Nevada District Court
Judge:Jennifer A Dorsey
Referred: Elayna J Youchah
Case #: 2:20-cv-01600
Nature of Suit150 Contract - Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Aug 28, 2020
Terminated:May 28, 2021
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 24, 2021 1:47 AM PST
Defendant
Sabrina Coryell
Represented By
James Joseph Jimmerson
The Jimmerson Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Alan Jay Weil
Kendall Brill & Kelly LLP
contact info
Meaghan Lindsey Lert
Kendall Brill & Kelly LLP
contact info
Defendant
Kevin Dwight
Represented By
James Joseph Jimmerson
The Jimmerson Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Alan Jay Weil
Kendall Brill & Kelly LLP
contact info
Meaghan Lindsey Lert
Kendall Brill & Kelly LLP
contact info
Defendant
Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP
Represented By
James Joseph Jimmerson
The Jimmerson Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Alan Jay Weil
Kendall Brill & Kelly LLP
contact info
Meaghan Lindsey Lert
Kendall Brill & Kelly LLP
contact info
Defendant
Monica Potter
Represented By
James Joseph Jimmerson
The Jimmerson Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Alan Jay Weil
Kendall Brill & Kelly LLP
contact info
Meaghan Lindsey Lert
Kendall Brill & Kelly LLP
contact info
Defendant
San Pasqual Fiduciary Trust Company
Represented By
James Joseph Jimmerson
The Jimmerson Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Alan Jay Weil
Kendall Brill & Kelly LLP
contact info
Meaghan Lindsey Lert
Kendall Brill & Kelly LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Paul William Pilger
8600 Starboard Drive #1080
Las Vegas, NV 89117


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, November 17, 2022
50 50 appeal USCA Mandate Tue 11/22 8:01 AM
MANDATE of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to47 USCA Memorandum/Opinion re45 Notice of Appeal filed by Paul William Pilger. AFFIRMING. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
Related: [-]