Utah District Court
Judge:David Nuffer
Case #: 4:20-cv-00095
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Aug 28, 2020
Terminated:Jul 11, 2023
Notice Party
Prisoner Litigation Unit
Petitioner
Darrell John Williamson
Respondent
Adam T. Mow
Respondent
Shane Nelson
Respondent
Utah Department of Corrections

GPO Jun 08 2021
Memorandum Decision & Order to Amend Deficient Petition: Petitioner shall have Thirty Days to cure the deficiencies. In response to this Order, the Court will accept one document entitled AMENDED PETITION. The Clerk's Office shall mail Petitioner a copy of the Pro Se Litigant Guide. Denying 6 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 06/08/2021. (kpf)
GPO Jul 11 2023
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER DISMISSING HABEAS PETITION. Petitioner's claims are either procedurally defaulted or do not hurdle the federal habeas standard of review. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the petition for writ of habeas corpus is DENIED and the action DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. IT IS ALSO ORDERED that a certificate of appealability is DENIED. This action is CLOSED. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 07/10/2023. (jl)

Docket last updated: 16 minutes ago
Tuesday, July 11, 2023
15 15 13 pgs order Memorandum Decision Order Dismissing Case Tue 07/11 9:47 AM
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER DISMISSING HABEAS PETITION. Petitioner's claims are either procedurally defaulted or do not hurdle the federal habeas standard of review. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the petition for writ of habeas corpus is DENIED and the action DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. IT IS ALSO ORDERED that a certificate of appealability is DENIED. This action is CLOSED. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 07/10/2023. (jl)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 07, 2022
14 14 misc Reply Brief Tue 02/08 2:30 PM
REPLY re5 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254, filed by Petitioner Darrell John Williamson (alt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix of documents received with reply,
Att: 2 Envelope
Thursday, December 09, 2021
13 13 respoth Response (NOT to motion) Thu 12/09 3:42 PM
RESPONSE re8 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254, filed by Utah Department of Corrections. Attorney Erin Riley added to party Utah Department of Corrections(pty:res)(Riley, Erin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Transcript of Trial, R202-367,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Transcript of Sentencing, R368-394,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Utah Court of Appeals, Amended Order of Affirmance, case no. 20190511-CA, September 17, 2020,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Utah Supreme Court denial of certiorari review, case no. 20200703-SC, November 24, 2020,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Williamsons brief on appeal (case no. 20190511-CA),
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Williamsons amended petition for writ of certiorari review in the Utah Supreme Court, (case no. 20200703-SC),
Att: 7 Exhibit G - States brief on appeal (case no. 20190511-CA),
Att: 8 Exhibit H - States letter in opposition to petition for writ of certiorari, October 22, 2020
Tuesday, October 12, 2021
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 10/12 12:31 PM
ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The answer to Petitioner's Amended Petition 8 is now due 12/9/2021. Answer deadline updated for Shane Nelson answer due 12/9/2021. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 10/12/2021. (kpf)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 08, 2021
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 10/08 3:44 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re5 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254, filed by Respondent Shane Nelson. (Riley, Erin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 21, 2021
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/21 2:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Riley on behalf of Shane Nelson (Riley, Erin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 08, 2021
9 9 2 pgs order Order to Respond (2254/2241) Wed 09/08 4:21 PM
ORDER TO RESPOND - Shane Nelson, Utah Department of Corrections must respond to 5 Petitioner's 28 U.S.C. 2254 A copy of the petition and order were mailed to Shane Nelson, Utah Department of Corrections at Utah Attorney General, Criminal Appeals, 160 East 300 South, Sixth Floor, PO Box 140854, Salt Lake City, UT 84114-0854 Responses due by 10/25/2021 Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 09/08/2021. (kpf)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 30, 2021
8 8 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254 Tue 08/03 8:13 AM
Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2254 filed by Darrell John Williamson. (kpf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Tuesday, June 08, 2021
7 7 6 pgs order Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Memorandum Decision Tue 06/08 11:53 AM
Memorandum Decision & Order to Amend Deficient Petition: Petitioner shall have Thirty Days to cure the deficiencies. In response to this Order, the Court will accept one document entitled AMENDED PETITION. The Clerk's Office shall mail Petitioner a copy of the Pro Se Litigant Guide. Denying 6 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 06/08/2021. (kpf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 03, 2020
6 6 motion Appoint Counsel Fri 12/04 8:38 AM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Petitioner Darrell John Williamson. (jl)
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254 Fri 12/04 8:36 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2254 Fee Status: IFP. (Originally received on 08/28/2020) filed by Darrell John Williamson. Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (jl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Envelope 1
4 4 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 12/04 8:32 AM
ORDER granting 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial fee: Waived. Collection of Fees Sent: No Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 12/03/2020. (jl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 22, 2020
3 3 utility Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement Wed 09/23 10:54 AM
*** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement for Darrell John Williamson received from Correctional Institution(kpf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Thursday, September 10, 2020
2 2 1 pgs order Order Thu 09/10 5:26 PM
ORDER: within 30 days Petitioner must file "a certificate from the warden or other appropriate officer of the place of confinement showing the amount of money or securities that the petitioner has in any account in the institution." If Petitioner does not fully comply, this case will be closed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 9/10/20 (alt)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 28, 2020
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 08/31 9:48 AM
**SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler for review, case file forwarded to PLU. Related [+] filed by Petitioner Darrell John Williamson. (jl)
Related: [-] ceived by the court on: 08/28/2020