Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:19-bk-34054

Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stacey G Jernigan
Case #: 3:20-ap-03105
Nature of Suit81 Bankruptcy - Subordination of claim or interest
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Aug 26, 2020
Terminated:Apr 01, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Hunter Mountain Investment Trust, Defendant
Rochelle McCullough, LLP 325 North St. Paul St., Suite 4500
Dallas, TX 75201
Represented By
Hunter Mountain Investment Trust
contact info
Plaintiff
Highland Capital Management, L.P., Plaintiff
10100 Santa Monica Blvd. 13th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90067
Represented By
Zachery Z. Annable
Hayward & Associates, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Tuesday, April 06, 2021
25 25 misc Certificate of service Tue 04/06 8:28 PM
Certificate of service re: Order Approving Joint Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice Filed by Claims Agent Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC Related [+]. (Kass, Albert)
Related: [-] 20 Order approving joint stipulation of dismissal without prejudice (related document18 Notice of stipulated dismissal in an adversary proceeding (Joint Stipulation of Dismissal without Prejudice) filed by Plaintiff Highland Capital Management, L.P.). Entered on 4/1/2021 (Okafor, M.)
Monday, April 05, 2021
24 24 misc Certificate of service Mon 04/05 8:21 PM
Certificate of service re: 1) Joint Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice; and 2) Order Approving Joint Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice Filed by Claims Agent Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC Related [+]. (Kass, Albert)
Related: [-] 18 Notice of stipulated dismissal in an adversary proceeding (Joint Stipulation of Dismissal without Prejudice) filed by Plaintiff Highland Capital Management, L.P.. filed by Plaintiff Highland Capital Management, L.P.,19 INCORRECT ENTRY: Incorrect PDF Attached - Order approving joint stipulation of dismissal without prejudice (related document17 Notice of stipulated dismissal in an adversary proceeding (Joint Stipulation of Dismissal without Prejudice) filed by Plaintiff Highland Capital Management, L.P.). Entered on 3/31/2021 (Okafor, M.) Modified on 4/1/2021 (Okafor, M.).
Saturday, April 03, 2021
23 23 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Sat 04/03 11:31 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 04/03/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20 Order approving joint stipulation of dismissal without prejudice (related document18 Notice of stipulated dismissal in an adversary proceeding (Joint Stipulation of Dismissal without Prejudice) filed by Plaintiff Highland Capital Management, L.P.). Entered on 4/1/2021 (Okafor, M.)
Friday, April 02, 2021
22 22 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Fri 04/02 11:29 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 04/02/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 INCORRECT ENTRY: Incorrect PDF Attached - Order approving joint stipulation of dismissal without prejudice (related document17 Notice of stipulated dismissal in an adversary proceeding (Joint Stipulation of Dismissal without Prejudice) filed by Plaintiff Highland Capital Management, L.P.). Entered on 3/31/2021 (Okafor, M.) Modified on 4/1/2021 (Okafor, M.).
21 21 misc Certificate of service Fri 04/02 2:23 PM
Certificate of service re: re: Joint Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice Filed by Claims Agent Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC Related [+]. (Kass, Albert)
Related: [-] 17 INCORRECT EVENT: Attorney to refile. Stipulation by Highland Capital Management, L.P. and Hunter Mountain Investment Trust. filed by Plaintiff Highland Capital Management, L.P. (RE: related document(s)1 Complaint). (Annable, Zachery) Modified on 3/31/2021 (Ecker, C.). filed by Plaintiff Highland Capital Management, L.P.
Thursday, April 01, 2021
20 20 order Dismiss adversary case Thu 04/01 8:12 AM
Order approving joint stipulation of dismissal without prejudice Related [+]. Entered on 4/1/2021 (Okafor, M.)
Related: [-] 18 Notice of stipulated dismissal in an adversary proceeding (Joint Stipulation of Dismissal without Prejudice) filed by Plaintiff Highland Capital Management, L.P.
court Close adversary case Thu 04/01 11:52 AM
Adversary case 3:20-ap-3105 closed (Ecker, C.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 31, 2021
19 19 order Dismiss adversary case Wed 03/31 4:01 PM
INCORRECT ENTRY: Incorrect PDF Attached - Order approving joint stipulation of dismissal without prejudice Related [+]. Entered on 3/31/2021 (Okafor, M.) Modified on 4/1/2021 (Okafor, M.)
Related: [-] ument17 Notice of stipulated dismissal in an adversary proceeding (Joint Stipulation of Dismissal without Prejudice) filed by Plaintiff Highland Capital Management, L.P.
18 18 notice Notice of dismissal or stipulated dismissal in an adversary proceeding Wed 03/31 9:34 AM
Notice of stipulated dismissal in an adversary proceeding (Joint Stipulation of Dismissal without Prejudice) filed by Plaintiff Highland Capital Management, L.P.. (Annable, Zachery)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 30, 2021
17 17 misc Stipulation Tue 03/30 6:12 PM
INCORRECT EVENT: Attorney to refile. Stipulation by Highland Capital Management, L.P. and Hunter Mountain Investment Trust. filed by Plaintiff Highland Capital Management, L.P. Related [+]. (Annable, Zachery) Modified on 3/31/2021 (Ecker, C.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, March 05, 2021
16 16 misc Certificate of service Fri 03/05 7:52 PM
Certificate of service re: (Supplemental) Debtors Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Hunter Mountain Investment Trust Filed by Claims Agent Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC Related [+]. (Kass, Albert)
Related: [-] 12 Notice to take deposition of Hunter Mountain Investment Trust filed by Plaintiff Highland Capital Management, L.P.. filed by Plaintiff Highland Capital Management, L.P.,13 Certificate of service re: Debtors Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Hunter Mountain Investment Trust Filed by Claims Agent Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC (related document(s)12 Notice to take deposition of Hunter Mountain Investment Trust filed by Plaintiff Highland Capital Management, L.P.. filed by Plaintiff Highland Capital Management, L.P.). filed by Claims Agent Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC
Wednesday, March 03, 2021
15 15 misc Certificate of service Wed 03/03 7:26 PM
Certificate of service re: Debtors Amended Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Hunter Mountain Investment Trust Filed by Claims Agent Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC Related [+]. (Kass, Albert)
Related: [-] 14 Notice to take deposition of Hunter Mountain Investment Trust filed by Plaintiff Highland Capital Management, L.P.. filed by Plaintiff Highland Capital Management, L.P.
Friday, February 26, 2021
14 14 notice Notice to take deposition Fri 02/26 3:32 PM
Notice to take deposition of Hunter Mountain Investment Trust filed by Plaintiff Highland Capital Management, L.P.. (Annable, Zachery)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 16, 2021
13 13 misc Certificate of service Tue 02/16 7:51 PM
Certificate of service re: Debtors Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Hunter Mountain Investment Trust Filed by Claims Agent Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC Related [+]. (Kass, Albert)
Related: [-] 12 Notice to take deposition of Hunter Mountain Investment Trust filed by Plaintiff Highland Capital Management, L.P.. filed by Plaintiff Highland Capital Management, L.P.
Wednesday, February 10, 2021
12 12 notice Notice to take deposition Wed 02/10 11:54 AM
Notice to take deposition of Hunter Mountain Investment Trust filed by Plaintiff Highland Capital Management, L.P.. (Annable, Zachery)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 01, 2020
11 11 answer Answer to complaint Tue 12/01 4:02 PM
Answer to complaint (HUNTER MOUNTAIN INVESTMENT TRUST'S RESPONSE TO DEBTOR'S (I) OBJECTION TO CLAIM NO. 152 OF HUNTER MOUNTAIN INVESTMENT TRUST AND (II) COMPLAINT TO SUBORDINATE CLAIM OF HUNTER MOUNTAIN INVESTMENT TRUST AND FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF) filed by Hunter Mountain Investment Trust. (Keiffer, Edwin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 15, 2020
10 10 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Fri 10/16 12:03 AM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 10/15/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order approving stipulation and scheduling pre-trial matters (RE: related document(s)8 Stipulation by Highland Capital Management, L.P. and Hunter Mountain Investment Trust and1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Highland Capital Management, L.P.). Trial Docket Call date set for 5/10/2021 at 01:30 PM at Dallas Judge Jernigan Ctrm. Entered on 10/12/2020 (Okafor, M.)
Monday, October 12, 2020
9 9 order Set or continue hearing Mon 10/12 3:14 PM
Order approving stipulation and scheduling pre-trial matters Related [+]. Trial Docket Call date set for 5/10/2021 at 01:30 PM at Dallas Judge Jernigan Ctrm. Entered on 10/12/2020 (Okafor, M.)
Related: [-] 8 Stipulation by Highland Capital Management, L.P. and Hunter Mountain Investment Trust and1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Highland Capital Management, L.P.
Monday, October 05, 2020
8 8 misc Stipulation Mon 10/05 1:52 PM
Stipulation by Highland Capital Management, L.P. and Hunter Mountain Investment Trust. filed by Plaintiff Highland Capital Management, L.P. Related [+]. (Annable, Zachery)
Related: [-] 3 Standing scheduling order in an adversary proceeding
Friday, September 04, 2020
7 7 misc Certificate of service Fri 09/04 8:05 PM
Certificate of service re: Certificate of Service [of Zachery Annable re: (1) Debtors (i) Objection to Claim No. 152 of Hunter Mountain Investment Trust and (ii) Complaint to Subordinate Claim of Hunter Mountain Investment Trust and for Declaratory Relief; (2) Summons in an Adversary Proceeding; and (3) Order Regarding Adversary Proceedings Trial Setting and Alternative Scheduling Order] Filed by Claims Agent Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC Related [+]. (Kass, Albert)
Related: [-] 5 Certificate of service re: (1) Debtors (i) Objection to Claim No. 152 of Hunter Mountain Investment Trust and (ii) Complaint to Subordinate Claim of Hunter Mountain Investment Trust and for Declaratory Relief, (2) Summons in an Adversary Proceeding, and (3) Order Regarding Adversary Proceedings Trial Setting and Alternative Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff Highland Capital Management, L.P. (RE: related document(s)1 Complaint,2 Summons issued,3 Standing scheduling order in an adversary proceeding). filed by Plaintiff Highland Capital Management, L.P.
Thursday, September 03, 2020
6 6 misc Certificate of service Thu 09/03 8:04 PM
Certificate of service re: 1) Order Regarding Adversary Proceeding Trial Setting and Alternative Scheduling Order; and 2) Summons in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Claims Agent Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC Related [+]. (Kass, Albert)
Related: [-] 3 Scheduling order setting deadlines. Discovery and all exhibits except impeachment documents: 45 days prior to Docket Call, pre-trial order: 7 calendar days prior to Docket Call, proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law: 7 days prior to first scheduled docket call (RE: related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Highland Capital Management, L.P.). Trial Docket Call date set for 1/11/2021 at 01:30 PM at Dallas Judge Jernigan Ctrm. Entered on 8/27/2020; Trial will be held during the week of 1/19/2021;,4 Summons service executed on Hunter Mountain Investment Trust 8/28/2020
Tuesday, September 01, 2020
5 5 misc Certificate of service Tue 09/01 6:53 PM
Certificate of service re: (1) Debtors (i) Objection to Claim No. 152 of Hunter Mountain Investment Trust and (ii) Complaint to Subordinate Claim of Hunter Mountain Investment Trust and for Declaratory Relief, (2) Summons in an Adversary Proceeding, and (3) Order Regarding Adversary Proceedings Trial Setting and Alternative Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff Highland Capital Management, L.P. Related [+]. (Annable, Zachery)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons issued,3 Standing scheduling order in an adversary proceeding
Monday, August 31, 2020
4 4 cmp Summons service executed Mon 08/31 3:44 PM
Summons service executed on Hunter Mountain Investment Trust 8/28/2020 (Annable, Zachery)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 27, 2020
3 3 order Standing scheduling order in an adversary proceeding Thu 08/27 10:10 AM
Scheduling order setting deadlines. Discovery and all exhibits except impeachment documents: 45 days prior to Docket Call, pre-trial order: 7 calendar days prior to Docket Call, proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law: 7 days prior to first scheduled docket call Related [+]. Trial Docket Call date set for 1/11/2021 at 01:30 PM at Dallas Judge Jernigan Ctrm. Entered on 8/27/2020; Trial will be held during the week of 1/19/2021; (Edmond, Michael)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Highland Capital Management, L.P.
2 2 court Summons issued Thu 08/27 10:05 AM
Summons issued on Hunter Mountain Investment Trust; Answer Due 9/28/2020 (Edmond, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 26, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 08/26 6:07 PM
Adversary case 20-03105 Complaint by Highland Capital Management, L.P. against Hunter Mountain Investment Trust. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of suit: 81 (Subordination of claim or interest). 91 (Declaratory judgment). (Annable, Zachery)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet