California Central District Court
Judge:George H Wu
Referred: Pedro V Castillo
Case #: 2:20-cv-07872
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause15:1126 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Aug 27, 2020
Re-opened:Feb 08, 2022
Terminated:Feb 03, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 23, 2021 2:14 AM PST
Defendant
Bank of America Corporation
Represented By
Diana Hughes Leiden
Winston And Strawn LLP
contact info
George C. Lombardi
Winston And Strawn LLP
contact info
E Danielle Thompson Williams
Winston And Strawn LLP
contact info
Elizabeth Danielle T. Williams
Winston And Strawn LLP
contact info
Michael A Tomasulo
Winston & Strawn LLP
contact info
Dustin J. Edwards
Winston And Strawn LLP
contact info
Michael A. Tomasulo
Winston And Strawn LLP
contact info
Michael S. Elkin
Winston And Strawn LLP
contact info
Defendant
Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By
Diana Hughes Leiden
Winston And Strawn LLP
contact info
George C. Lombardi
Winston And Strawn LLP
contact info
E Danielle Thompson Williams
Winston And Strawn LLP
contact info
Elizabeth Danielle T. Williams
Winston And Strawn LLP
contact info
Michael A Tomasulo
Winston & Strawn LLP
contact info
Dustin J. Edwards
Winston And Strawn LLP
contact info
Michael A. Tomasulo
Winston And Strawn LLP
contact info
Michael S. Elkin
Winston And Strawn LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Nant Holdings IP, LLC.
Represented By
Todd M Briggs
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart And Sullivan LLP
contact info
Kevin P. B. Johnson
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart And Sullivan LLP
contact info
Todd M. Briggs
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart And Sullivan LLP
contact info
Kevin P B Johnson
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart And Sullivan LLP
contact info
James R Asperger
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart And Sullivan LLP
contact info
Brice Clark Lynch
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart And Sullivan LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Nantworks, LLC
Represented By
Todd M Briggs
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart And Sullivan LLP
contact info
Kevin P. B. Johnson
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart And Sullivan LLP
contact info
Todd M. Briggs
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart And Sullivan LLP
contact info
Eric Hui-chieh Huang
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart And Sullivan LLP
contact info
Kevin P B Johnson
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart And Sullivan LLP
contact info
James R Asperger
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart And Sullivan LLP
contact info
Brice Clark Lynch
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart And Sullivan LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, May 19, 2025
717 717 notice Notice (Other) Mon 05/19 9:11 AM
Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Defendants Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A..(Edwards, Dustin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A