Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Gershwin A Drain
Referred: Patricia T Morris
Case #: 4:12-cv-12357
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
CauseNo cause code entered
Case Filed:May 31, 2012
Terminated:Feb 05, 2015
Defendant
Debra Scutt
Defendant
Jenny Engstrom
Defendant
Joyce Hunter
Defendant
Kelly Holden-Selby
Defendant
Richard Cady
Defendant
Richard Miles
Plaintiff
Terrance Pugh

GPO Oct 25 2012
Order Denying 18 Motion for Reconsideration filed by Terrance Pugh. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (Bankston, T)
GPO Nov 07 2012
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that Defendant Miles be sua sponte dismissed, and 17 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Terrance Pugh be denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles E. Binder. (JBro)
GPO Dec 04 2012
ORDER Accepting and Adopting Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation 28 and Denying Plaintiff's 17 Motion to Amend/Correct filed by Terrance Pugh. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (Bankston, T)
GPO Jun 06 2013
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that 21 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Cady and Kelly Holden-Selby be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles E. Binder. (JBro)
GPO Jul 02 2013
ORDER Adopting 57 Report and Recommendation ; Granting 21 Defendant's Holden-Selby's and Cady's Motion to Dismiss, or in the alternative, for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (Bankston, T)
GPO Oct 30 2013
ORDER ACCEPTING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION [# 63], DENYING DEFENDANT HUNTERS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [#40]AND GRANTING DEFENDANT ENGSTROMS MOTION TO DISMISS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [#47] Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (Bankston, T)
GPO Oct 16 2014
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EXTRANEOUS FACTS, ARGUMENT OR REFERENCES TO THE PLAINTIFFS CRIMINAL HISTORY [#94]. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (Bankston, T)
Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, February 01, 2016
115 115 notice Change of Address/Contact Information Tue 02/02 11:04 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Terrance Pugh. (DPer)
Related: [-]