Petretta v. GOCARS.COM et al
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Liam O'Grady |
Referred: | Theresa Carroll Buchanan |
Case #: | 1:20-cv-00996 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1125 Trademark (Anticybersquatting consumer protection) |
Case Filed: | Aug 26, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jul 23, 2021 |
Last checked: Monday Feb 22, 2021 3:42 AM EST |
Defendant
GOCARS.COM
|
|
Defendant
GOWEATHER.COM
|
|
Defendant
GOSERVICE.COM
|
|
Defendant
GOSALES.COM
|
|
Defendant
GOSAFETY.COM
|
|
Defendant
GORESTAURANTS.COM
|
|
Defendant
GOPARTY.COM
|
|
Defendant
GOPARTS.COM
|
|
Defendant
GOGIFTS.COM
|
|
Defendant
GOGAMES.COM
|
|
Defendant
GOFASHION.COM
|
|
Defendant
GODOCTOR.COM
|
|
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Plaintiff
Scott Petretta
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
MX4.COM
Terminated: 12/17/2020
|
|
Defendant
GOTOUR.COM
Terminated: 09/30/2020
|
|
Defendant
GONUCLEAR.COM
Terminated: 09/29/2020
|
|
Defendant
GOELECTRIC.COM
Terminated: 09/30/2020
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Friday, July 23, 2021 | ||
23 | 23
order
Judgment - Clerk
Fri 07/23 3:34 PM
JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP58 in favor of the plaintiff Scott Petretta and against the defendants GOCARS.COM, GODOCTOR.COM, GOFASHION.COM,GOGAMES.COM, GOGIFTS.COM, GOPARTY.COM, GORESTAURANTS.COM,GOSAFETY.COM, GOSALES.COM, GOSERVICE.COM, GOWEATHER.COM, AND MX4.COM. Entered by Clerk on 7/23/21. (klau, ) (Main Document 23 replaced on 7/23/2021 to remove blank page) (klau, ) |
|
Thursday, July 22, 2021 | ||
22 | 22
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 07/23 1:45 PM
ORDER re17 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS The Clerk is hereby directed to enter judgment pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58 in favor of Plaintiff Scott Petretta, and against Defendant Domain Names. The time for an appeal shall run upon issuance of this Order. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 7/22/21. (klau, ) |
|
21 | 21
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Fri 07/23 1:41 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion for Default Judgment. This Clerk of Court is hereby directed to enter default judgment against Defendant Domain Names and in favor of Plaintiff on Count I of Plaintiff's Complaint. ORDERED that Counts II-V of Plaintiff's Complaint are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Verisign, Inc. is hereby ORDERED to change the registrar of record for Defendant Domain Names to Plaintiff's domain name registrar of choice ---- (see order for details). Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 7/22/21. (klau, ) |
|
Monday, June 07, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
order
So Ordered
Tue 06/08 1:00 PM
So Ordered re19 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to GOPARTS.COM filed by Scott Petretta (see order for details). Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 6/7/21. (klau, ) Modified on 6/8/2021 (c/s to Verisign Inc.)(klau, ) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 06/07 4:14 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Stipulated Order and Dismissal as to GoParts.com by Scott Petretta.(Barnes, Attison) |
|
Att: 1 Letter Transmitting Consent Judgment Order | ||
Thursday, December 17, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
4
pgs
order
Order
Fri 12/18 2:55 PM
Consent Judgment and Dismissal as to MX4.COM. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 12/17/2020. (choy, ) |
|
Tuesday, December 15, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Report and Recommendations
Tue 12/15 4:12 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re13 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants GOCARS.COM, GODOCTOR.COM, GOFASHION.COM, GOGAMES.COM, GOGIFTS.COM, GOPARTY.COM, GORESTAURANTS.COM, GOSAFETY.COM, GOSALES.COM, GOSERVICE.COM, GOWEATHER.COM, and MX4.COM filed by Scott Petretta Objections to R&R due by 12/29/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 12/15/20. (klau, ) |
|
Monday, November 23, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 11/23 3:21 PM
ORDER re13 MOTION for Default Judgment, the motion is set for a hearing before the undersigned on Friday, December 4, 2020 (Dkt. 15), ORDER that the Court will not hold a hearing on this matter. Instead, the Court will allow any interested party to file an objection within twenty (20) days of the date of this Order. Accordingly, any objections to Plaintiff's motion for default judgment are to be filed with the Clerks office by Monday, December 14, 2020 at 5:00 p.m. The undersigned will then issue a Report and Recommendation concerning the default judgment without a hearing (see order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 11/23/20. (klau, ) |
|
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 11/23 12:17 PM
Set Deadlines as to13 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants GOCARS.COM, GODOCTOR.COM, GOFASHION.COM, GOGAMES.COM, GOGIFTS.COM, GOPARTY.COM, GORESTAURANTS.COM, GOSAFETY.COM, GOSALES.COM, GOSERVICE.COM, GOWEATHER.COM, and MX4.COM . Motion Hearing set for 12/4/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (clar, ) |
||
utility
Motions Referred
Mon 11/23 12:20 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Buchanan.13 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants GOCARS.COM, GODOCTOR.COM, GOFASHION.COM, GOGAMES.COM, GOGIFTS.COM, GOPARTY.COM, GORESTAURANTS.COM, GOSAFETY.COM, GOSALES.COM, GOSERVICE.COM, GOWEATHER.COM, and MX4.COM (clar, ) |
||
Friday, November 20, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Notice of Hearing Date
Fri 11/20 3:37 PM
Notice of Hearing Date (December 4, 2020) re13 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants GOCARS.COM, GODOCTOR.COM, GOFASHION.COM, GOGAMES.COM, GOGIFTS.COM, GOPARTY.COM, GORESTAURANTS.COM, GOSAFETY.COM, GOSALES.COM, GOSERVICE.COM, GOWEATHER.COM, and MX4.COM (Barnes, Attison) |
|
14 | 14
20
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support
Fri 11/20 3:36 PM
Memorandum in Support re13 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants GOCARS.COM, GODOCTOR.COM, GOFASHION.COM, GOGAMES.COM, GOGIFTS.COM, GOPARTY.COM, GORESTAURANTS.COM, GOSAFETY.COM, GOSALES.COM, GOSERVICE.COM, GOWEATHER.COM, and MX4.COM filed by Scott Petretta. (Barnes, Attison) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Default Judgment
Fri 11/20 3:34 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants GOCARS.COM, GODOCTOR.COM, GOFASHION.COM, GOGAMES.COM, GOGIFTS.COM, GOPARTY.COM, GORESTAURANTS.COM, GOSAFETY.COM, GOSALES.COM, GOSERVICE.COM, GOWEATHER.COM, and MX4.COM by Scott Petretta.(Barnes, Attison) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, November 05, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Thu 11/05 9:38 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to John Doe, GOCARS.COM, GODOCTOR.COM, GOFASHION.COM, GOGAMES.COM, GOGIFTS.COM, GOPARTY.COM, GORESTAURANTS.COM, GOSAFETY.COM, GOSALES.COM, GOSERVICE.COM, GOWEATHER.COM, MX4.COM (klau, ) |
|
Wednesday, November 04, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Entry of Default
Wed 11/04 11:02 AM
Request for Entry of Default as to Defendants GOCARS.COM, GODOCTOR.COM, GOFASHION.COM, GOGAMES.COM, GOGIFTS.COM, GOPARTY.COM, GORESTAURANTS.COM, GOSAFETY.COM, GOSALES.COM, GOSERVICE.COM, GOWEATHER.COM, MX4.COM, and John Doe by Scott Petretta.(Kosak, Adrienne) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 (Declaration of A. Kosak) | ||
Monday, October 26, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Declaration
Mon 10/26 5:24 PM
Declaration re5 Order on Motion for Service by Publication by Scott Petretta.(Barnes, Attison) |
|
Att: 1 Letter Regarding Publication | ||
Wednesday, September 30, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 10/02 10:24 AM
ORDER that is action is DISMISSED without prejudice as it concerns Defendants GoElectric.com and GoTour.com. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 9/30/20. (klau, ) |
|
Tuesday, September 29, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 09/29 4:11 PM
ORDER that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice as it concerns GoNuclear.com. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 9/29/20. (klau, ) |
|
Monday, September 28, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 09/28 7:14 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant GoNuclear.com by Scott Petretta (Kosak, Adrienne) |
|
Wednesday, September 23, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 09/23 3:56 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants GOELECTRIC.COM and GOTOUR.COM by Scott Petretta (Kosak, Adrienne) |
|
Thursday, September 10, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Service by Publication
Thu 09/10 10:42 AM
ORDER granting2 Motion for an Order to Publish Notice of Action (see order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 09/10/2020. (jlan) |
|
Wednesday, September 09, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Waiver of
Wed 09/09 8:46 PM
Waiver of re2 MOTION for Service by Publication Waiver of Hearing by Scott Petretta (Kosak, Adrienne) |
|
3 | 3
13
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support
Wed 09/09 8:44 PM
Memorandum in Support re2 MOTION for Service by Publication filed by Scott Petretta.(Kosak, Adrienne) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A (Declaration of A. Kosak) | ||
2 | 2
motion
Service by Publication
Wed 09/09 8:34 PM
MOTION for Service by Publication by Scott Petretta.(Kosak, Adrienne) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, August 27, 2020 | ||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Thu 08/27 9:48 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Liam O'Grady and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (klau, ) |
||
Wednesday, August 26, 2020 | ||
1 | 1
19
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 08/26 7:55 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7370977.), filed by Scott Petretta.(Barnes, Attison) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit K, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit L, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit M, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit N, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit O, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit P, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit Q, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit R, | ||
Att: 19 Civil Cover Sheet |