SELEX ES INC. v. Wanco, Inc.
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | William J Martinez |
Case #: | 1:20-cv-02658 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:0101 (35:101 Patent Infringement) |
Case Filed: | Sep 01, 2020 |
Terminated: | Oct 28, 2020 |
Last checked: Sunday Feb 28, 2021 2:28 AM MST |
Defendant
Wanco, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Selex ES Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Wednesday, October 28, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
utility
Terminate Civil Case - PUBLIC
Thu 10/29 11:45 AM
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to14 NOTICE of Dismissal filed in this case on 10/28/2020. Text Only Entry (angar, ) |
|
15 | 15
![]() MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 28 October 2020. In light of Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Dkt. #14 ), it is HEREBY ORDERED that the Status Conference set on October 29, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. is VACATED. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, ) |
|
14 | 14
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case Without Prejudice by Plaintiff Selex ES Inc. (Kim, Minnie) |
|
Friday, October 23, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 23 October 2020. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Continuance of Scheduling/Planning Conference (Dkt. #11 ) is DENIED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall forthwith serve the Defendant. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Scheduling/Planning Conference set on October 29, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. is RESET as a Status Conference. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, ) |
|
12 | 12
order
Memorandum
Fri 10/23 1:26 PM
MEMORANDUM regarding11 First MOTION to Continue Scheduling/Planning Conference filed by Selex ES Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter by Judge William J. Martinez on 10/23/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, ) |
|
11 | 11
![]() First MOTION to Continue Scheduling/Planning Conference by Plaintiff Selex ES Inc.. (Kim, Minnie) |
|
Friday, October 16, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order
Fri 10/16 10:34 AM
ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2019 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 10 /16/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, ) |
|
9 | 9
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Fri 10/16 10:33 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Magistrate Judge Neureiter, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 10/16/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, ) |
|
Thursday, October 15, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Letter Reassigning Case
Thu 10/15 11:51 AM
CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to7 . All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge William J. Martinez. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-02658-WJM. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, ) |
|
7 | 7
![]() CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Selex ES Inc. All parties do not consent.. (Morrow, John.) |
|
Wednesday, September 02, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
![]() ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 2 September 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on or before October 15, 2020, the parties shall complete and file the Consent/Non-Consent Form (see Dkt. #4 ).Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/22/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 10/29/2020 10:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, ) |
|
Tuesday, September 01, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (cpomm, ) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cpomm, ) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Tue 09/01 11:28 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry (cpomm, ) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Administrative Notice
Tue 09/01 10:44 AM
Administrative Notice: Duplicate filing fee received. Financial notified and a refund is pending. (Text Only Entry) (cpomm, ) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Wanco, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7465385)Attorney John. F. Morrow, Jr added to party SELEX ES INC.(pty:pla), filed by SELEX ES INC..(Morrow, John.) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |