Cortez v. Lamorak Insurance Company et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Sarah S Vance |
Referred: | Janis Van Meerveld |
Case #: | 2:20-cv-02389 |
Nature of Suit | 368 Torts - Personal Injury - Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Aug 31, 2020 |
Re-opened: | Sep 20, 2021 |
Terminated: | Nov 08, 2022 |
Case in other court: | Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, 20-05403 |
Last checked: Saturday Feb 27, 2021 3:11 AM CST |
Cross Claimant
Albert L. Bossier, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Albert L Bossier, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Huntington Ingalls Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Hopeman Brothers Inc
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
United States Fidelity and Guaranty Company
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Goodrich Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Houston General Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Bayer CropScience, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
International Paper Company
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Axiall Corporation DE
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Vulcan Materials Company
|
|
Cross Defendant
Louisiana Insurance Guaranty Association
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Eagle, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
McCarty Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Occidental Chemical Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Pharmacia LLC
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Anco Insulations Inc
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Riley Power, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Uniroyal Inc
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Shell Oil Company
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Union Carbide Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Travelers Indemnity Company
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
General Electric Company
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
BASF Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Bayer CropScience
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Uniroyal Holding, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company
|
|
Cross Defendant
Trinity Industries, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Insulations LLC
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
CBS Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
CF Industries Nitrogen, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Hopeman Brothers Inc
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Cajun Company
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Continental Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Entergy Louisiana, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Eagle Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust
|
|
Cross Defendant
First State Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Foster Wheeler LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ViacomCBS Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Uniroyal Holding, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Pharmacia LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Union Carbide Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Entergy Louisiana, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Legacy Vulcan, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Uniroyal Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hopeman Brothers Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company
Farmington, CT 06032
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Axiall Corporation DE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Vulcan Materials Company
|
|
Defendant
General Electric Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Anco Insulations Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bayer CropScience, Inc.
Successor to Rhone Poulenc AG Company Corporation Service Company 80 State Street
Albany, NY 12207 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Albert L. Bossier, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CBS Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CF Industries Nitrogen, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cajun Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Continental Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Eagle, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
First State Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Foster Wheeler LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Travelers Indemnity Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Goodrich Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Houston General Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Huntington Ingalls Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Texaco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Shell Oil Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Riley Power, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Occidental Chemical Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
McCarty Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Louisiana Insurance Guaranty Association
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
6575 Snowdrift Road Suite 101
Allentown, PA 18106 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lamorak Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
International Paper Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Callen J. Cortez
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Defendant
Albert L Bossier, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Defendant
Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
as insurer of Wayne Manufacturing Co. 6575 Snowdrift Road Suite 101
Allentown, PA 18106 |
Represented By
|
Third Party Defendant
Manville Personal Injury Trust
|
|
Third Party Defendant
Insulations LLC
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Defendant
Trinity Industries, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Plaintiff
Albert L Bossier, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Plaintiff
Huntington Ingalls Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Cross Defendant
Texaco Inc
Terminated: 12/22/2020
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
1336 | 1336
![]() ORDER of USCA as to1330 Notice of Appeal. Under Fed. R. App. P. 42(b), the appeal is dismissed as of April 17, 2024, pursuant to appellant's motion.(cs) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |