North Carolina Middle District Court
Case #: 1:20-mj-00260
Case Filed:Aug 26, 2020
Terminated:Aug 26, 2020
Last checked: Friday Aug 28, 2020 3:43 AM EDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
ASHLEY E. WAID
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
RAULAND POLLARD, III (1)
Terminated: 08/26/2020
Represented By
JOHN A. DUBERSTEIN
Federal Public Defender
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/28/2020 4:13 AM EDT
Wednesday, August 26, 2020
Arrest (Rule 5) of RAULAND POLLARD, III. (Kemp, Donita)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD: INITIAL APPEARANCE IN RULE 5 PROCEEDINGS as to RAULAND POLLARD, III held on 8/26/2020. Defendant advised of rights and charges. Defendant to be transported in custody to the Southern District of Ohio for further proceedings. (AUSA Ashley Waid; Counsel for defendant AFPD John Duberstein; Proceedings Recorded) (Kemp, Donita)
Related: [-]
Oral Motion for Detention by USA as to RAULAND POLLARD, III. (Kemp, Donita)
Related: [-]
1 1 SEALED FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by RAULAND POLLARD, III. (Sheets, Jamie)
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER appointing Assistant Federal Public Defender JOHN A. DUBERSTEIN for RAULAND POLLARD, III. Signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 8/26/2020. (Sheets, Jamie)
Related: [-]
3 3 WAIVER of Rule 5 & 5.1 Hearings by RAULAND POLLARD, III. (Sheets, Jamie)
Related: [-]
4 4 COMMITMENT TO ANOTHER DISTRICT as to RAULAND POLLARD, III. Defendant committed to the SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF OHIO. Signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 8/26/2020. (Sheets, Jamie)
Related: [-]
5 5 Notice to Southern District of Ohio of a Transfer of Jurisdiction as to RAULAND POLLARD, III. Docket sheet and documents attached. If you require a copy of the financial ledger, please email your request to InterdistrictTransfer_NCMD@ncmd.uscourts.gov. (If you require certified copies of any documents, please send a request to interdistrict_NCMD@ncmd.uscourts.gov. If you wish to designate a different email address for future transfers, send your request to InterDistrictTransfer_TXND@txnd.uscourts.gov.) (Butler, Carol)
Related: [-]