New York Northern District Court
Judge:Brenda K Sannes
Referred: Therese Wiley Dancks
Case #: 5:20-cv-00996
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Case Filed:Aug 27, 2020
Terminated:May 31, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 23, 2021 5:02 AM EST
Defendant
Aspen Dental Management, Inc.
Represented By
Hinna M. Upal
Littler, Mendelson Law Firm - Fairport Ny Office
contact info
Jacqueline P. Polito
Littler, Mendelson Law Firm - Rochester Office
contact info
Defendant
Wellnow Urgent Care, P.C.
Represented By
Hinna M. Upal
Littler, Mendelson Law Firm - Fairport Ny Office
contact info
Jacqueline P. Polito
Littler, Mendelson Law Firm - Rochester Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Amy Kiss
Represented By
Mimi C. Satter
Satter Ruhlen Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Susan McNeil
Satter Ruhlen Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Daniel Petrov, I
Thorman Petrov Group Co., Lpa
contact info
Jennifer F. Cohen
Thorman Petrov Group Co., Lpa
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Mediator (Mandatory Program)
Ira B. Lobel
Terminated: 02/08/2021
Represented By
Ira B. Lobel
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 31, 2022
52 52 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 05/31 4:50 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 5/31/2022. (nmk)
Related: [-]
51 51 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 05/31 11:34 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Aspen Dental Management, Inc., Wellnow Urgent Care, P.C. submitted to Judge Sannes. (Upal, Hinna)
Related: [-]