsanto Company.(Campbell, Jennifer)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-6556373
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Complaint