New York Southern District Court
Judge:Lewis J Liman
Case #: 1:20-cv-07110
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:1 Antitrust Litigation (Monopolizing Trade)
Case Filed:Sep 01, 2020
Terminated:Aug 18, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 02, 2021 4:37 AM EST
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
400 Interpace Parkway
Parsippany, NJ 07054
Represented By
Robert Donald Carroll
Goodwin Procter, Llp (boston)
contact info
Sarah K. Frederick
Goodwin Procter, Llp (boston)
contact info
Christopher T. Holding
Goodwin Procter, Llp (boston)
contact info
Defendant
Glenmark Generics Inc., USA
Represented By
Natalie Christine Clayton
Alston & Bird, Llp (nyc)
contact info
David Andrew Hatchett
Alston & Bird LLP
contact info
Matthew David Kent
Alston & Bird
contact info
Teresa T. Bonder
Alston & Bird LLP
contact info
Defendant
Ascend Laboratories, LLC
339 Jefferson Road Suite 101
Parsippany, NJ 07054
Represented By
Ahmed M.T. Riaz
Schiff Hardin LLP
contact info
Suzanne L. Wahl
Schiff Hardin LLP
contact info
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Morris Corporation Center III 400 Interpace Parkway
Parsippany, NJ 07054
Represented By
Robert Donald Carroll
Goodwin Procter, Llp (boston)
contact info
Defendant
Watson Pharma, Inc.
Morris Corporate Center III 400 Interpace Parkway
Parsippany, NJ 07054
Represented By
Robert Donald Carroll
Goodwin Procter, Llp (boston)
contact info
Sarah K. Frederick
Goodwin Procter, Llp (boston)
contact info
Christopher T. Holding
Goodwin Procter, Llp (boston)
contact info
Defendant
Watson Laboratories, Inc. (NY)
311 Bonnie Circle
Corona, CA 07054
Represented By
Robert Donald Carroll
Goodwin Procter, Llp (boston)
contact info
Defendant
Watson Laboratories, Inc. (NV)
132 Business Center Drive
Corona, CA 92880
Represented By
Robert Donald Carroll
Goodwin Procter, Llp (boston)
contact info
Sarah K. Frederick
Goodwin Procter, Llp (boston)
contact info
Christopher T. Holding
Goodwin Procter, Llp (boston)
contact info
Defendant
Watson Laboratories, Inc. (DE)
311 Bonnie Circle
Corona, CA 92880
Represented By
Robert Donald Carroll
Goodwin Procter, Llp (boston)
contact info
Sarah K. Frederick
Goodwin Procter, Llp (boston)
contact info
Christopher T. Holding
Goodwin Procter, Llp (boston)
contact info
Defendant
Watson Laboratories, Inc. (CT)
131 West Street
Danbury, CT 06810
Represented By
Robert Donald Carroll
Goodwin Procter, Llp (boston)
contact info
Sarah K. Frederick
Goodwin Procter, Llp (boston)
contact info
Christopher T. Holding
Goodwin Procter, Llp (boston)
contact info
Defendant
Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd.
Defendant
Torrent Pharma Inc.
5380 Holiday Terrace Suite 40
Kalamazoo, MI 49009
Represented By
Devora Whitman Allon
Kirkland & Ellis Llp (nyc)
contact info
Jay Philip Lefkowitz
Kirkland & Ellis Llp (nyc)
contact info
Gilad Bendheim
Kirkland & Ellis Llp (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
Actavis, Inc.
Morris Corporate Center III 400 Interpace Parkway
Parsippany, NJ 07054
Represented By
Robert Donald Carroll
Goodwin Procter, Llp (boston)
contact info
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Represented By
Robert Donald Carroll
Goodwin Procter, Llp (boston)
contact info
Sarah K. Frederick
Goodwin Procter, Llp (boston)
contact info
Christopher T. Holding
Goodwin Procter, Llp (boston)
contact info
Defendant
Indchemie Health Specialties Private Ltd.
Represented By
Ahmed M.T. Riaz
Schiff Hardin LLP
contact info
Suzanne L. Wahl
Schiff Hardin LLP
contact info
Defendant
Hetero USA Inc.
1031 Centennial Avenue
Piscataway, NJ 08854
Defendant
Hetero Labs Ltd
Defendant
Hetero Drugs LTD.
Defendant
Glenmark Pharmaceuticals S.A.
Defendant
Glenmark Generics Ltd.
Represented By
Natalie Christine Clayton
Alston & Bird, Llp (nyc)
contact info
David Andrew Hatchett
Alston & Bird LLP
contact info
Matthew David Kent
Alston & Bird
contact info
Teresa T. Bonder
Alston & Bird LLP
contact info
Defendant
Amerigen Pharmaceuticals Ltd.
197 State Route 18S Suite 306N
East Brunswick, NJ 08816
Defendant
Amerigen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
197 State Route 18S Suite 306N
East Brunswick, NJ 08816
Defendant
Alkem Laboratories Ltd.
Represented By
Ahmed M.T. Riaz
Schiff Hardin LLP
contact info
Suzanne L. Wahl
Schiff Hardin LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
J M Smith Corporation
on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated 9098 Fairforest Road
Spartanburg, SC 29301
Represented By
David Francis Sorensen
Berger Montague PC
contact info
Caitlin G. Coslett
Berger & Montague Pc (pa)
contact info
Joseph Opper
Garwin Gerstein & Fisher LLP
contact info
Kimberly Marion Hennings
Garwin Gerstein & Fisher, L.L.P.
contact info
Bruce E. Gerstein
Garwin Gerstein & Fisher, L.L.P.
contact info
Dan Litvin
Garwin Gerstein & Fisher, L.L.P.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, August 18, 2023
141 141 order Order Mon 08/21 9:08 AM
ORDER. For the reasons stated in the Opinion and Order at Dkt. No. 438, the Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close this case, its member cases, and its related cases: 20-cv-5735, 20-cv-07110, 20-cv-08754, 20-cv-08756, 20-cv-05538, 20-cv-09793, 20-cv-10087, 20-cv-05813, 20-cv-07580, 20-cv-07352, 20-cv-05837, 20-cv-07492, 20-cv-05826, 20-cv-07309, 20-cv-05901, 20-cv-06769, 20-cv-07177, 20-cv-06647, 20-cv-07296, 20-cv-07304, 20-cv-06223. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 8/18/23) (yv)
Related: [-]