California Central District Court
Judge:Andre Birotte Jr
Referred: Alicia G Rosenberg
Case #: 2:20-cv-07812
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Aug 27, 2020
Terminated:May 26, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 23, 2021 1:23 AM PST
Defendant
Does 1-10
Defendant
Starbucks Corporation
Represented By
Charles Michael Cannizzaro
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Robert W Conti
Little Mendelson
contact info
Mediator (ADR Panel)
Stephen M Benardo
Represented By
Stephen Morris Benardo
The Law Offices Of Stephen M Benardo
contact info
Plaintiff
Orlando Garcia
Represented By
Amanda Lockhart Seabock
Center For Disability Access
contact info
Dennis Jay Price, II
Center For Disability Access
contact info
Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Center For Disability Access
contact info
Russell C Handy
Center For Disability Access
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, August 09, 2021
27 27 stip Dismiss Case Mon 08/09 7:08 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to F.R.CIV.P.41 (a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by plaintiff Orlando Garcia.(Seabock, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 14, 2021
26 26 1 pgs order Order Thu 07/15 11:25 AM
ORDER TO EXTEND DATE FOR FILING DOCUMENTS TO REOPEN THE ACTION by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court hereby GRANTS the Stipulation25 . The deadline to file Documents to Reopen the Action shall be extended up to and including 8/10/2021. (gk)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 12, 2021
25 25 stip Extension of Time to File Document Mon 07/12 3:01 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File documents to reopen the action filed by plaintiff Orlando Garcia.(Seabock, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, May 26, 2021
24 24 order Dismissing Case Thu 05/27 11:18 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CIVIL ACTION by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: THE COURT having been advised by counsel that the action has been settled23 ; IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this action is hereby dismissed without costs and without prejudice to the right, upon good cause shown within 45 days, to reopen the action if settlement is not consummated. This Court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this Order shall not prejudice any party to this action. ( Case Terminated. Made JS-6. ) (gk)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Settlement Wed 05/26 8:49 AM
NOTICE of Settlement and request to vacate all currently set dates filed by plaintiff Orlando Garcia.(Seabock, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Sunday, May 23, 2021
22 22 adr Mediation Report (ADR-3) Completely Settled Sun 05/23 10:23 AM
MEDIATION REPORT Filed by Mediator (ADR Panel) Stephen M Benardo: Mediation held on May 14, 2021 and the case has been completely settled. With the filing of this Report, the parties are advised that they must notify the trial judge's deputy courtroom clerk of the fact of settlement and to promptly file documents regarding the final disposition of the case. Counsel: Please evaluate the effectiveness of the ADR Program by completing a survey on your mediation experience. To access the survey, click on the following link:[LINK:MediationParticipantSurvey] (Benardo, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 04, 2021
21 21 adr Notice of Mediation Date (ADR-13) Thu 03/04 9:18 AM
NOTICE OF MEDIATION DATE filed. Mediation set for May 14, 2021 at 10:00 a.m.(Benardo, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 19, 2021
20 20 adr Notice of Mediation Date (ADR-13) Fri 02/19 1:37 PM
NOTICE OF MEDIATION DATE filed. Mediation set for April 13, 2021 at 10:00 a.m.(Benardo, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 27, 2021
19 19 adr Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11) Wed 01/27 12:54 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Stephen M Benardo has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 26, 2021
18 18 adr Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Consent) - (ADR-2) Tue 01/26 9:41 AM
STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that Stephen Benardo may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. Filed by Plaintiff Orlando Garcia(Montgomery, Elliott)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 14, 2021
17 17 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Fri 01/15 6:45 AM
ORDER RE: JURY/COURT TRIAL: I. SCHEDULE; II. TRIAL PREPARATION; III. CONDUCT OF ATTORNEYS AND PARTIES by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Bench Trial set for 2/15/2022 08:30 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions In Limine set for 1/28/2022 11:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Last Date to Hear Motion to Amend Pleadings/Add Parties 5/7/2021. Non-Expert Discovery cut-off 10/1/2021. Last Date to Hear Motions 11/5/2021. Deadline to Complete Settlement Conference 11/19/2021. Trial Filings (first round): Motions In Limine, Memoranda of Contentions of Fact and Law, Witness Lists, Joint Exhibit List, Joint Status Report Regarding Settlement due by 1/7/2022. Trial Filings (second round): Oppositions to Motions In Limine, Joint Proposed Final Pretrial Conference Order due by 1/14/2022. See document for further details. (gk)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12) Thu 01/14 10:38 AM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 11/19/2021. (cb)
Related: [-]
15 15 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 01/14 10:36 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court has reviewed the Joint Rule 26(f) Report submitted by the parties, and determines that an in-person Scheduling Conference is unnecessary. Accordingly, the Court VACATES the January 15, 2021, Scheduling Conference. Order re Jury/Court Trial to issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 03, 2020
14 14 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Thu 12/03 10:26 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 2-3 days, filed by Plaintiff Orlando Garcia.. (Price, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 23, 2020
13 13 notice Appearance Wed 09/23 4:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Robert W Conti on behalf of Defendant Starbucks Corporation (Attorney Robert W Conti added to party Starbucks Corporation(pty:dft))(Conti, Robert)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Wed 09/23 4:20 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 1/15/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
Related: [-]
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 09/23 3:53 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation.(Attorney Charles Michael Cannizzaro added to party Starbucks Corporation(pty:dft))(Cannizzaro, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Interested Parties
Tuesday, September 08, 2020
10 10 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 09/08 3:38 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Orlando Garcia, upon Defendant Starbucks Corporation served on 9/2/2020, answer due 9/23/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process:- Becky de George in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 31, 2020
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 08/31 11:21 AM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
Related: [-]
8 8 adr Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20) Mon 08/31 11:20 AM
Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (cb)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 28, 2020
7 7 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 08/28 3:05 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (jtil)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 08/28 2:55 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 08/28 2:55 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 27, 2020
4 4 notice Summons Request Thu 08/27 3:53 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Orlando Garcia. (Handy, Russell)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 08/27 3:52 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Orlando Garcia, (Handy, Russell)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 08/27 3:52 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Orlando Garcia. (Handy, Russell)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 08/27 3:50 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27810544 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Orlando Garcia. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Orlando Garcia(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell)
Related: [-]