Kahn v. HSBC Securities (USA) Inc. et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Lewis J Liman |
Case #: | 1:20-cv-07117 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 29:206(d) FLSA: Prohibition of Sex Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Sep 01, 2020 |
Terminated: | May 10, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 02, 2021 3:55 AM EST |
Defendant
HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Masha Kahn
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Raj Sinha
Terminated: 02/22/2021
|
Docket last updated: 04/21/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, May 10, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 05/10 4:20 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) HSBC Securities (USA) Inc. and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Avallone, Vincent) |
|
20 | 20
misc
Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 05/10 3:00 PM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - SIGNATURE ERROR - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) HSBC Securities (USA) Inc. and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Avallone, Vincent) Modified on 5/10/2021 (km) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 05/10 3:19 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Vincent Avallone. RE-FILE Document No. 20 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the stipulation of voluntary dismissal was not signed by all parties who have appeared (handwritten signatures). Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents. When refiling, do not select that the dismissal is pursuant to Rule 41(a), your document does not state that it is. (km) |
||
Monday, February 22, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Mon 02/22 4:32 PM
ORDER: The parties have filed a stipulation of voluntary dismissal as to Defendant Raj Sinha. Dkt. No. 17. Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 addresses dismissal of actions rather than dismissal of parties. Treating the application as addressed to the Court's power under Rule 15 or Rule 21 or its inherent power, the Court hereby GRANTS dismissal of all claims as against Defendant Raj Sinha without prejudice and with each party to bear their own costs and fees. See Kerr v. Compagnie de Ultramar, 250 F.2d 860, 864 (2d Cir. 1958); Harvey Aluminum, Inc. v. Ican Cyanamid Co., 203 F.2d 105, 108 (2d Cir. 1953), cert. denied, 345 U.S. 964. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate Defendant Raj Sinha. SO ORDERED. Raj Sinha (in his individual capacities) and Raj Sinha (in his professional capacities) terminated. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 2/22/2021) (va) |
|
Tuesday, January 26, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
order
Case Management Plan
Tue 01/26 12:24 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). Any motion to amend or to join additional parties shall be filed no later than February 22, 2021. All Fact Discovery due by 7/23/2021. NOTE ON COVID-19 EMERGENCY PROCEDURES: Until further notice, and pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(3) and (b)(4), all depositions may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means, and may be recorded by any reliable audio or audiovisual means, and as further specified herein regarding NOTE ON COVID-19 EMERGENCY PROCEDURES. Depositions shall be completed by July 23, 2021. All expert discovery, including disclosures, reports, production of underlying documents, and depositions shall be completed by 9/7/2021. All Discovery due by 9/7/2021. A post-discovery status conference shall be held on: September 14, 2021 at 11:00AM. Motion for summary judgment due by 9/21/2021. This case is to be tried to a jury. The parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 5-6 days, and as previously and further specified in this Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order. (Status Conference set for 9/14/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lewis J. Liman). (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 1/26/2021) (rjm) |
|
Friday, January 22, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 01/22 9:02 AM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Raj Sinha(in his professional capacities), Raj Sinha(in his individual capacities) and without costs. Document filed by HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.. Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. ..(Avallone, Vincent) |
|
misc
Notice to Court Regarding Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 01/22 9:06 AM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. 17 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal, was reviewed and referred to Judge Lewis J. Liman for approval for the following reason(s): the stipulation of dismissal is not pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii); the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (dt) |
||
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Mon 01/25 9:16 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis J. Liman: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 1/22/2021 by Telephone Conference. Renan Varghese and Lawrence Pearson present by telephone for Plaintiff. Vincent Avallone present by telephone for Defendant. Case management plan approved. Status Conference set for September 14, 2021 at 11:00AM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (mf) |
||
Thursday, January 21, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order
Thu 01/21 10:00 AM
ORDER: The Initial Pretrial Conference scheduled for tomorrow, January 22, 2021 is MOVED to 4:00PM. Parties are reminded to dial into the Court's teleconference line at 888-251-2909 and use access code 2123101. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman) (Text Only Order) (mf) Modified on 1/21/2021 (mf) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Thu 01/21 10:03 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 1/22/2021 at 04:00 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (mf) |
||
Friday, January 15, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Proposed Case Management Plan
Fri 01/15 11:27 AM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by HSBC Securities (USA) Inc...(Avallone, Vincent) |
|
Thursday, December 17, 2020 | ||
adr
Mediation Conference Scheduled
Thu 12/17 1:56 PM
MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED First Mediation Conference scheduled for 1/20/2021 at 10:00 AM by video conference..(sb) |
||
Tuesday, November 17, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 11/17 11:48 AM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent HSBC Markets (USA) Inc., Corporate Parent HSBC Overseas Holdings (UK) Limited, Corporate Parent HSBC North America Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate HSBC Holdings plc for HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.. Document filed by HSBC Securities (USA) Inc...(Avallone, Vincent) |
|
adr
Notice of Mediator Assignment
Tue 11/17 10:18 AM
NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 12/17/2020..(rpr) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Deficient Docket Entry Error
Tue 11/17 11:28 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Vincent Avallone to RE-FILE Document 10 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): incorrect case number indicated on document. (ldi) |
||
Monday, November 16, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
6
pgs
order
Order of Automatic Referral to Mediation
Mon 11/16 2:36 PM
ORDER OF AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (See M-10-468 Second Amended Standing Order). Please reference the Pilot Discovery Protocols, attached, and the Mediation Program Procedures (https://nysd.uscourts.gov/programs/mediation-adr). E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone 212-805-0643. Mediator to be Assigned by 11/27/2020. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/1/2015) (rpr) |
|
Monday, November 09, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 11/09 9:30 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint. Document filed by HSBC Securities (USA) Inc...(Avallone, Vincent) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 11/09 9:27 AM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent HSBC Markets (USA) Inc., Corporate Parent HSBC Overseas Holdings (UK) Limited, Corporate Parent HSBC North America Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate HSBC Holdings plc for HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.. Document filed by HSBC Securities (USA) Inc...(Avallone, Vincent) |
|
Tuesday, September 15, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Tue 09/15 5:29 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby: ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference by TELEPHONE on January 22, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference number at 888-251-2909, Access Code 2123101, and follow the necessary prompts. Initial Conference set for 1/22/2021 at 10:00 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 9/15/2020) (va) |
|
Wednesday, September 09, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 09/09 5:06 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. HSBC Securities (USA) Inc. waiver sent on 9/8/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. Document filed by Masha Kahn..(Pearson, Lawrence) |
|
Wednesday, September 02, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 09/02 1:29 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Renan F Varghese on behalf of Masha Kahn..(Varghese, Renan) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Wed 09/02 9:32 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Raj Sinha(in his professional capacities), Raj Sinha(in his individual capacities). (sj) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Wed 09/02 9:29 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.. (sj) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Wed 09/02 9:09 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Lawrence Michael Pearson. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 29:0754. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 29:0206(d). (sj) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Wed 09/02 9:21 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(sj) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Wed 09/02 9:23 AM
Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (sj) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Wed 09/02 9:23 AM
Case Designated ECF. (sj) |
||
Tuesday, September 01, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 09/01 3:37 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Raj Sinha, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Masha Kahn..(Pearson, Lawrence) |
|
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 09/01 3:34 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Masha Kahn..(Pearson, Lawrence) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 09/01 3:24 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Pearson, Lawrence) |
|
1 | 1
20
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 09/01 3:05 PM
COMPLAINT against HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., Raj Sinha(in his professional capacities), Raj Sinha(in his individual capacities). (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21432641)Document filed by Masha Kahn..(Pearson, Lawrence) |